Saadeh v. Kagan et al
Plaintiff: Rafic Saadeh
Defendant: The Estate of Irving Kagan (by Its Administrator, Michael Kagan), Michael Kagan and The Estate of Irving Kagan
Case Number: 1:2020cv01945
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 oc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Richard J.J. Scarola dated March 12, 2020 re: Rule 4.D. of Judge Engelmayer's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases to set forth the basis for diversity jurisdiction in this case. Document filed by Rafic Saadeh..(Scarola, Richard)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Estate of Irving Kagan..(dnh)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Kagan..(dnh)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Estate of Irving Kagan, re: #4 Complaint,,. Document filed by Rafic Saadeh..(Scarola, Richard)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Kagan, re: #4 Complaint,,. Document filed by Rafic Saadeh..(Scarola, Richard)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard J.J. Scarola to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons, #1 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the form used for the summons is not the official AO 440 Summons form; the summons requests are not linked to the pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard J.J. Scarola. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The Estate of Irving Kagan. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was entered incorrectly as part of party name. (pne)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard J.J. Scarola. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $130,000,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $130,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S. (pne)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pne)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Michael Kagan, The Estate of Irving Kagan (by Its Administrator, Michael Kagan). (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19009397)Document filed by Rafic Saadeh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint - Loan Agreement dated June 29, 2017, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint - Wire Transfer dated July 3, 2017, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint - E-Mail Correspondence dated December 20-22, 2017, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint - E-Mail Correspondence dated May 28-31, 2018, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Complaint - E-Mail Correspondence dated July 2018 - January 2020, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Complaint - Estate of Kagan - Application to Surrogate's Court).(Scarola, Richard)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Scarola, Richard)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR PDF ERROR - SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Estate of Irving Kagan (by Its Administrator, Michael Kagan), re: Complaint. Document filed by Rafic Saadeh..(Scarola, Richard) Modified on 3/5/2020 (pne).
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR PDF ERROR - SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Kagan, re: Complaint. Document filed by Rafic Saadeh..(Scarola, Richard) Modified on 3/5/2020 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saadeh v. Kagan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Irving Kagan (by Its Administrator, Michael Kagan)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Irving Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafic Saadeh
Represented By: Richard J.J. Scarola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?