Wiley v. Altice USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ms. Brittany Wiley and Brittany Wiley
Defendant: Altice USA, Inc.
Consolidated Plaintiff: Edward Hellyer
Case Number: 1:2020cv01297
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/4/2020. Motions due by 6/15/2020. Responses due by 7/27/2020 Replies due by 8/10/2020. (rj)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Accordingly, it is ORDERED:1. The following Related Actions are consolidated for all pre-trial proceedings (the "Consolidated Action"): Abbreviated Case Name; Case No.; Date Filed: Wiley v. Altice USA, Inc., 20-CV-1297, Feb. 13, 2020. Hellyer v. Altice USA, Inc., 20-CV-1410, Feb. 18, 2020. 2. The Related Actions shall be consolidated under the lead docket, No. 20-CV-1297. Any new filings shall be made on the lead docket. Any dates and deadlines from No. 20-CV-1410 shall continue to apply in the lead docket. 3. In the event that a case that arises out of the same subject matter of the Consolidated Action is hereafter filed in this Court or transferred from another court ("a newly filed case"), defense counsel shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on the attorneys for the plaintiff(s) in the newly filed case and one or more of the parties shall promptly notify the Court so it may determine if the newly filed case should be consolidated in the Consolidated Action. 4. If the Court consolidates a newly filed case with the Consolidated Action, this Order shall apply thereto. Any objection to such consolidation must be filed within ten (10) days after the date upon which the Court orders consolidation by filing a letter motion in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices; any response to such a letter motion shall be filed within three business days. Nothing in the foregoing shall be construed as a waiver of the Defendant's right to object to consolidation of any subsequently filed or transferred action. 5. Pursuant to Rule 5(b)(2)(E) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, service by email transmission shall be permitted in addition to service via ECF notification. 6. Plaintiffs shall have 30 days from April 3, 2020, to file a consolidated class action complaint in the Consolidated Action, which shall be due Monday, May 4, 2020. Plaintiff Wileyand any factual allegations associated with her individual circumstances shall be dismissed from the action, and additional named plaintiffs shall be added who plaintiffs believe did not sign an arbitration agreement with Defendant. 7. Defendant shall have 40 days following the filing of the consolidated class action complaint to answer or file any Rule 12 motion, which shall be due on Monday, June 15, 2020. 8. If Defendant files a Rule 12 motion, Plaintiffs shall have 40 days from such filing to respond, with such brief due on Monday, July 27, 2020. 9. Defendant shall have 15 days within which to reply to Plaintiffs' opposition, which shall be due on Monday, August 10, 2020. 10. According to Rule 23(g)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court appoints William B. Federman of Federman & Sherwood as interim lead counsel for the putative class in the Consolidated Action. The Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate 20-CV-1297 and 20-CV-1410 under the lead docket, 20-CV-1297, and to close 20-CV-1410. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/8/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01297-JMF, 1:20-cv-01410-JMF (rj)
April 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #28 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
April 3, 2020 Filing 28 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Brittany Wiley. Related Document Number: #23 ..(Bond, Cedric) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 3, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cedric Bond on behalf of Brittany Wiley..(Bond, Cedric)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: With apologies for the late notice, the time of the telephone conference tomorrow is CHANGED to 11:45 a.m. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman) (Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Cedric Christian Micaiah Bond to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
April 2, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #24 MOTION for Cedric Christian Micaiah Bond to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19315329. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
April 2, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Cedric Christian Micaiah Bond to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19315329. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Brittany Wiley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of CCMB in Support of Application for Pro Hac, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Pro Hac Application).(Federman, William)
April 1, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 03:30 PM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. Telephone Conference set for 4/3/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (yv)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The requested extensions are GRANTED, except that the deadline in the event that the Court does not order consolidation shall run from the date of the Court's ruling because the Court sees no need to wait until May 14, 2020, to discuss the question of consolidation. Instead, it will hold a telephone conference on April 3, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. to address the question of consolidation. To access the conference, counsel should call (888) 363-4749 and use access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. (Members of the press and public may call the same number, but will not be permitted to speak during the conference.) Counsel should be sure to consult the Court's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices, available on the Court's website, and comply with the rules regarding conferences. In light of the foregoing, the May 14, 2020 initial pretrial conference is ADJOURNED to June 25, 2020, at 3:30 p.m. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 22 in Docket 20-CV-1297 and ECF No. 20 in Docket 20-CV-1410. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/1/20) (yv)
March 31, 2020 Filing 22 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Michelle A. Reed dated March 31, 2020. Document filed by Altice USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order).(Reed, Michelle)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Richard A. Cochrane to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
March 5, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for Richard A. Cochrane to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19009292. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER with respect to #16 Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Court will address the question of consolidation at the initial conferences on May 14, 2020. If any party believes that the question should be addressed, or the Court should hold a conference, sooner than that, it should confer with the other side and file a letter motion to that effect. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Elizabeth D. Scott to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Michelle A. Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
March 4, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Richard A. Cochrane to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19009292. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Altice USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard A. Cochrane, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Cochrane, Richard)
March 4, 2020 Filing 16 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases 20-cv-01410; 20-cv-01297 addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from William B. Federman dated 3/4/2020. Document filed by Brittany Wiley..(Federman, William)
March 4, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Elizabeth D. Scott to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
March 4, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Elizabeth D. Scott to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Altice USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth D. Scott, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Scott, Elizabeth)
March 4, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Michelle A. Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 4, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Michelle A. Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Altice USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michelle A. Reed, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Reed, Michelle)
March 4, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #12 MOTION for Michelle A. Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19004501. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #13 MOTION for Elizabeth D. Scott to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19004765. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT OF TEXAS. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
March 4, 2020 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Elizabeth D. Scott to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19004765. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Altice USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth D. Scott, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Scott, Elizabeth) Modified on 3/4/2020 (aea).
March 4, 2020 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Michelle A. Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19004501. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Altice USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michelle A. Reed, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Reed, Michelle) Modified on 3/4/2020 (aea).
March 2, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Altice USA, Inc...(Baldini, Stephen)
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE re: #6 Order,,, . Document filed by Altice USA, Inc...(Baldini, Stephen)
March 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Michael Baldini on behalf of Altice USA, Inc...(Baldini, Stephen)
March 2, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order Consolidating Cases, Notice of Pretrial Conference & JMF Civil Individual Practices served on Altice USA, Inc on 2/27/20. Service was made by Email. Document filed by Brittany Wiley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Re. Case Consolidation, #2 Exhibit Notice of Pretrial Conference, #3 Exhibit JMF Civil Individual Practices).(Federman, William)
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Altice USA, Inc. waiver sent on 2/27/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. Document filed by Brittany Wiley..(Federman, William)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: On February 13, 2020, Plaintiff Wiley filed a complaint in 20-CV-1297. On February 18, 2020, Plaintiff Hellyer filed a similar complaint in 20-CV-1410. As of this Order, no motion for consolidation has been filed, but 20-CV-1410 has been accepted by the Court as related to 20-CV-1297, and the cases appear to involve common questions of law and fact. The Court is inclined to consolidate the cases pursuant to Rule 42 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for all purposes. Any party who objects to such consolidation shall file a letter brief, not to exceed three single-spaced pages, by March 2, 2020. If no party files a letter opposing consolidation, the Court will consolidate the two cases without further notice to the parties. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant and file proof of service on Plaintiffs' respective dockets. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/24/2020) (ama)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/14/2020 at 04:15 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/18/2020) (jca)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Altice USA, Inc...(dnh)
February 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney William Bernard Federman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Dollar Demand $5,000,001,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to None; no dollar demand entered on civil cover sheet. (pne)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Altice USA, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Brittany Wiley..(Federman, William)
February 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney William Bernard Federman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Brittany Wiley, Altice USA, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pne)
February 14, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
February 14, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
February 14, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Federman, William)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Altice USA, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18796847)Document filed by Brittany Wiley..(Federman, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiley v. Altice USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Brittany Wiley
Represented By: William Bernard Federman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Wiley
Represented By: Cedric Bond
Represented By: William Bernard Federman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altice USA, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Michael Baldini
Represented By: Michelle A Reed
Represented By: Richard A. Cochrane
Represented By: Elizabeth Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Edward Hellyer
Represented By: Richard Adam Acocelli, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?