United States of America v. Anthem, Inc.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Anthem, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02593
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2022 Filing 62 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #26 Amended Complaint,,, addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from K. Lee Blalack, II dated October 5, 2022. Document filed by Anthem, Inc...(Blalack, K. Lee)
October 5, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Sol Tinio on behalf of United States of America..(Tinio, Rebecca)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 OPINION & ORDER re: #36 MOTION to Transfer Case (1), Motion to Dismiss (2), and Motion to Strike (3). filed by Anthem, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's motion is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate ECF No. 36. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/30/2022) (ate) Modified on 10/3/2022 (ate).
July 20, 2022 Filing 59 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from K. Lee Blalack, II dated July 20, 2022 re: #57 Response concerning supplemental authority. Document filed by Anthem, Inc...(Blalack, K. Lee)
July 19, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Salim Jacob on behalf of United States of America..(Jacob, Charles)
July 19, 2022 Filing 57 RESPONSE re: #55 Letter, regarding Supplemental Authority. Document filed by United States of America..(Bannon, Zachary)
July 19, 2022 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zachary Bannon on behalf of United States of America..(Bannon, Zachary)
September 30, 2021 Filing 55 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from K. Lee Blalack II dated September 30, 2021 re: Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - September 29, 2021 Order, USA, ex rel. Robert A. Cutler v. Cigna Corp., et al. 717-cv-07515 (S.D.N.Y.), #2 Attachment B - September 17, 2021 Hearing Transcript, USA, ex rel. Robert A. Cutler v. Cigna Corp., et al. 717-cv-07515 (S.D.N.Y.)).(Blalack, K. Lee)
September 21, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 1.4 - Margaret L. Carter. Document filed by Anthem, Inc...(Cohen, Valerya)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #52 Letter filed by United States of America. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/10/2021) (ama)
September 9, 2021 Filing 52 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Rachael L. Doud dated September 9, 2021 re: Request for Termination of Appearance. Document filed by United States of America..(Doud, Rachael)
September 8, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Max Aronoff on behalf of United States of America..(Aronoff, Peter)
December 8, 2020 Filing 50 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from K. Lee Blalack, II dated December 8, 2020 re: Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Anthem, Inc...(Blalack, K. Lee)
December 7, 2020 Filing 49 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Li Yu/Peter Aronoff/Rachael Doud dated 12/7/2020 re: 2d Circuit's Strock decision. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Strock Slip. Op.).(Yu, Li)
November 20, 2020 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Marc Russo in Support re: #36 MOTION to Transfer Case (1), Motion to Dismiss (2), and Motion to Strike (3).. Document filed by Anthem, Inc...(Blalack, K. Lee)
November 20, 2020 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Brian Matthew Cogdill in Support re: #36 MOTION to Transfer Case (1), Motion to Dismiss (2), and Motion to Strike (3).. Document filed by Anthem, Inc...(Blalack, K. Lee)
November 20, 2020 Filing 46 DECLARATION of James A. Bowman in Support re: #36 MOTION to Transfer Case (1), Motion to Dismiss (2), and Motion to Strike (3).. Document filed by Anthem, Inc...(Blalack, K. Lee)
November 20, 2020 Filing 45 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #36 MOTION to Transfer Case (1), Motion to Dismiss (2), and Motion to Strike (3). . Document filed by Anthem, Inc...(Blalack, K. Lee)
November 6, 2020 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #36 MOTION to Transfer Case (1), Motion to Dismiss (2), and Motion to Strike (3). . Document filed by United States of America..(Yu, Li)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #42 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #36 MOTION to Transfer Case (1), Motion to Dismiss (2), and Motion to Strike (3). addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Li Yu dated 10/5/2020. So Ordered Responses due by 11/6/2020 Replies due by 11/20/2020. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 10/5/2020) (js)
October 5, 2020 Filing 42 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #36 MOTION to Transfer Case (1), Motion to Dismiss (2), and Motion to Strike (3). addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Li Yu dated 10/5/2020. Document filed by United States of America..(Yu, Li)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying as moot #27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: This order is DENIED as moot. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 10/1/2020) (jwh)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying as moot #31 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. This request is DENIED as moot. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 10/1/2020) (rro)
September 17, 2020 Filing 39 DECLARATION of James A. Bowman in Support re: #36 MOTION to Transfer Case (1), Motion to Dismiss (2), and Motion to Strike (3).. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Blalack, K. Lee)
September 17, 2020 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Brian Matthew Cogdill in Support re: #36 MOTION to Transfer Case (1), Motion to Dismiss (2), and Motion to Strike (3).. Document filed by Anthem, Inc...(Blalack, K. Lee)
September 17, 2020 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #36 MOTION to Transfer Case (1), Motion to Dismiss (2), and Motion to Strike (3). . Document filed by Anthem, Inc...(Blalack, K. Lee)
September 17, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION to Transfer Case (1), Motion to Dismiss (2), and Motion to Strike (3). Document filed by Anthem, Inc...(Blalack, K. Lee)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/26/2020) (va)
August 13, 2020 Filing 34 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Regarding the Court's August 6, 2020 Order addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from K. Lee Blalack II dated August 13, 2020. Document filed by Anthem, Inc...(Blalack, K. Lee)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying #15 Letter Motion for Conference ; denying #19 Letter Motion for Conference ; denying #28 Letter Motion for Conference ; denying #30 Letter Motion for Conference. On May 29, 2020, Defendant requested pre-motion conferences in anticipation of its motions to strike and to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (ECF Nos. 19, 20). Plaintiff responded on June 3, 2020. (ECF No. 23). On July 9, 2020, Defendant requested a pre-motion conference in anticipation of its motion to transfer venue. (ECF No. 28). Plaintiff responded on July 10, 2020. (ECF No. 29). The requests for pre-motion conferences are DENIED and the Court sets the following briefing schedule for a consolidated briefing of all Defendants' proposed motions: Defendant's Motions to Dismiss, Strike, and Transfer Venue: September 17, 2020, Plaintiff's Opposition: October 29, 2020, Defendant's Reply, if any: November 12, 2020. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/6/2020) (rj) (Main Document 33 replaced on 8/10/2020) (rj).
August 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 9/17/2020. Responses due by 10/29/2020 Replies due by 11/12/2020. (rj)
July 23, 2020 Filing 32 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from K. Lee Blalack, II dated July 23, 2020 re: #31 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Set Briefing Schedule addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Li Yu/Peter Aronoff/Rachael Doud dated 7/23/2020. . Document filed by Anthem, Inc...(Blalack, K. Lee)
July 23, 2020 Filing 31 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Set Briefing Schedule addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Li Yu/Peter Aronoff/Rachael Doud dated 7/23/2020. Document filed by United States of America..(Yu, Li)
July 16, 2020 Filing 30 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference or Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from K. Lee Blalack, II dated July 16, 2020. Document filed by Anthem, Inc...(Blalack, K. Lee)
July 10, 2020 Filing 29 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Rachael L. Doud dated July 10, 2020 re: #27 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from K. Lee Blalack, II dated July 9, 2020., #28 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: Renewed Request For Pre-Motion Conference or, Alternately, Request for Briefing Schedule on Proposed Motion to Transfer Venue addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from K. Lee Blalack, II dated July 9, 202 . Document filed by United States of America..(Doud, Rachael)
July 9, 2020 Filing 28 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: Renewed Request For Pre-Motion Conference or, Alternately, Request for Briefing Schedule on Proposed Motion to Transfer Venue addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from K. Lee Blalack, II dated July 9, 2020. Document filed by Anthem, Inc...(Blalack, K. Lee)
July 9, 2020 Filing 27 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from K. Lee Blalack, II dated July 9, 2020. Document filed by Anthem, Inc...(Blalack, K. Lee)
July 2, 2020 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Anthem, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by United States of America. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: List of Anthem's Part C Plans, #2 Exhibit 2: Anthem Annual Part C Agreement for Empire MediBlue, #3 Exhibit 3: Anthem Annual Part C Agreement for Empire MediBlue, #4 Exhibit 4: Anthem Risk Adjustment 101 Bulletin, #5 Exhibit 5: Anthem Coding Manual excerpt, #6 Exhibit 6: Sample Anthem EDI Agreement, #7 Exhibit 7: 2013 Anthem EDI Agreement, #8 Exhibit 8: 2015 Anthem EDI Agreement, #9 Exhibit 9: June 26, 2015 Anthem Attestation, #10 Exhibit 10: Anthem Chart Review FAQ, #11 Exhibit 11: Anthem Chart Review Provider Announcement, #12 Exhibit 12: Anthem Chart Review ROI).(Yu, Li)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. SO ORDERED. Amended Pleadings due by 7/2/2020. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 6/26/2020) (rj)
June 25, 2020 Filing 24 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #23 Response to Motion,, addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Li Yu/Peter Aronoff/Rachael Doud dated 6/25/2020. Document filed by United States of America..(Yu, Li)
June 10, 2020 Filing 23 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Li Yu/Peter Aronoff/Rachael Doud dated 6/10/2020 re: #20 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #1 Complaint, (Request for a Pre-Motion Conference related to Anthem's intention to file a motion to dismiss, in part, Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6)), #19 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #1 Complaint, (Request for a Pre-Motion Conference related to Anthem's intention to file a motion to strike paragraphs 99 through 102 from Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Proc . Document filed by United States of America..(Yu, Li)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #21 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Anthem's Pre-Motion Conference Letters addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Li Yu/Peter Aronoff/Rachael Doud dated 6/1/2020. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 6/10/2020. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 6/03/2020) (ama)
June 1, 2020 Filing 21 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Anthem's Pre-Motion Conference Letters addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Li Yu/Peter Aronoff/Rachael Doud dated 6/1/2020. Document filed by United States of America..(Yu, Li)
May 29, 2020 Filing 20 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #1 Complaint, (Request for a Pre-Motion Conference related to Anthem's intention to file a motion to dismiss, in part, Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6)) addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from K. Lee Blalack, II dated May 29, 2020. Document filed by Anthem, Inc...(Blalack, K. Lee)
May 29, 2020 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #1 Complaint, (Request for a Pre-Motion Conference related to Anthem's intention to file a motion to strike paragraphs 99 through 102 from Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(f).) addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from K. Lee Blalack, II dated May 29, 2020. Document filed by Anthem, Inc...(Blalack, K. Lee)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/24/2020) (ks)
April 20, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Li Yu/Peter Aronoff/Rachael Doud dated 4/20/2020 re: #15 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference for Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of Ohio addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from K. Lee Blalack, II dated April 14, 2020. . Document filed by United States of America..(Yu, Li)
April 15, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference for Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of Ohio addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from K. Lee Blalack, II dated April 14, 2020. addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Li Yu dated 4/15/2020. Document filed by United States of America..(Yu, Li)
April 14, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference for Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of Ohio addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from K. Lee Blalack, II dated April 14, 2020. Document filed by Anthem, Inc...(Blalack, K. Lee)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF K. LEE BLALACK, II granting #5 Motion for K. Lee Blalack, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/6/2020) (rro)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JAMES A. BOWMAN granting #6 Motion for James A. Bowman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/6/2020) (rro)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF DAVID DEATON granting #7 Motion for David Deaton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/6/2020) (rro)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF MARGARET L. CARTER granting #8 Motion for Margaret L. Carter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/6/2020) (rro)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Anthem, Inc...(Cohen, Valerya)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Valerya Cohen on behalf of Anthem, Inc...(Cohen, Valerya)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Margaret L. Carter to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19309950. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Margaret L. Carter in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 California Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Margaret L. Carter).(Carter, Margaret)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for David Deaton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19309531. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Deaton in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 California Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David Deaton).(Deaton, David)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for James A. Bowman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19308906. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James A. Bowman in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 California Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James A. Bowman).(Bowman, Jim)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for K. Lee Blalack, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19308427. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K. Lee Blalack, II in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Maryland Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Tennessee Certificate of Good Standing, #4 District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of K. Lee Blalack, II).(Blalack, K. Lee)
April 2, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for K. Lee Blalack, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19308427. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #6 MOTION for James A. Bowman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19308906. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #7 MOTION for David Deaton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19309531. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
April 2, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Margaret L. Carter to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19309950. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Anthem, Inc. waiver sent on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. Document filed by United States of America..(Yu, Li)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Doud, Rachael)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachael Lightfoot Doud on behalf of United States of America..(Doud, Rachael)
March 27, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Li Yu. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
March 27, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
March 27, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
March 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthem, Inc.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 to Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 to Complaint, #7 Exhibit 7 to Complaint, #8 Exhibit 8 to Complaint, #9 Exhibit 9 to Complaint, #10 Exhibit 10 to Complaint, #11 Exhibit 11 to Complaint, #12 Exhibit 12 to Complaint).(Yu, Li)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Anthem, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem, Inc.
Represented By: David Deaton
Represented By: Margaret Carter
Represented By: K. Lee Blalack, II
Represented By: Jim Bowman
Represented By: Valerya Cohen
Represented By: Margaret L. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Li Yu
Represented By: Rachael Lightfoot Doud
Represented By: Peter Max Aronoff
Represented By: Rebecca Sol Tinio
Represented By: Zachary Bannon
Represented By: Charles Salim Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?