335-7 LLC et al v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: 431 Holding LLC, 226 LLC, 335-7 LLC, FGP 309 LLC and 699 Venture Corp.
Defendant: City of New York, Ruthanne Visnauskas and New York City Rent Guidelines Board
Petitioner: NY Tenants & Neighbors (T&N) and Community Voices Heard (CVH)
Case Number: 1:2020cv01053
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #48 MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by Community Voices Heard (CVH), NY Tenants & Neighbors (T&N)..(Baldwin, Sean)
April 3, 2020 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Sean Baldwin in Support re: #48 MOTION to Intervene .. Document filed by Community Voices Heard (CVH), NY Tenants & Neighbors (T&N). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Yolande Cadore, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Afua Attah-Mensah).(Baldwin, Sean)
April 3, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION to Intervene . Document filed by Community Voices Heard (CVH), NY Tenants & Neighbors (T&N)..(Baldwin, Sean)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Letter Motion to Expedite. Prospective intervenors' motion to intervene is now due April 3, 2020. The opposition brief is due April 10, 2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
March 27, 2020 Filing 46 LETTER MOTION to Expedite briefing schedule of Motion to Intervene addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Caitlin Halligan dated March 27, 2020. Document filed by Community Voices Heard (CVH), NY Tenants & Neighbors (T&N)..(Halligan, Caitlin)
March 26, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 4/27/2020. Responses due by 5/27/2020 Replies due by 6/10/2020. (rro)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #43 Letter Motion for Conference. The pre-motion conference is waived. Proposed Interveners are granted leave to file a motion to intervene with the following briefing schedule: moving papers due April 27, 2020; opposition due May 27, 2020; and reply due June 10, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/26/2020) (rro)
March 25, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 4/24/2020. Responses due by 5/25/2020 Replies due by 6/8/2020. (kv)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #37 Letter Motion for Conference ; granting in part and denying in part #38 Letter Motion for Conference. The pre-motion conference is waived for both State and City defendants. State and City are granted leave to file their motions to dismiss with the following briefing schedule: moving papers due April 24, 2020; opposition due May 25, 2020; and replies due June 8, 2020. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions, docs. 37 and 38. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/25/2020) (kv)
March 24, 2020 Filing 43 LETTER MOTION for Conference and to Intervene addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Caitlin Halligan dated March 24, 2020. Document filed by Community Voices Heard (CVH), NY Tenants & Neighbors (T&N)..(Halligan, Caitlin)
March 24, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caitlin Joan Halligan on behalf of Community Voices Heard (CVH), NY Tenants & Neighbors (T&N)..(Halligan, Caitlin)
March 24, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Duke on behalf of Community Voices Heard (CVH), NY Tenants & Neighbors (T&N)..(Duke, Michael)
March 24, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thaddeus C. Eagles on behalf of Community Voices Heard (CVH), NY Tenants & Neighbors (T&N)..(Eagles, Thaddeus)
March 24, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean Patrick Baldwin on behalf of Community Voices Heard (CVH), NY Tenants & Neighbors (T&N)..(Baldwin, Sean)
March 23, 2020 Filing 38 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Rachel K. Moston dated March 23, 2020. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Rent Guidelines Board..(Moston, Rachel)
March 23, 2020 Filing 37 LETTER MOTION for Conference re Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael A. Berg dated 3/23/20. Document filed by Ruthanne Visnauskas..(Berg, Michael)
March 23, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Claudia Brodsky on behalf of City of New York, New York City Rent Guidelines Board..(Brodsky, Claudia)
March 23, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Kane Moston on behalf of City of New York, New York City Rent Guidelines Board..(Moston, Rachel)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Charles Justin Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Nicole Frazer Reaves to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Peter Andrew Patterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Brian Wesley Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #10 Motion for David Henry Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/6/2020) (jwh) Modified on 3/10/2020 (jwh).
March 6, 2020 Filing 28 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time until March 23, 2020 to file a pre-motion letter addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Shi-Shi Wang dated 3.6.2020. Document filed by Ruthanne Visnauskas..(Wang, Shi-Shi)
March 6, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shi-Shi Wang on behalf of Ruthanne Visnauskas..(Wang, Shi-Shi)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. RuthAnne Visnauskas' time to respond to the complaint is hereby extended to March 9, 2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
March 2, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Gregory H. Woods is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
March 2, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
February 28, 2020 Filing 25 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Michael A. Berg dated 2/28/2020. Document filed by Ruthanne Visnauskas..(Berg, Michael)
February 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
February 27, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
February 27, 2020 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 19-cv-11285 and declined by Judge Kenneth Karas and returned to wheel for assignment. (wb)
February 14, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Adam Berg on behalf of Ruthanne Visnauskas..(Berg, Michael)
February 12, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #23 AMENDED MOTION for Charles Justin Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt No. ANYSDC-18720066. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
February 12, 2020 Filing 23 AMENDED MOTION for Charles Justin Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt No. ANYSDC-18720066. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 226 LLC, 335-7 LLC, 431 Holding LLC, 699 Venture Corp., FGP 309 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Charles J. Cooper, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed PHV Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing AL, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing DC, #5 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing GA).(Cooper, Charles)
February 11, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck and Charmaine Superville. Document filed by 226 LLC, FGP 309 LLC, 335-7 LLC, 431 Holding LLC, 699 Venture Corp...(Thompson, David)
February 11, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Ruthanne Visnauskas served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. Service was accepted by Valerie Lancaster. Document filed by 226 LLC; FGP 309 LLC; 335-7 LLC; 431 Holding LLC; 699 Venture Corp...(Thompson, David)
February 11, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. City of New York served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck. Document filed by 226 LLC; FGP 309 LLC; 335-7 LLC; 431 Holding LLC; 699 Venture Corp...(Thompson, David)
February 11, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. New York City Rent Guidelines Board served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. Service was accepted by Irina Svetlichnaya. Document filed by 226 LLC; FGP 309 LLC; 335-7 LLC; 431 Holding LLC; 699 Venture Corp...(Thompson, David)
February 10, 2020 Filing 18 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of David H. Thompson re: that this action be filed as related to 7:19-cv-11285-KMK. Document filed by 226 LLC, 335-7 LLC, 431 Holding LLC, 699 Venture Corp., FGP 309 LLC..(Thompson, David)
February 7, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for Nicole Frazer Reaves to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18730904. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
February 7, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Nicole Frazer Reaves to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18730904. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 226 LLC, 335-7 LLC, 431 Holding LLC, 699 Venture Corp., FGP 309 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Nicole Frazer Reaves, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed PHV Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing MD, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing DC).(Frazer Reaves, Nicole)
February 7, 2020 Filing 16 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Thompson, David)
February 7, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ruthanne Visnauskas..(pne)
February 7, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York..(pne)
February 7, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Rent Guidelines Board..(pne)
February 7, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Kenneth M. Karas as possibly related to 19CV11285. (pne)
February 7, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
February 7, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pne)
February 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Charles J Cooper. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to White Plains. (pne)
February 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Charles J Cooper to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): case marked as related to a White Plains case; incorrect courthouse selection was made. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the corrected PDF. (pne)
February 6, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Brian Wesley Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18720618. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #10 MOTION for David Henry Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18720168. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #12 MOTION for Peter Andrew Patterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18720872. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
February 6, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #9 MOTION for Charles Justin Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18720066. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT OF ALABAMA. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Peter Andrew Patterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18720872. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 226 LLC, 335-7 LLC, 431 Holding LLC, 699 Venture Corp., FGP 309 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Peter A. Patterson, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed PHV Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing DC, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing OH).(Patterson, Peter)
February 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Brian Wesley Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18720618. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 226 LLC, 335-7 LLC, 431 Holding LLC, 699 Venture Corp., FGP 309 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian W. Barnes, #2 Affidavit Proposed PHV Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing DC, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing CO).(Barnes, Brian)
February 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for David Henry Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18720168. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 226 LLC, 335-7 LLC, 431 Holding LLC, 699 Venture Corp., FGP 309 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David H. Thompson, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed PHV Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing DC, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing NY).(Thompson, David)
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Charles Justin Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18720066. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 226 LLC, 335-7 LLC, 431 Holding LLC, 699 Venture Corp., FGP 309 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Charles J. Cooper, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed PHV Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing AL, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing DC, #5 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing GA).(Cooper, Charles) Modified on 2/7/2020 (aea).
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-00634. Document filed by 226 LLC, 335-7 LLC, 431 Holding LLC, 699 Venture Corp., FGP 309 LLC..(Cooper, Charles)
February 6, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-11285. Document filed by 226 LLC, 335-7 LLC, 431 Holding LLC, 699 Venture Corp., FGP 309 LLC..(Cooper, Charles)
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 226 LLC, 335-7 LLC, 431 Holding LLC, 699 Venture Corp., FGP 309 LLC..(Cooper, Charles)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ruthanne Visnauskas in her official capacity as Commissioner of the New York State Division of Homes and Community Renewal, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 226 LLC, 335-7 LLC, 431 Holding LLC, 699 Venture Corp., FGP 309 LLC..(Cooper, Charles)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Rent Guidelines Board, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 226 LLC, 335-7 LLC, 431 Holding LLC, 699 Venture Corp., FGP 309 LLC..(Cooper, Charles)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 226 LLC, 335-7 LLC, 431 Holding LLC, 699 Venture Corp., FGP 309 LLC..(Cooper, Charles)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cooper, Charles) Modified on 2/7/2020 (pne).
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York, New York City Rent Guidelines Board, Ruthanne Visnauskas. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18719656)Document filed by 226 LLC, FGP 309 LLC, 335-7 LLC, 431 Holding LLC, 699 Venture Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arnold NY Superior Court Opinion, #2 Exhibit 1589 Ocean Realty DHCR Opinion, #3 Exhibit Avemm Corporation DHCR Opinion).(Cooper, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 335-7 LLC et al v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 431 Holding LLC
Represented By: Brian W Barnes
Represented By: Charles J Cooper
Represented By: David H Thompson
Represented By: Peter A Patterson
Represented By: Nicole Frazer Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 226 LLC
Represented By: Brian W Barnes
Represented By: Charles J Cooper
Represented By: David H Thompson
Represented By: Peter A Patterson
Represented By: Nicole Frazer Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 335-7 LLC
Represented By: Brian W Barnes
Represented By: Charles J Cooper
Represented By: David H Thompson
Represented By: Peter A Patterson
Represented By: Nicole Frazer Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FGP 309 LLC
Represented By: Brian W Barnes
Represented By: Charles J Cooper
Represented By: David H Thompson
Represented By: Peter A Patterson
Represented By: Nicole Frazer Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 699 Venture Corp.
Represented By: Brian W Barnes
Represented By: Charles J Cooper
Represented By: David H Thompson
Represented By: Peter A Patterson
Represented By: Nicole Frazer Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Rachel Kane Moston
Represented By: Claudia Brodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruthanne Visnauskas
Represented By: Michael Adam Berg
Represented By: Shi-Shi Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Rent Guidelines Board
Represented By: Rachel Kane Moston
Represented By: Claudia Brodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NY Tenants & Neighbors (T&N)
Represented By: Michael Duke
Represented By: Sean Patrick Baldwin
Represented By: Caitlin Joan Halligan
Represented By: Thaddeus C. Eagles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Community Voices Heard (CVH)
Represented By: Michael Duke
Represented By: Sean Patrick Baldwin
Represented By: Caitlin Joan Halligan
Represented By: Thaddeus C. Eagles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?