Broccolino v. Clearview AI, Inc.
Plaintiff: Maria Broccolino
Defendant: Clearview AI, Inc.
Intervenor: David Mutnick
Case Number: 1:2020cv02222
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332lp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Filing 28 SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Lee Wolosky dated May 5, 2020 re: Motion to Extend Time to File Answer. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc...(Wolosky, Lee)
May 4, 2020 Filing 27 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #5 Complaint addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Lee Wolosky dated May 4, 2020. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc...(Wolosky, Lee)
May 4, 2020 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Scott R. Drury in Support re: #10 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue.. Document filed by David Mutnick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5).(Drury, Scott)
May 4, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #10 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue. . Document filed by David Mutnick..(Drury, Scott)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 DAVID MUTNICK'S REQUEST TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM EXCEEDING 10 PAGES. ENDORSEMENT: OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/4/2020) (mml)
May 4, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #23 MOTION for Scott Robert Drury to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19694507. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
May 4, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Scott Robert Drury to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19694507. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by David Mutnick. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Scott R. Drury, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Affidavit).(Drury, Scott)
May 1, 2020 Filing 22 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Karen Newirth dated 05/01/2020. Document filed by David Mutnick..(Newirth, Karen)
April 29, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Lee S. Wolosky in Opposition re: #10 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue.. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4).(Wolosky, Lee)
April 29, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #10 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue. . Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc...(Wolosky, Lee)
April 29, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Melissa R. Emert in Opposition re: #10 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue.. Document filed by Maria Broccolino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10).(Emert, Melissa)
April 29, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #10 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue. . Document filed by Maria Broccolino..(Emert, Melissa)
April 29, 2020 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc...(Wolosky, Lee)
April 29, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Joshua Lichtman on behalf of Clearview AI, Inc...(Lichtman, Andrew)
April 29, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lee Scott Wolosky on behalf of Clearview AI, Inc...(Wolosky, Lee)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to respond to Mutnick's Motion to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue in their respective dockets by 5 PM on April 29, 2020. (Responses due by 4/29/2020.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/22/2020) (mml)
April 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Anne Newirth on behalf of David Mutnick..(Newirth, Karen)
April 21, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Scott R. Drury in Support re: #10 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue.. Document filed by David Mutnick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L).(Newirth, Karen)
April 21, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #10 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue. . Document filed by David Mutnick..(Newirth, Karen)
April 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue. Document filed by David Mutnick..(Newirth, Karen)
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 DIRECTIVE: Nor is it obvious to this court why any "lead plaintiff's counsel" is necessary. There are only two related cases pending before me. Should this New York court end up being the place where this Illinois statute gets interpreted, and where alleged violations of Illinois law are litigated, my inclination would be to consolidate the two cases and allow the three law firms involved for the plaintiffs to divide the laboring oar, on the understanding that I would not be paying three, or even two, sets of lawyers to appear and do the work of one at any conference, hearing, deposition, or other event. This is not a securities fraud class action; I am not constrained by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act; I simply have two related but identical class actions in front of me, as to which attorneys' fees will be parceled out eventually (should plaintiffs prevail) as though it were a single case. I thus decline to take any action on the "lead plaintiffs counsel" motion filed in Calderon until I have entertained any motions addressed to the complaints that may be filed by the defendants. In that regard, the cases shall be consolidated, and a single motion shall be filed under each docket number, addressed to the pleadings as they have been filed. The allegations against the common defendant (Clearview) are in all relevant respects identical; there is no need for separate motions in the two cases. The parties are free to set their own schedule, subject to the court's veto - and my veto will likely be to accelerate the filing of motions, not to defer it. You have ten business days to get me a motion schedule. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/14/2020) (mml)
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Maria Broccolino waiver sent on 3/25/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. Document filed by Maria Broccolino..(Emert, Melissa)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa R. Emert on behalf of Maria Broccolino..(Emert, Melissa)
March 16, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
March 16, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
March 16, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-01296-CM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Clearview AI, Inc...(pc)
March 16, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Colleen McMahon as possibly related to 20cv1296. (pc)
March 16, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
March 16, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Clearview AI, Inc.. Document filed by Maria Broccolino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Grant, Lynda)
March 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lynda J. Grant to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; There is no caption title citing the document that is being filed (document does not read "Complaint"). Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 3/18/2020. (pc)
March 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lynda J. Grant. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
March 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lynda J. Grant. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Maria Broccolino, Clearview AI, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-01296. Document filed by Maria Broccolino..(Grant, Lynda)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Clearview AI, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Broccolino..(Grant, Lynda)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Grant, Lynda)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Clearview AI, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19095656)Document filed by Maria Broccolino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Grant, Lynda) Modified on 3/13/2020 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broccolino v. Clearview AI, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearview AI, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Joshua Lichtman
Represented By: Lee Scott Wolosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Broccolino
Represented By: Lynda J. Grant
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: David Mutnick
Represented By: Karen Anne Newirth
Represented By: Scott Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?