Calderon et al v. Clearview AI, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Rocio and Mario Calderon
Defendant: Clearview AI, Inc. and CDW Government LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01296
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Frank S. Hedin in Support re: #17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
April 9, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Scott A. Bursor in Support re: #17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
April 9, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
April 9, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
April 9, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Joshua D. Arisohn dated April 9, 2020 re: Diversity Jurisdiction. Document filed by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
April 6, 2020 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc...(Wolosky, Lee)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. OK. Will there be a motion to consolidate these cases? If so, when? CDW Government LLC answer due 4/24/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/4/2020) (mml)
March 3, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Joshua Dunn dated March 3, 2020. Document filed by CDW Government LLC..(Dunn, Joshua)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. OK. Clearview AI, Inc. answer due 4/24/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/27/2020) (mml)
February 26, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Lee Wolosky dated February 26, 2020. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc...(Wolosky, Lee)
February 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael W. Ross on behalf of Clearview AI, Inc...(Ross, Michael)
February 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lee Scott Wolosky on behalf of Clearview AI, Inc...(Wolosky, Lee)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. CDW Government LLC served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. Service was accepted by Lyle Neeman, Document Specialist at IL Corp. Svc. Co.. Document filed by Mario Calderon; Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Clearview AI, Inc. served on 2/19/2020, answer due 3/11/2020. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Intake Specialist at CT Corp.. Document filed by Mario Calderon; Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Clearview AI, Inc...(pne)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CDW Government LLC..(pne)
February 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua David Arisohn. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
February 14, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
February 14, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
February 14, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CDW Government LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Clearview AI, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Arisohn, Joshua)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CDW Government LLC, Clearview AI, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18796618)Document filed by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calderon et al v. Clearview AI, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Rocio
Represented By: Joshua David Arisohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Calderon
Represented By: Joshua David Arisohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearview AI, Inc.
Represented By: Lee Scott Wolosky
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDW Government LLC
Represented By: Joshua Alan Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?