Haye v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Kirk Haye
Defendant: Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02549
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:56
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company served on 4/2/2020, answer due 4/23/2020. Service was accepted by Security Guard. Document filed by Kirk Haye..(Myers, William)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that, by June 8, 2020, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by June 8, 2020, the parties jointly submit to the Court a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. A template for the order is available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-ronnie-abrams. The status letter and the proposed case management plan should be filed electronically on ECF, consistent with the Court's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) Rules & Instructions, which were updated on February 1, 2019, and are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. Please consult my Individual Rules and Practices with respect to communications with Chambers and related matters. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in the joint letter due by June 8, 2020, each party shall state its position on whether an initial telephone conference is necessary at this time in light of the Covid-19 crisis, or whether the Court should enter the case management plan and scheduling order without holding an initial telephone conference. Plaintiff is ordered to serve Defendant with a copy of this order and to file an affidavit on ECF certifying that such service has been effectuated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/27/20) (yv)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company..(jgo)
March 26, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 26, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 26, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 26, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney William Louis Myers, Jr. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to Queens;. (jgo)
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kirk Haye..(Myers, William)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Myers, William)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19226398)Document filed by Kirk Haye..(Myers, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haye v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Haye
Represented By: William Louis Myers, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?