Zuffa, LLC v. Sugarman et al
Plaintiff: Zuffa, LLC d/b/a Ultimate Fighting Champsionship, Zuffa, LLC and Zuffa, LLC doing business as Ultimate Fighting Championship
Defendant: Eytan Sugarman, Individually, and as officer, director, shareholder, principal, manager and/or member of SHNY Restaurant Group, LLC d/b/a Ainsworth Social, Eytan Sugarman, Individually, SHNY Restaurant Group, LLC, d/b/a Ainsworth Social, Eytan Sugarman, SHNY Restaurant Group, LLC, SHNY Restaurant Group, LLC doing business as Ainsworth Social and Eytan Sugarman and as officer, director, shareholder, principal, manager and or member of SHNY Restaurant Group, LLC d/b/a Ainsworth Social
Case Number: 1:2020cv02168
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 19 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 9/22/2020 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (km)
September 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) SHNY Restaurant Group, LLC, Eytan Sugarman(and as officer, director, shareholder, principal, manager and or member of SHNY Restaurant Group, LLC d/b/a Ainsworth Social), Eytan Sugarman(individually). Document filed by Zuffa, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Lonstein, Julie)
August 14, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. SHNY Restaurant Group, LLC served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. Service was accepted by Colleen Banahan, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Zuffa, LLC..(Lonstein, Julie)
August 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT FILING: Notice to Attorney Julie Lonstein regarding Document No. #15 Proposed Default Judgment. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Please refer to ECF Rule 16.1. A proposed clerk's certificate needs to be filed as a separate entry (filed under proposed orders, proposed clerk's certificate of default). Please use the sample clerk's certificate that is on our website under forms, the one filed on the docket is not as to form. The attorney's declaration in support also needs to be filed separately (filed under other answers, declaration in support of a non-motion). (km)
August 11, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Default Judgment as to . Document filed by Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit A to Plaintiff Affidavit, #5 Exhibit B to Plaintiff Affidavit, #6 Exhibit C to Plaintiff Affidavit, #7 Exhibit D to Plaintiff Affidavit, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service).(Lonstein, Julie)
August 11, 2020 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(1). Document filed by Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service).(Lonstein, Julie) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 8/11/2020 (km).
August 10, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, REPORT OF THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING COPYRIGHT, PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME served on SHNY RESTAURANT GROUP LLC on 7/28/20. Service was accepted by COLLEEN BANAHAN. Document filed by Zuffa, LLC..(Lonstein, Julie)
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Eytan Sugarman(and as officer, director, shareholder, principal, manager and or member of SHNY Restaurant Group, LLC d/b/a Ainsworth Social) served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. Service was accepted by "Jane Doe" - Concierge. Document filed by Zuffa, LLC..(Lonstein, Julie)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TOSERVE DEFENDANTS DUE TO COVID-19 granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/15/2020) Motions due by 8/11/2020. Service due by 8/11/2020. (ks)
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants. Document filed by Zuffa, LLC..(Lonstein, Julie)
March 13, 2020 Filing 10 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc)
March 13, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so redesignated. (wb)
March 13, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Vincent L. Briccetti is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER:Accordingly, and going forward, counsel is ORDERED to read Local Rules for the Division of Business 18, 20, and 21, prior to certifying that a case should be assigned to White Plains or Manhattan. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 3/12/2020) (rro)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to SHNY Restaurant Group, LLC..(pc)
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eytan Sugarman(and as officer, director, shareholder, principal, manager and or member of SHNY Restaurant Group, LLC d/b/a Ainsworth Social), Eytan Sugarman(individually)..(pc)
March 12, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
March 12, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
March 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Julie Cohen Lonstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: SHNY Restaurant Group, LLC, d/b/a Ainsworth Social, Eytan Sugarman, Individually, Eytan Sugarman, Individually, and as officer, director, shareholder, principal, manager and/or member of SHNY Restaurant Group, LLC d/b/a Ainsworth Social. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SHNY Restaurant Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Zuffa, LLC d/b/a Ultimate Fighting Champsionship..(Lonstein, Julie)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eytan Sugarman, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Zuffa, LLC d/b/a Ultimate Fighting Champsionship..(Lonstein, Julie)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Lonstein, Julie)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Zuffa, LLC d/b/a Ultimate Fighting Champsionship..(Lonstein, Julie)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet).(Lonstein, Julie)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SHNY Restaurant Group, LLC, d/b/a Ainsworth Social, Eytan Sugarman, Individually, Eytan Sugarman, Individually, and as officer, director, shareholder, principal, manager and/or member of SHNY Restaurant Group, LLC d/b/a Ainsworth Social. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19076187)Document filed by Zuffa, LLC d/b/a Ultimate Fighting Champsionship. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint - Advertisement).(Lonstein, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zuffa, LLC v. Sugarman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eytan Sugarman, Individually, and as officer, director, shareholder, principal, manager and/or member of SHNY Restaurant Group, LLC d/b/a Ainsworth Social
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eytan Sugarman, Individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHNY Restaurant Group, LLC, d/b/a Ainsworth Social
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eytan Sugarman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHNY Restaurant Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHNY Restaurant Group, LLC doing business as Ainsworth Social
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eytan Sugarman and as officer, director, shareholder, principal, manager and or member of SHNY Restaurant Group, LLC d/b/a Ainsworth Social
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zuffa, LLC d/b/a Ultimate Fighting Champsionship
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zuffa, LLC
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zuffa, LLC doing business as Ultimate Fighting Championship
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?