Tillman v. The New York City Department of Human Resources Administration et al
Plaintiff: Tammara Tillman
Defendant: Michael Greene, The New York City Department of Human Resources Administration, Robert Houser, Klara Shoumaker, Stephanie Grant, Maria Ciniglio and Rad Jacuch
Case Number: 1:2020cv01153
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: The New York City Department of Human Resources Administration answer due 5/27/2020. (yv)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/26/20) (yv)
March 25, 2020 Filing 10 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Amanda C. Croushore dated March 25, 2020. Document filed by The New York City Department of Human Resources Administration..(Croushore, Amanda)
March 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Christine Croushore on behalf of The New York City Department of Human Resources Administration..(Croushore, Amanda)
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL for Tammara Tillman. Mediator to be Assigned by 3/16/2020..(Aziza, Monique)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Tammara Tillman, at 490 Watkins St. Brooklyn, NY 11212, on 2/21/2020 Re: #6 Order of Service, via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (bwa)
February 21, 2020 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 2/21/2020 Re: Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s)The New York City Department of Human Resources, Robert Houser, Michael Greene, Maria Cingilio, Rad Jacuch, Klara Shoumaker, Stephanie Grant. (bwa)
February 21, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maria Ciniglio, Stephanie Grant, Michael Greene, Robert Houser, Rad Jacuch, Klara Shoumaker, The New York City Department of Human Resources Administration. (bwa)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for the New York City Department of Human Resources Administration, Robert Houser, Michael Greene, Maria Cingilio, Rad Jacuch, Klara Shoumaker, and Stephanie Grant and deliver to the U.S. Marshals Service all documents necessary to effect service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all claims asserted on behalf of D.S.M. as dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate D.S.M as a plaintiff in this action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 2/20/20) (yv) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR PRO SE EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION CASES...this pro se case is referred for mediation to the Court's Mediation Program. Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Mediation Program Procedures shall govern the mediation. Unless otherwise ordered, the mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court, and all parties are obligated to continue to litigate the case....that the Clerk of Court shall attempt to locate pro bono counsel to represent the plaintiff at the mediation. Pro bono counsel will contact Plaintiff directly. The time to assign a mediator under Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Court's Mediation Program Procedures will be deferred until pro bono counsel has filed a Notice of Limited Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel. Pro bono counsel will represent Plaintiff solely for purposes of the mediation, and that representation will terminate at the conclusion of the mediation process.....that any objection by the plaintiff to either the mediation or to the Court's request for pro bono counsel to represent the plaintiff in the mediation must be filed within 14 days of this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 2/20/20) (yv)
February 14, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
February 14, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
February 12, 2020 Mailed a copy of #3 Order Granting IFP Application to Tammara Tillman 490 Watkins St. Brooklyn, NY 11212. (aea)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/11/2020) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
February 7, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tillman v. The New York City Department of Human Resources Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New York City Department of Human Resources Administration
Represented By: Amanda Christine Croushore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klara Shoumaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Ciniglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rad Jacuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammara Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?