Doble et al v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Doble and Lenora Doble
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer, Inc. and Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02408
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint served. Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. served on 4/9/2020, answer due 4/30/2020; Zimmer US, Inc. served on 4/9/2020, answer due 4/30/2020; Zimmer, Inc. served on 4/9/2020, answer due 4/30/2020. Document filed by Dennis Doble; Lenora Doble..(Daly, Laura)
April 7, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer, Inc...(pc)
April 7, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc...(pc)
April 7, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer US, Inc...(pc)
March 23, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
March 23, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad)
March 23, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad)
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-MD-2859. Document filed by Dennis Doble, Lenora Doble..(Daly, Laura)
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Daly, Laura)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Dennis Doble, Lenora Doble..(Daly, Laura)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, Inc., re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Dennis Doble, Lenora Doble..(Daly, Laura)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer US, Inc., re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Dennis Doble, Lenora Doble..(Daly, Laura)
March 23, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Crotty as possibly related to 18-md-2859. (jgo)
March 23, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 23, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
March 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Laura Daly. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias was entered incorrectly. (jgo)
March 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Laura Daly. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 8 (Multidistrict Litigation - Direct File); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
March 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Laura Daly to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the entire related case number must be on the docket entry text. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo)
March 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Laura Daly to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the incorrect Origin code was selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. Document filed by Dennis Doble, Lenora Doble..(Daly, Laura)
March 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Laura Daly to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. The PDF case caption must list all of the party names and must not include 'et al'. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 3/25/2020. (jgo)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DOCKET ENTRY ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to MDL 02859. Document filed by Dennis Doble, Lenora Doble..(Daly, Laura) Modified on 3/23/2020 (jgo).
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Daly, Laura) Modified on 3/23/2020 (jgo).
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19164562)Document filed by Dennis Doble, Lenora Doble..(Daly, Laura) Modified on 3/20/2020 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doble et al v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Doble
Represented By: Laura Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenora Doble
Represented By: Laura Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?