A.P. et al v. New York City Department of Education
Plaintiff: F.R., A.P. and N-E.P.
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2020cv01362
Filed: February 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. In violation of the Court's Individual Practices, this request is untimely and fails to state whether Plaintiffs consent to the request. The Court is, however, understanding of the hardship placed on counsel's office due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic. Accordingly, the request is GRANTED IN PART. The deadlines discussed in the letter are extended 30 days, and there will be no further extensions of time. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 4/16/2020) (mro)
April 15, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Martin Bowe dated April 15, 2020. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Bowe, Martin)
April 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Janine Kapp on behalf of New York City Department of Education..(Kapp, Janine)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/17/2020) New York City Department of Education answer due 4/16/2020 (ks)
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Jill A. Ellman dated 3/13/20. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Ellman, Jill)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jill Amy Ellman on behalf of New York City Department of Education..(Ellman, Jill)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education..(dnh)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint served. New York City Department of Education served on 2/25/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. Service was accepted by Lemar Reid, Docketing Clerk. Document filed by F.R.(on behalf of N-E.P.); A.P.(individually); F.R.(individually); A.P.(on behalf of N-E.P.)..(Walsh, Tracey)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by A.P.(individually), A.P.(on behalf of N-E.P.), F.R.(on behalf of N-E.P.), F.R.(individually)..(Walsh, Tracey)
February 18, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
February 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
February 18, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
February 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Tracey Spencer Walsh. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: N-E.P.. The party was added to the case in error. (dnh)
February 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Tracey Spencer Walsh. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: A.P.; F.R.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh)
February 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Walsh, Tracey)
February 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18824639)Document filed by F.R.(on behalf of N-E.P.), A.P., F.R., A.P.(on behalf of N-E.P.), N-E.P...(Walsh, Tracey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.P. et al v. New York City Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Martin John Bowe, Jr
Represented By: Janine Kapp
Represented By: Jill Amy Ellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.R.
Represented By: Tracey Spencer Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.P.
Represented By: Tracey Spencer Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N-E.P.
Represented By: Tracey Spencer Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?