Pfizer Inc. v. Fedex Express Transportation and Supply Chain Services (India) Private Limited et al
Plaintiff: Pfizer Inc.
Defendant: FEDEX TRADE NETWORKS TRANSPORT & BROKERAGE PRIVATE LIMITED and FEDEX EXPRESS TRANSPORTATION AND SUPPLY CHAIN SERVICES (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Federal Express Corporation and Four Seasons Services, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Service One Transport, Inc.,
Case Number: 1:2020cv01745
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Service One Transport, Inc., waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. Document filed by Four Seasons Services, Inc...(Dooley, Teresa)
August 7, 2020 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Service One Transport, Inc.. (sj)
August 6, 2020 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Service One Transport, Inc., re: #23 Fourth Party Complaint,. Document filed by Four Seasons Services, Inc...(Dooley, Teresa)
August 6, 2020 Filing 23 FOURTH PARTY COMPLAINT against Service One Transport, Inc.,.Document filed by Four Seasons Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons and Third-Party Complaint, #3 Exhibit Four Season's Answer).(Dooley, Teresa)
August 4, 2020 Filing 22 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Service One Transport, Inc.,.Document filed by Four Seasons Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Summons and Third-Party Complaint, #3 Exhibit Four Season's Answer).(Dooley, Teresa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #20 Answer to Third Party Complaint,,,. Document filed by Four Seasons Services, Inc...(Dooley, Teresa)
July 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Teresa H Dooley to RE-FILE Document No. #20 Answer to Third Party Complaint,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; Caption title reads Answer to Third Party Complaint. Do not select Third Party Complaint. (pc)
July 21, 2020 Filing 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - ANSWER to #11 Third Party Complaint., THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Federal Express Corporation. Document filed by Four Seasons Services, Inc...(Dooley, Teresa) Modified on 7/22/2020 (pc).
July 21, 2020 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Four Seasons Services, Inc...(Dooley, Teresa)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #16 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Teresa H. Dooley dated July 26, 2020 re: Granting Stipulation and Order Extending Time to Answer. Document filed by Four Seasons Services, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Although no stipulation seems to have been filed on the docket, the request for an extension for Four Seasons to respond to the Third-Party Complaint to July 21, 2020 is so ordered. Four Seasons Services, Inc. answer due 7/21/2020. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/26/2020) (rjm)
June 26, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Teresa H. Dooley dated July 26, 2020 re: Granting Stipulation and Order Extending Time to Answer. Document filed by Four Seasons Services, Inc...(Dooley, Teresa)
June 26, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Teresa H. Dooley dated July 26, 2020 re: Granting Stipulation and Order Extending Time to Answer. Document filed by Four Seasons Services, Inc...(Dooley, Teresa)
June 25, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Teresa H Dooley on behalf of Four Seasons Services, Inc...(Dooley, Teresa)
June 9, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Third Party Complaint served. Four Seasons Services, Inc. served on 6/2/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. Service was accepted by Rick Harrison. Document filed by Federal Express Corporation..(Coleman, Brian)
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Four Seasons Services, Inc...(pc)
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Four Seasons Services, Inc., re: #11 Third Party Complaint. Document filed by Federal Express Corporation..(Coleman, Brian)
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Four Seasons Services, Inc..Document filed by Federal Express Corporation..(Coleman, Brian)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #9 Motion for Thomas W. Murrey, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Thomas W. Murrey, Jr., for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HERBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/18/20) (yv)
May 14, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Thomas W. Murrey, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19826879. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Thomas W. Murrey, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19826879. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Federal Express Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Coleman, Brian)
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Federal Express Corporation..(Coleman, Brian)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent FedEx Corporation for Federal Express Corporation. Document filed by Federal Express Corporation..(Coleman, Brian)
March 24, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Federal Express Corporation waiver sent on 3/11/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. Document filed by Pfizer Inc...(Schmidt, Charles)
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Express Transportation and Supply Chain Services (India) Private Limited, Fedex Trade Networks Transport & Brokerage Private Limited..(dnh)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FEDEX EXPRESS TRANSPORTATION AND SUPPLY CHAIN SERVICES (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED, FEDEX TRADE NETWORKS TRANSPORT & BROKERAGE PRIVATE LIMITED, AND FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Pfizer Inc...(Schmidt, Charles)
March 4, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Judge John G. Koeltl is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
March 3, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Valerie E. Caproni is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
March 2, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
February 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Charles Edward Schmidt. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Fedex Express Transportation and Supply Chain Services (India) Private Limited, Fedex Trade Networks Transport & Brokerage Private Limited. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pne)
February 28, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
February 28, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
February 28, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pfizer Inc...(Schmidt, Charles)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schmidt, Charles)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FEDEX EXPRESS TRANSPORTATION AND SUPPLY CHAIN SERVICES (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED, FEDEX TRADE NETWORKS TRANSPORT & BROKERAGE PRIVATE LIMITED, Federal Express Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18942854)Document filed by Pfizer Inc...(Schmidt, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pfizer Inc. v. Fedex Express Transportation and Supply Chain Services (India) Private Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Charles Edward Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Federal Express Corporation
Represented By: Brian K Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Four Seasons Services, Inc.
Represented By: Teresa H Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDEX TRADE NETWORKS TRANSPORT & BROKERAGE PRIVATE LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDEX EXPRESS TRANSPORTATION AND SUPPLY CHAIN SERVICES (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Service One Transport, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?