Solid State Elevator Corporation v. Arcbest Corp.
Plaintiff: SOLID STATE ELEVATOR CORPORATION
Defendant: ARCBEST CORP.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02419
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:14706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED ANSWER to. Document filed by Arcbest Corp...(Wright, George)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Arcbest Corp...(Wright, George)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate ABF Freight System, Inc., Other Affiliate ABF, INC. for Arcbest Corp.. Document filed by Arcbest Corp...(Wright, George)
March 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney George W. Wright to RE-FILE Document #4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (ldi)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Arcbest Corp...(Wright, George) Modified on 3/24/2020 (ldi).
March 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney George W. Wright to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
March 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney George W. Wright. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Solid State Elevator Corporation, Arcbest Corp.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pne)
March 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
March 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
March 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by ARCBEST CORP...(Wright, George) Modified on 3/23/2020 (ldi).
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wright, George)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil Court, County of New York. Case Number: 3380 NCV 2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19168874).Document filed by ARCBEST CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons and Endorsed Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Bill of Lading)).(Wright, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solid State Elevator Corporation v. Arcbest Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCBEST CORP.
Represented By: George W. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLID STATE ELEVATOR CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?