Ziomber v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ZIOMBER
Defendant: METRO-NORTH COMMUTER RAILROAD COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2020cv01647
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Michael Ziomber..(Kantor, Steven)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Steven Kantor dated 04/22/20 re: brief of case. Document filed by Michael Ziomber..(Kantor, Steven)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/13/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/16/2020) (jwh)
March 16, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Answer and Rule 7.1 Statement served on Steven L. Kantor on March 16, 2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company..(Muraidekh, Alan)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company..(Muraidekh, Alan)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company..(Muraidekh, Alan)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. Service was accepted by Belinda. Document filed by Michael Ziomber..(Kantor, Steven)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kantor, Steven)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company..(pne)
February 26, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Steven Lawrence Kantor. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
February 26, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven Lawrence Kantor. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Westchester. (pne)
February 26, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven Lawrence Kantor. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Michael Ziomber, Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pne)
February 26, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
February 26, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
February 26, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to METRO-NORTH COMMUTER RAILROAD COMPANY, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by MICHAEL ZIOMBER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Kantor, Steven)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against METRO-NORTH COMMUTER RAILROAD COMPANY. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18914297)Document filed by MICHAEL ZIOMBER..(Kantor, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ziomber v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ZIOMBER
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METRO-NORTH COMMUTER RAILROAD COMPANY
Represented By: Alan Muraidekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?