The Charitable Donor Advised Fund, L.P. et al v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: CLO HOLDCO, LTD. and THE CHARITABLE DONOR ADVISED FUND, L.P.
Defendant: Moody's Investors Service, Inc., U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCATION, Brigade Capital Management, LP, Joshua N Terry, ACIS CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, L.P. and U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 1:2020cv01036
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332t
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Accordingly, Plaintiffs respectfully request that the Court administratively dismiss this lawsuit without prejudice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/26/2020) (cf)
February 25, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by The Charitable Donor Advised Fund, L.P., CLO Holdco, LTD.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Ezie-Boncoeur, V. Chisara)
February 13, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Joshua N Terry served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. Service was accepted by Jennifer Terry, Wife. Document filed by The Charitable Donor Advised Fund, L.P.; CLO Holdco, LTD...(Hurst, Michael)
February 7, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACIS Capital Management, L.P...(pc)
February 7, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Moody's Investors Service, Inc...(pc)
February 7, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joshua N Terry..(pc)
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brigade Capital Management, LP..(pc)
February 7, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Bank National Association..(pc)
February 7, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 7, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 7, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Hurst. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $5,000,000,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (pc)
February 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Hurst. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: THE CHARITABLE DONOR ADVISED FUND, L.P., CLO HOLDCO, LTD, ACIS CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, L.P., U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCATION. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
February 6, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Bank National Association, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by CLO HOLDCO, LTD., THE CHARITABLE DONOR ADVISED FUND, L.P...(Hurst, Michael)
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joshua N. Terry, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by CLO HOLDCO, LTD., THE CHARITABLE DONOR ADVISED FUND, L.P...(Hurst, Michael)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Moody's Investors Service, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by CLO HOLDCO, LTD., THE CHARITABLE DONOR ADVISED FUND, L.P...(Hurst, Michael)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brigade Capital Management, LP, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by CLO HOLDCO, LTD., THE CHARITABLE DONOR ADVISED FUND, L.P...(Hurst, Michael)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ACIS Capital Management, L.P., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by CLO HOLDCO, LTD., THE CHARITABLE DONOR ADVISED FUND, L.P...(Hurst, Michael)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hurst, Michael)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACIS CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, L.P., Brigade Capital Management, LP, Moody's Investors Service, Inc., Joshua N Terry, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18714767)Document filed by THE CHARITABLE DONOR ADVISED FUND, L.P., CLO HOLDCO, LTD...(Hurst, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Charitable Donor Advised Fund, L.P. et al v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moody's Investors Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brigade Capital Management, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua N Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACIS CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLO HOLDCO, LTD.
Represented By: Michael Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE CHARITABLE DONOR ADVISED FUND, L.P.
Represented By: Michael Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?