Kewazinga Corp. v. Google LLC
Plaintiff: Kewazinga Corp.
Defendant: Google LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01106
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 27 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Ian G. DiBernardo dated April 6, 2020 re: Kewazinga's Response to Google's Request for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Kewazinga Corp...(DiBernardo, Ian)
April 6, 2020 Filing 26 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #25 Letter Requesting Leave To File Motion to Dismiss filed by Google LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs shall file a letter response by April 10, 2020. The initial pretrial conference, scheduled for April 9, 2020, is ADJOURNED to April 16, 2020, at 10:40 a.m. The conference will be telephonic. The Court will call the conference participants once the conference is ready to begin. The participants shall file a joint letter by April 14, 2020, providing the Court with one telephone call-in number for a conference call and, to the extent necessary, a passcode. The participants shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time., ( Initial Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/6/20) (yv)
April 3, 2020 Filing 25 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from John M. Desmarais dated April 3, 2020 re: Pre-Motion Letter Requesting Leave To File Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Google LLC..(Desmarais, John)
April 2, 2020 Filing 24 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Ian G. DiBernardo dated April 2, 2020 re: Initial Pretrial Conference Joint Letter. Document filed by Kewazinga Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order).(DiBernardo, Ian)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. The parties shall serve initial disclosures by April 16, 2020. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/1/20) (yv)
April 1, 2020 Filing 22 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to serve Initial Disclosures addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Elizabeth Weyl dated April 1, 2020. Document filed by Google LLC..(Weyl, Elizabeth)
March 25, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for Emily Chen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19227450. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
March 25, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Emily Chen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19227450. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Chen, Emily)
March 13, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Esther Weyl on behalf of Google LLC..(Weyl, Elizabeth)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application GRANTED. Defendant shall answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by April 6, 2020. Google LLC answer due 4/6/2020 (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/27/2020) (cf)
February 26, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of D.I. # 14 - Order of Hon. Lorna G. Schofield entered 2/25/2020, Individual Praces of the Hon. Lorna G. Schofield and the individual Practices of the Hon. Gabriel W. Gorenstein served on John M. Desmarais, Counsel for Defendant Google LLC on 2/25/2020. Service was made by E-Mail. Document filed by Kewazinga Corp...(DiBernardo, Ian)
February 26, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from John M. Desmarais dated February 26, 2020. Document filed by Google LLC..(Desmarais, John)
February 26, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Michael Desmarais on behalf of Google LLC..(Desmarais, John)
February 25, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Kelso Gilman on behalf of Kewazinga Corp...(Gilman, Timothy)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/9/2020 at 10:40 AM in Courtroom 1106 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/25/2020) (mro)
February 21, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Google LLC served on 2/13/2020, answer due 3/5/2020. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, Designated Agent. Document filed by Kewazinga Corp...(DiBernardo, Ian)
February 13, 2020 Filing 12 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(sj)
February 12, 2020 Filing 11 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(DiBernardo, Ian)
February 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PATENT FORM. Notice to Attorney Ian Gregg DiBernardo to RE-FILE Document No. #7 AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form is not correct; the date filed field on the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form is not correct. Re-file the document using the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 120 Patent/Trademark PDF form. (sj)
February 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Saunak Kirti Desai on behalf of Kewazinga Corp...(Desai, Saunak)
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Lawrence Stein on behalf of Kewazinga Corp...(Stein, Kenneth)
February 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Springsted on behalf of Kewazinga Corp...(Springsted, Gregory)
February 11, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT AO 120 FORM PATENT - PDF ERROR AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(DiBernardo, Ian) Modified on 2/12/2020 (sj).
February 10, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
February 10, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
February 10, 2020 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 18CV4500 and declined by Judge Gregory Woods and returned to wheel for assignment. (wb)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Google LLC..(jgo)
February 10, 2020 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (jgo)
February 10, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Gregory H. Woods as possibly related to 18-cv-4500. (jgo)
February 10, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 10, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Google LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kewazinga Corp...(DiBernardo, Ian)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-04500 (GHW). Document filed by Kewazinga Corp...(DiBernardo, Ian)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kewazinga Corp...(DiBernardo, Ian)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(DiBernardo, Ian)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Google LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18733820)Document filed by Kewazinga Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 9,055,234, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent 6,522,325, #3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent 6,535226).(DiBernardo, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kewazinga Corp. v. Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kewazinga Corp.
Represented By: Ian Gregg DiBernardo
Represented By: Gregory Springsted
Represented By: Saunak Kirti Desai
Represented By: Kenneth Lawrence Stein
Represented By: Timothy Kelso Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Emily Chen
Represented By: John Michael Desmarais
Represented By: Elizabeth Esther Weyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?