V&A Collection, LLC v. Guzzini Properties Ltd.
Plaintiff: V&A Collection, LLC
Defendant: Guzzini Properties Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01797
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332co
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from defendant Guzzini dated 04/28/2020 re: pre-motion letter requesting scheduling order for motion to dismiss, and adjourning initial conference of 5/14/20. Document filed by Guzzini Properties Ltd...(Lerner, Richard)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/14/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/20/2020) (ks)
April 15, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by V&A Collection, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3).(Hogan, Lindsay)
April 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a MOTION proceeding held on 3/6/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 10, 2020 Filing 14 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: MOTION held on 3/6/2020 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/1/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2020..(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a motion proceeding held on 3/6/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 9, 2020 Filing 12 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: motion held on 3/6/2020 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/30/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2020..(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 10, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Wendy Lindstrom dated 03/10/2020 re: Representation concerning Artwork. Document filed by Guzzini Properties Ltd...(Lindstrom, Wendy)
March 6, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Oral Argument held on 3/6/2020 re: #9 Memorandum of Law in Support filed by V&A Collection, LLC. Attorneys Judd Benjamin Grossman and Lindsay Elizabeth Hogan representing Plaintiff present. Attorneys Richard E. Lerner and Wendy J. Lindstrom representing Defendant present. Plaintiff's motions are denied as moot. (Court Reporter Andrew Walker) (tn)
March 5, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Lindsay E. Hogan, Esq. in Support re: #8 Proposed Order,. Document filed by V&A Collection, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Document Requests, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Complaint in Related Action, #3 Exhibit 3 - Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Andre Sakhai and Exhibits A-E, #5 Exhibit 5 - Hearing Transcript, #6 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit 7 - Notice Email).(Hogan, Lindsay)
March 5, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 Proposed Order, AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF PROCESS BY ALTERNATE MEANS, AND EXPEDITED DISCOVERY CONCERNING THE LOCATION OF ARTWORK. Document filed by V&A Collection, LLC..(Hogan, Lindsay)
March 5, 2020 NOTICE OF HEARING: The parties are ORDERED to appear for an Oral Argument set for 3/6/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. ***No PDF is attached to this entry. (tn)
March 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #8 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by V&A Collection, LLC. (Attachments: #1 E-mail from Court Directing Plaintiff to File Order to Show Cause and Supporting Papers on ECF).(Hogan, Lindsay) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard E. Lerner on behalf of Guzzini Properties Ltd...(Lerner, Richard)
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Elizabeth Schuster on behalf of V&A Collection, LLC..(Schuster, Sarah)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay Elizabeth Hogan on behalf of V&A Collection, LLC..(Hogan, Lindsay)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Judd Benjamin Grossman on behalf of V&A Collection, LLC..(Grossman, Judd)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lindstrom, Wendy)
March 2, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
March 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
March 2, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
March 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Wendy J. Lindstrom to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; no cause of action was cited, no nature of suit nor jury demand chosen; only ONE Basis of jurisdiction can be chosen. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (sj)
March 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Wendy J. Lindstrom. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: V&A Collection, LLC; Guzzini Properties, LTD. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (sj)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET - PDF ERROR CIVIL COVER SHEET filed.(Lindstrom, Wendy) Modified on 3/2/2020 (sj).
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 651300/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18960897).Document filed by Guzzini Properties Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pleadings/papers filed in Supreme Court of the State of New York).(Lindstrom, Wendy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: V&A Collection, LLC v. Guzzini Properties Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guzzini Properties Ltd.
Represented By: Wendy J. Lindstrom
Represented By: Richard E. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V&A Collection, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Schuster
Represented By: Judd Benjamin Grossman
Represented By: Lindsay Elizabeth Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?