Emigrant Bank et al v. Suntrust Bank et al
Plaintiff: Emigrant Bank and Pacific Mercantile Bank
Defendant: DOES Nos. 1 through 10, inclusive, Truist Bank and Suntrust Bank
Case Number: 1:2020cv02391
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Jennifer L. Nassiri to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19847304. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Emigrant Bank, Pacific Mercantile Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jennifer Nassiri in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Nassiri, Jennifer)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #19 MOTION for Sage R. Vanden Heuvel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/12/2020) (jca)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #18 MOTION for Gary E. Gans to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/12/2020) (jca)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Sage R. Vanden Heuvel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19788993. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Emigrant Bank, Pacific Mercantile Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sage Vanden Heuvel in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Vanden Heuvel, Sage)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Gary E. Gans to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19788881. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Emigrant Bank, Pacific Mercantile Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Gary Gans in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Gans, Gary)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Sage R. Vanden Heuvel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19788993. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #18 MOTION for Gary E. Gans to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19788881. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Corey Worcester dated April 23, 2020 re: #13 LETTER MOTION for Conference specifically Pre-Motion Conference concerning Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss all counts of the Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Peter Isajiw . Document filed by Emigrant Bank, Pacific Mercantile Bank..(Worcester, Richard)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to a Request for a Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Corey Worcester dated April 15, 2020. Document filed by Emigrant Bank, Pacific Mercantile Bank..(Worcester, Richard)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Truist Financial Corporation for Truist Bank. Document filed by Suntrust Bank, Truist Bank..(Isajiw, Peter)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Truist Financial Corporation for Suntrust Bank. Document filed by Suntrust Bank, Truist Bank..(Isajiw, Peter)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Conference specifically Pre-Motion Conference concerning Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss all counts of the Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Peter Isajiw dated 4/13/2020. Document filed by Suntrust Bank, Truist Bank..(Isajiw, Peter)
April 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/2/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/5/2020) (jca)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint with exhibits and Civil Cover Sheet served on Truist Bank on 03/23/2020. Service was accepted by Jane Richardson, Process Specialist. Document filed by Emigrant Bank, Pacific Mercantile Bank..(Worcester, Richard)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint with exhibits and Civil Cover Sheet served on Suntrust Bank on 03/23/2020. Service was accepted by Barry Smith, Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Emigrant Bank, Pacific Mercantile Bank..(Worcester, Richard)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/20/2020) (jca)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Truist Bank..(pc)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Suntrust Bank..(pc)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Emigrant Bancorp, Inc., Other Affiliate New York Bank & Private Trust Corporation for Emigrant Bank. Document filed by Emigrant Bank..(Worcester, Richard)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Pacific Mercantile Bancorp for Pacific Mercantile Bank. Document filed by Pacific Mercantile Bank..(Worcester, Richard)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Truist Bank, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Emigrant Bank, Pacific Mercantile Bank..(Worcester, Richard)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SunTrust Bank, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Emigrant Bank, Pacific Mercantile Bank..(Worcester, Richard)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Worcester, Richard)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES, Suntrust Bank, Truist Bank. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19156846)Document filed by Emigrant Bank, Pacific Mercantile Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended and Restated Credit Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Guaranty and Security Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Revolving Credit and Term Loan Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Term Loan Joinder Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Forbearance Notice, #6 Exhibit F - Notice of Acceleration of Debt, #7 Exhibit G - Letter to Mongan from Gans Re SunTrust Bank).(Worcester, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emigrant Bank et al v. Suntrust Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emigrant Bank
Represented By: Richard Corey Worcester
Represented By: Gary Edward Gans
Represented By: Sage Vanden Heuvel
Represented By: Jennifer L Nassiri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Mercantile Bank
Represented By: Richard Corey Worcester
Represented By: Gary Edward Gans
Represented By: Sage Vanden Heuvel
Represented By: Jennifer L Nassiri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES Nos. 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truist Bank
Represented By: Peter Joseph Isajiw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Bank
Represented By: Peter Joseph Isajiw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?