McMillian v. MTA Metro-North Railroad
Plaintiff: Meldeisha McMillian
Defendant: MTA Metro-North Railroad
Case Number: 1:2020cv01026
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #11 MOTION to Dismiss . Granted. So Ordered. (Responses due by 4/20/2020. Replies due by 5/11/2020.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/23/20) (yv)
March 23, 2020 Filing 14 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Steven Barkan dated March 23, 2020. Document filed by Meldeisha McMillian..(Barkan, Steven)
March 16, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Eric D. Witkin in Support re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by MTA Metro-North Railroad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Witkin, Eric)
March 16, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by MTA Metro-North Railroad..(Witkin, Eric)
March 16, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by MTA Metro-North Railroad..(Witkin, Eric)
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Meldeisha McMillian.(Barkan, Steven)
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Laurence Barkan on behalf of Meldeisha McMillian..(Barkan, Steven)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,. Granted. SO ORDERED. (MTA Metro-North Railroad answer due 3/16/2020.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 2/14/20) (yv)
February 11, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Eric Witkin dated February 11, 2020. Document filed by MTA Metro-North Railroad..(Witkin, Eric)
February 7, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 7, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 7, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Eric Field on behalf of MTA Metro-North Railroad..(Field, Joseph)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, and #4 Notice of Appearance served on Steven L. Barkan on February 6, 2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by MTA Metro-North Railroad..(Witkin, Eric)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Douglas Witkin on behalf of MTA Metro-North Railroad..(Witkin, Eric)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MTA Metro-North Railroad..(Witkin, Eric)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Witkin, Eric)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 162444/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18710978).Document filed by MTA Metro-North Railroad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Witkin, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMillian v. MTA Metro-North Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTA Metro-North Railroad
Represented By: Eric Douglas Witkin
Represented By: Joseph Eric Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meldeisha McMillian
Represented By: Steven Laurence Barkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?