HartFord Fire Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone, LLC
Plaintiff: Smith Affiliates Management Corp., SAMCO Properties, Inc and HartFord Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01292
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. It is hereby ordered that the initial conference in the above-captioned action, currently scheduled to be held on Friday, April 10, 2020, shall be rescheduled to Friday, May 15, 2020 at 4:00 p.m. (Initial Conference set for 5/15/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Victor Marrero.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/3/2020) (rro)
April 3, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Matthew Miller dated April 3, 2020. Document filed by Broan-Nutone, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Miller, Matthew)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the initial conference in the above-captioned action, currently scheduled to be held on Friday, March 27, 2020, shall be rescheduled to Friday, April 10, 2020 at 3:15 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 4/10/2020 at 03:15 PM before Judge Victor Marrero). (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/24/2020) (rjm)
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew George Miller on behalf of Broan-Nutone, LLC..(Miller, Matthew)
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Higgins Kane on behalf of HartFord Fire Insurance Company..(Kane, John)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the Honorable Victor Marrero for an initial case management conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on Friday, March 27, 2020 at 3:45 p.m. in Courtroom 15B at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences, and as further set forth in this Order. (Initial Conference set for 3/27/2020 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 15B, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Victor Marrero). (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/24/2020) (rjm)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Broan-Nutone, LLC..(Osterman, David)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nortek, Inc. for Broan-Nutone, LLC. Document filed by Broan-Nutone, LLC..(Osterman, David)
February 19, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney David Scott Osterman to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Broan-Nutone, LLC..(Osterman, David) Modified on 2/19/2020 (ldi).
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Osterman, David)
February 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Scott Osterman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: HartFord Fire Insurance Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (pne)
February 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney David Scott Osterman. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: SAMCO Properties, Inc, Smith Affiliates Management Corp.. The parties were added to the case in error. (pne)
February 14, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
February 14, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
February 14, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
February 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney David Scott Osterman. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NEW YORK, County of NEW YORK. Case Number: 650239/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18795966).Document filed by Broan-Nutone, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint).(Osterman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HartFord Fire Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith Affiliates Management Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMCO Properties, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HartFord Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: John Higgins Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC
Represented By: David Scott Osterman
Represented By: Matthew George Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?