D. v. New York City Department Of Education
Plaintiff: H. D.
Defendant: New York City Department Of Education ("DOE") and New York City Department Of Education
Case Number: 1:2020cv02238
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 8/12/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (rro)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Application GRANTED. Defendant's time to answer, move, or respond otherwise is extended to July 15, 2020. Moreover, the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for June 12, 2020, is hereby ADJOURNED to August 12, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. (New York City Department Of Education answer due 7/15/2020.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/8/2020) (rro)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Martin Bowe dated May 8, 2020. Document filed by New York City Department Of Education..(Bowe, Martin)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/12/2020 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/8/2020) (rro)
April 2, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was made by EMAIL. Document filed by H. D...(Roller, Irina)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. New York City Department Of Education served on 3/25/2020, answer due 4/15/2020. Service was made by EMAIL. Document filed by H. D...(Roller, Irina)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Roller, Irina)
March 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Irina Roller re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; H.D. must be added to the case a second time, with party text "on behalf of her child E.D. a minor". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. ***DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne)
March 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Irina Roller. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: New York City Department Of Education. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pne)
March 13, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
March 13, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
March 13, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
March 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Irina Roller. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Department Of Education ("DOE"). (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19098939)Document filed by H. D...(Roller, Irina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D. v. New York City Department Of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department Of Education ("DOE")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department Of Education
Represented By: Martin John Bowe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. D.
Represented By: Irina Roller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?