Powers v. Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center et al.
Plaintiff: Scott Powers
Defendant: Constantinos Sofocleous and Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center
Case Number: 1:2020cv02625
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from R. Webber dated May 22, 2020 re: #24 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss, and Rule 12(f) motion to strike addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Betsy D. Baydala dated May 15, 2020. . Document filed by Scott Powers(individually, as Representative of the Estate of Erika Zak,)..(Webber, Rebecca)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Plaintiffs and Defendants dated May 21, 2020 re: Joint letter pursuant to Order of April 7, 2020 (doc. 17). Document filed by Scott Powers(individually, as Representative of the Estate of Erika Zak,), Scott Powers(as the natural guardian of L.P., a minor)..(Webber, Rebecca)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Document filed by Scott Powers(individually, as Representative of the Estate of Erika Zak,), Scott Powers(as the natural guardian of L.P., a minor)..(Webber, Rebecca)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss, and Rule 12(f) motion to strike addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Betsy D. Baydala dated May 15, 2020. Document filed by Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center, Constantinos Sofocleous. Return Date set for 5/28/2020 at 10:40 AM..(Baydala, Betsy)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #22 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED IN PART. The initial pretrial conference, scheduled for May 21, 2020, is ADJOURNED to May 28, 2020, at 10:40 a.m. The parties shall file the joint letter and proposed case management plan and scheduling order by May 21, 2020. Defendants shall file any pre-motion letter regarding the proposed motions to dismiss and to strike by May 15, 2020, and such pre-motion letter shall stay Defendants' deadline to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint pending further Court Order. Plaintiff shall file a letter response by May 22, 2020. The proposed motions will be discussed at the initial pretrial conference. Initial Conference set for 5/28/2020 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/23/2020) (va)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Betsy D. Baydala dated April 22, 2020. Document filed by Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center, Constantinos Sofocleous. Return Date set for 5/21/2020 at 10:40 AM..(Baydala, Betsy)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Rebecca Ruth Webber to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and granting #5 Motion for Scott Martin Hendler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center..(Baydala, Betsy)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Betsy Diane Baydala on behalf of Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center, Constantinos Sofocleous..(Baydala, Betsy)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: WHEREAS, due to a scheduling error by the Court, the conference on May 14, 2020 is canceled. The initial pre-trial conference will take place as scheduled on May 21, 2020 at 10:40 a.m. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/8/2020) Initial Conference set for 5/21/2020 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (ks)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/21/2020 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The conference will be telephonic. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/7/2020) (cf) Modified on 4/7/2020 (cf).
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order [doc. 12] and Judge Schofields Individual Rules served on Defendants on 4/3/2020. Document filed by Scott Powers(individually, as Representative of the Estate of Erika Zak,), Scott Powers(as the natural guardian of L.P., a minor)..(Webber, Rebecca)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Rebecca Ruth Webber on behalf of Scott Powers(individually, as Representative of the Estate of Erika Zak,), Scott Powers(as the natural guardian of L.P., a minor). Re: #4 MOTION for Rebecca Ruth Webber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #5 MOTION for Scott Martin Hendler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. AMENDED.(Webber, Rebecca)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center waiver sent on 3/27/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. Document filed by Scott Powers(individually, as Representative of the Estate of Erika Zak,); Scott Powers(as the natural guardian of L.P., a minor)..(Webber, Rebecca)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Constantinos Sofocleous waiver sent on 3/27/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. Document filed by Scott Powers(individually, as Representative of the Estate of Erika Zak,); Scott Powers(as the natural guardian of L.P., a minor)..(Webber, Rebecca)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/14/2020 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/2/2020) (cf)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Rebecca Ruth Webber on behalf of Scott Powers(individually, as Representative of the Estate of Erika Zak,), Scott Powers(as the natural guardian of L.P., a minor). Re: #4 MOTION for Rebecca Ruth Webber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #5 MOTION for Scott Martin Hendler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. .(Webber, Rebecca)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Constantinos Sofocleous..(pc)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center..(pc)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Rebecca Ruth Webber re: Document No. #1 Complaint, #8 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add Scott Powers to CM ECF with the party text "as the natural guardian of L.P., a minor". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Rebecca Ruth Webber. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Constantinos Sofocleous, Scott Powers. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Scott Powers, Scott Powers added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Scott Powers, Scott Powers. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Webber, Rebecca)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Scott Martin Hendler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #4 MOTION for Rebecca Ruth Webber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FILING ERROR DEFICIENT PLEADING -DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY -COMPLAINT against Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center, Constantinos Sofocleous. Document filed by Scott Powers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Hendler, Scott) Modified on 3/30/2020 (pc).
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Constantinos Sofocleous, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Scott Powers..(Hendler, Scott)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Scott Powers..(Hendler, Scott)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Scott Martin Hendler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Scott Powers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Hendler, Scott)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Rebecca Ruth Webber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Scott Powers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Webber, Rebecca)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-mc-00337. Document filed by Scott Powers..(Webber, Rebecca)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Webber, Rebecca)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center, Constantinos Sofocleous. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19254922)Document filed by Scott Powers..(Webber, Rebecca)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment: for #5 MOTION for Scott Martin Hendler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19255235..(Hendler, Scott)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment: for #4 MOTION for Rebecca Ruth Webber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19255268..(Webber, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powers v. Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constantinos Sofocleous
Represented By: Betsy Diane Baydala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center
Represented By: Betsy Diane Baydala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Powers
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Webber
Represented By: Scott M. Hendler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?