KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. v. AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP et al
Plaintiff: KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. a/k/a Kinney Drugs, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. and Kinney Drugs
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01096
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #35 MOTION for Joseph N. Roda to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
March 31, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Joseph N. Roda to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit CA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Roda, Joseph) Modified on 3/31/2020 (ad). Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19183733
March 27, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Schock on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical, Inc...(Schock, Matthew)
March 27, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carolyn Suzanne Wall on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical, Inc...(Wall, Carolyn)
March 27, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Johnston Williamson on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical, Inc...(Williamson, Brett)
March 27, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jay Frackman on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical, Inc...(Frackman, Andrew)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Dianne M Nast to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan)(Text Only Order) (Kaplan, Lewis)
March 25, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #29 MOTION for Dianne M. Nast to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19225041. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
March 25, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Dianne M. Nast to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19225041. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit NJ Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit PA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Nast, Dianne)
March 24, 2020 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 3/16/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie)
March 24, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC waiver sent on 3/16/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie)
March 24, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Astrazeneca UK Limited waiver sent on 3/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie)
March 24, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP waiver sent on 3/16/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie)
March 24, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Astrazeneca LP waiver sent on 3/16/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie)
March 20, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #23 MOTION for Joseph N. Roda to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19183733. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California (Copy and paste this link) https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/pdf/Attorney/certificate-of-good-standing-contact-list.pdf ;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (ad)
March 20, 2020 Filing 23 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PRO HAC VICE MOTION - MOTION for Joseph N. Roda to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19183733. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit CA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Roda, Joseph) Modified on 3/22/2020 (ad). Modified on 3/22/2020 (ad).
March 17, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #22 MOTION for Michael David Ford to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19142435. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 17, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Michael David Ford to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19142435. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit PA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Ford, Michael)
March 16, 2020 Filing 21 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-07233. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #19 MOTION for Michael L. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/2/2020) (jca)
February 27, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Michael L. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18940605. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
February 27, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Michael L. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18940605. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Roberts, Michael)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE SCHEDULING AND INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/25/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 21B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/26/2020) (jca)
February 18, 2020 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Par Pharmaceutical, Inc...(dnh)
February 18, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC..(dnh)
February 18, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Astrazeneca UK Limited..(dnh)
February 18, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP..(dnh)
February 18, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Astrazeneca LP..(dnh)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #6 MOTION for Karen Sharp Halbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/12/2020) (jca)
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca UK Limited, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca L.P., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie)
February 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Stephanie Smith. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party information was entered incorrectly. (pne)
February 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stephanie Smith. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None); County code St. Lawrence. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
February 10, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
February 10, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
February 10, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
February 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Karen Sharp Halbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18745132. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Karen Sharp Halbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18745132. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. a/k/a Kinney Drugs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit AR Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Halbert, Karen)
February 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Sarah E. DeLoach to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18744970. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
February 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Sarah E. DeLoach to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18744970. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Sarah E. DeLoach to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18744970. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. a/k/a Kinney Drugs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit AR Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(DeLoach, Sarah)
February 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Stephanie Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18733578. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Stephanie Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18733578. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. a/k/a Kinney Drugs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Smith, Stephanie)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. a/k/a Kinney Drugs, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Smith, Stephanie)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18733386)Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. a/k/a Kinney Drugs, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. v. AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca UK Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Jay Frackman
Represented By: Matthew Schock
Represented By: Carolyn Suzanne Wall
Represented By: Brett Johnston Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. a/k/a Kinney Drugs, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Smith
Represented By: Dianne M. Nast
Represented By: Karen Halbert
Represented By: Joseph N. Roda
Represented By: Michael L Roberts
Represented By: Sarah E. DeLoach
Represented By: Michael David Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinney Drugs
Represented By: Stephanie Smith
Represented By: Dianne M. Nast
Represented By: Karen Halbert
Represented By: Joseph N. Roda
Represented By: Michael L Roberts
Represented By: Sarah E. DeLoach
Represented By: Michael David Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?