Bonano v. Ryder Truck Rental LT et al
Plaintiff: Luis E. Bonano
Defendant: Raab & Levit, Inc., Ryder Transportation Services Inc., John Doe, Ryder Truck Rental LT and Ryder Truck Rental LTD
Case Number: 1:2020cv01994
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441mv
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #5 Crossclaim. Document filed by John Doe, Raab & Levit, Inc...(Belmonte, Josefina)
April 15, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Raab & Levit, Inc...(Belmonte, Josefina)
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by John Doe, Raab & Levit, Inc...(Belmonte, Josefina)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Ryder Transportation Services Inc., Ryder Truck Rental LTD.(Zimmerman, Kevin)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against John Doe, Raab & Levit, Inc.. Document filed by Ryder Transportation Services Inc., Ryder Truck Rental LTD..(Zimmerman, Kevin)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/2/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/6/2020) (rro) Modified on 3/12/2020 (rro).
March 6, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
March 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
March 6, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
March 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kevin Michael Zimmerman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
March 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kevin Michael Zimmerman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ryder Truck Rental LT, Luis E. Bonano, John Doe. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (dnh)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Ryder System, Inc. for Ryder Transportation Services Inc., Ryder Truck Rental LT. Document filed by Ryder Transportation Services Inc., Ryder Truck Rental LT..(Zimmerman, Kevin)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zimmerman, Kevin)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 21871/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19024118).Document filed by Ryder Transportation Services Inc., Ryder Truck Rental LT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint).(Zimmerman, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonano v. Ryder Truck Rental LT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raab & Levit, Inc.
Represented By: Josefina Alicia Belmonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder Transportation Services Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Michael Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Josefina Alicia Belmonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder Truck Rental LT
Represented By: Kevin Michael Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder Truck Rental LTD
Represented By: Kevin Michael Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis E. Bonano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?