Wu v. Telaria, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Yongwen Wu
Defendant: Doug Knopper, Rachel Lam, Kevin Thompson, Mark Zagorski, James Rossman, Robert Schechter, Warren Lee, Telaria, Inc. and Paul Caine
Case Number: 1:2020cv01790
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Paul Caine, Doug Knopper, Rachel Lam, Warren Lee, James Rossman, Robert Schechter, Telaria, Inc., Kevin Thompson, Mark Zagorski. Document filed by Yongwen Wu. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Acocelli, Richard)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: In light of the public health crisis, the Initial Pretrial Conference set for April 2, 2020 at 10:15 a.m. will proceed telephonically. All counsel are directed to call (888) 251-2909 and use Access Code 2123101. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/19/2020) (jca)
March 5, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:20-cv-01010-LJL. (va)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The above-captioned cases involve common questions of law and fact. For convenience, expedition, and judicial economy, and noting that no party has objected despite the opportunity to do so, the Court exercises its discretion to consolidate these cases into a single action. See Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a)(2). The Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate all cases listed above under case number 20-cv-01010, and to close all other cases. Counsel are directed to make filings only under case number 20-cv-01010. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/5/2020) (va)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This case has been assigned to the Court due to its relatedness with other matters currently pending before the undersigned. Counsel is directed to the Order (Dkt. No. 4) this Court recently issued in 1:20-cv-1011 (Stein v. Telaria, Inc. et al). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that such Order will apply in equal force to this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/3/2020) (va)
March 3, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
March 3, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
March 3, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-01010-LJL. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
March 2, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lewis J. Liman as possibly related to 20cv1010. (pc)
March 2, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 2, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
March 2, 2020 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-18958814, paid on 2/28/2020..(pc)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-01010. Document filed by Yongwen Wu..(Acocelli, Richard)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Acocelli, Richard)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul Caine, Doug Knopper, Rachel Lam, Warren Lee, James Rossman, Robert Schechter, Telaria, Inc., Kevin Thompson, Mark Zagorski. Document filed by Yongwen Wu..(Acocelli, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wu v. Telaria, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Knopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zagorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Rossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telaria, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Caine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yongwen Wu
Represented By: Richard Adam Acocelli, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?