P.R. et al v. City School District of the City of New York
Plaintiff: P.R., S.R., E.C. and P. R.
Defendant: THE CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK, d.b.a. the NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION and City School District of the City of New York
Case Number: 1:2020cv01052
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Application for extension of time to respond to the Complaint is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Initial Pretrial Conference previously scheduled for 5/11/2020 at 11:00 a.m. is ADJOURNED sine die. No later than May 12, 2020, the parties are ORDERED to file a status letter updating the Court on the status of settlement and whether a case management plan should be put in place. City School District of the City of New York answer due 5/5/2020. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 4/2/2020) (va)
April 1, 2020 Filing 17 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Michael Pantalony dated April 1, 2020. Document filed by City School District of the City of New York..(Pantalony, Michael)
March 31, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Douglas Pantalony on behalf of City School District of the City of New York..(Pantalony, Michael)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion to Seal (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
March 23, 2020 Filing 14 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Seal Complaint with Exhibits addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Tracey Spencer Walsh dated 03/23/2020. Document filed by E.C.(on behalf of S.R.), E.C.(individually), P. R., P.R.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit Exhibit G).(Walsh, Tracey)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,. So Ordered. (City School District of the City of New York answer due 4/6/2020.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/3/20) (yv)
March 3, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, from 3/6/20 to 4/6/20 addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Jonathan Pines dated March 3, 2020. Document filed by City School District of the City of New York..(Pines, Jonathan)
February 18, 2020 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint, served. City School District of the City of New York served on 2/14/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck, Service Window Clerk. Document filed by P.R.; E.C.(on behalf of S.R.); P. R.; E.C.(individually)..(Walsh, Tracey)
February 11, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City School District of the City of New York..(gp)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis J. Liman and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/10/2020) (rro)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City School District of the City of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by E.C.(on behalf of S.R.), E.C.(individually), P. R., P.R...(Walsh, Tracey)
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Barnett on behalf of E.C.(on behalf of S.R.), E.C.(individually), P. R., P.R...(Barnett, Christopher)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tracey Spencer Walsh on behalf of E.C.(on behalf of S.R.), E.C.(individually), P. R., P.R...(Walsh, Tracey)
February 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Tracey Spencer Walsh to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the PDF 'To' section must appear as it appears on the pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City School District of the City of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by E.C.(on behalf of S.R.), E.C.(individually), P. R., P.R...(Walsh, Tracey) Modified on 2/10/2020 (jgo).
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Tracey Spencer Walsh on behalf of E.C.(on behalf of S.R.), E.C.(individually), P. R., P.R.. New Address: Spencer Walsh Law, PLLC, 625 W 57th Street, Suite 1810, New York, New York, USA 10019, 2124011959..(Walsh, Tracey)
February 7, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners P.R., P. R., E.C., E.C. added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by P.R., P. R., E.C., E.C.. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Walsh, Tracey)
February 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Tracey Spencer Walsh to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): defendant name in the 'To' field on the summons request PDF is incorrect; defendant's name must be entered, not defendant's alias; plaintiff's attorney information was omitted. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the corrected summons form PDF. (pne)
February 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Tracey Spencer Walsh re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; E.C. must be added to the case a second time, with party text "on behalf of S.R.". Docket the event type ADD PARTY TO PLEADING found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (pne)
February 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Tracey Spencer Walsh. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: City School District of the City of New York, P.R., P.R., E.C.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted; alias party information was entered incorrectly as party of party name. (pne)
February 7, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
February 7, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
February 7, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK, d.b.a. the NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by E.C., P.R., S.R...(Walsh, Tracey) Modified on 2/7/2020 (pne).
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Walsh, Tracey)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK, d.b.a. the NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18719444)Document filed by P.R., S.R., E.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G).(Walsh, Tracey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P.R. et al v. City School District of the City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.R.
Represented By: Tracey Spencer Walsh
Represented By: Christopher Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.R.
Represented By: Tracey Spencer Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.C.
Represented By: Tracey Spencer Walsh
Represented By: Christopher Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P. R.
Represented By: Tracey Spencer Walsh
Represented By: Christopher Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK, d.b.a. the NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City School District of the City of New York
Represented By: Michael Douglas Pantalony
Represented By: Jonathan L. Pines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?