McDaniel v. Revlon Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Edward McDaniel and Laura McDaniel
Defendant: Revlon Inc., Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc. and Revlon, Inc. as Successor-in-Interest to Jean Nate
Case Number: 1:2020cv01711
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446as
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Jason Michael Hodrinsky. Document No. #11 Certificate of Compliance. This document is not filed via ECF. If filed, this document should be added as ATTACHMENTS to the Memorandum in Support of Motion. (db)
April 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jason Michael Hodrinsky to RE-FILE Document #10 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Law. Use the event type Memorandum in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Oppositions and Supporting Documents, then link to #9 Motion. (db)
April 13, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice., #9 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice., #10 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Law., #11 MOTION to Dismiss Order. . Document filed by Edward McDaniel, Laura McDaniel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Compliance).(Hodrinsky, Jason)
April 6, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice. . Document filed by Revlon, Inc. as Successor-in-Interest to Jean Nate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pltf Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit WCD Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit WCD Answer in Federal Court Action, #4 Exhibit Pltf Summons and Complaint served on Revlon, #5 Exhibit Revlon Answer in Federal Court Action).(McCann, Timothy)
April 6, 2020 Filing 12 FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice. . Document filed by Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2020-02-27 - Pltf Cert. of Service on WCD, #2 Exhibit 2020-02-28 - Pltf Cert. of Service on Revlon).(Damico, Gregory)
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION to Dismiss Order. Document filed by Edward McDaniel, Laura McDaniel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit NYCAL CMO).(Hodrinsky, Jason) Modified on 4/23/2020 (db).
March 27, 2020 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Law. Document filed by Edward McDaniel, Laura McDaniel. (Hodrinsky, Jason) Modified on 4/23/2020 (db).
March 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice. Document filed by Edward McDaniel, Laura McDaniel..(Hodrinsky, Jason)
March 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jason Michael Hodrinsky to RE-FILE Document #8 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice. ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion is found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice. Document filed by Edward McDaniel, Laura McDaniel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit NYCAL Procedures, #4 Certificate of Complaince).(Hodrinsky, Jason) Modified on 3/24/2020 (ldi).
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by Revlon, Inc. as Successor-in-Interest to Jean Nate..(McCann, Timothy)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Revlon, Inc. as Successor-in-Interest to Jean Nate..(McCann, Timothy)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Michael Hodrinsky on behalf of Edward McDaniel, Laura McDaniel..(Hodrinsky, Jason)
February 27, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Revlon, Inc. as Successor-in-Interest to Jean Nate added. Party added pursuant to #1 Notice of Removal,.Document filed by Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,..(Damico, Gregory)
February 27, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
February 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
February 27, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
February 27, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gregory C Damico. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $45,000,000,000; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $45,000,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
February 27, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gregory C Damico re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add party 'Revlon, Inc.' in it's second capacity 'as Successor-in-Interest to Jean Nate.' Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (dnh)
February 27, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gregory C Damico. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Edward McDaniel, Revlon Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (dnh)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc...(Damico, Gregory)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Soco West, Inc. for Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.. Document filed by Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc...(Damico, Gregory)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Damico, Gregory)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 190058/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18931531).Document filed by Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons and Verified Complaint).(Damico, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel v. Revlon Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward McDaniel
Represented By: Jason Michael Hodrinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura McDaniel
Represented By: Jason Michael Hodrinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revlon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory C Damico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revlon, Inc. as Successor-in-Interest to Jean Nate
Represented By: Timothy M. McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?