Cigala v. Boy Scouts of America et al
Plaintiff: Michael Cigala
Defendant: Greater New York Councils, Boy Scouts of America and Boy Scouts of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv01539
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1334
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Michael L. Kenny Jr. dated April 17, 2020 re: Status of Case. Document filed by Boy Scouts of America, Greater New York Councils, Boy Scouts of America..(Kenny, Michael)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status letter by April 17, 2020. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/14/2020) (cf)
March 31, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Consent Order and Granting the BSA's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Order).(Kenny, Michael)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: APPLICATION GRANTED. The joint status letter is due on April 9, 2020. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/27/2020) (jwh)
March 26, 2020 Filing 13 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joint Status Letter addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Michael L. Kenny Jr. dated March 26, 2020. Document filed by Boy Scouts of America, Greater New York Councils, Boy Scouts of America..(Kenny, Michael)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. The parties shall file the joint status letter on March 26, 2020. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/6/2020) (cf)
March 5, 2020 Filing 11 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joint Status Letter addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Michael L. Kenny Jr. dated March 5, 2020. Document filed by Boy Scouts of America, Greater New York Councils, Boy Scouts of America..(Kenny, Michael)
March 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael G. Dowd on behalf of Michael Cigala..(Dowd, Michael)
March 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of COMMENCEMENT OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDING. Document filed by Boy Scouts of America, Greater New York Councils, Boy Scouts of America..(Kenny, Michael)
March 3, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Michael Cigala.(Sweeney, Gerard)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Rule 9027(e)(3) Statement. Document filed by Michael Cigala..(Sweeney, Gerard)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gerard J. Sweeney on behalf of Michael Cigala..(Sweeney, Gerard)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for the Non-Debtor Defendants to answer or otherwise respond is adjourned to March 31, 2020. Non-Debtor Defendants shall include in the status letter due on March 26, 2020, information regarding the March 24, 2020, hearing. Boy Scouts of America answer due 3/31/2020; Greater New York Councils, Boy Scouts of America answer due 3/31/2020 (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/2/2020) (cf)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Michael L. Kenney Jr. dated 02/27/20. Document filed by Boy Scouts of America, Greater New York Councils, Boy Scouts of America..(Kenny, Michael)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a status letter every thirty days on progress with the motion to transfer and the bankruptcy proceedings. The first status letter is due on March 26, 2020. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall by March 5, 2020, file a joint letter. The joint status letter should not exceed 5 pages, and should provide the following information in separate paragraphs: 1. A brief statement of the nature of the case, the principal claims and defenses, and the major legal and factual issues that are most important to resolving the case, whether by trial, settlement or dispositive motion; as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/26/2020) (cf)
February 21, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 21, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 21, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kenny, Michael)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 950162/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18869355).Document filed by Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File).(Kenny, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cigala v. Boy Scouts of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater New York Councils, Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Michael Leo Kenny, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Michael Leo Kenny, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cigala
Represented By: Michael G. Dowd
Represented By: Gerard J. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?