Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLC v. Liebman
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLC
Defendant: Paul Gary Liebman
Case Number: 1:2020cv02632
Filed: March 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/1/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/18/2020) (jwh)
May 18, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S PETITION: It is hereby STIPULATED and AGREED, this 11th day of May, 2020, by and between Bradley L. Mitchell, Esquire, counsel for Plaintiff, and, Howard Rosenberg, Esquire, counsel for Defendant, that the time within which Defendant must move with respect to or answer Plaintiff's Petition is hereby extended to and including June 15, 2020. As of this date, the time for Defendant to respond to the Petition has not yet expired. No previous extensions of time for Defendant to respond to the Petition have been requested or made. In consideration for this extension Defendant agrees not to contest service of process of the Summons with Petition and supporting documents. Application GRANTED, (Paul Gary Liebman answer due 6/15/2020.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/18/2020) (jwh)
May 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of extension of time to respond to petition re: #12 Proposed Stipulation and Order, #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Paul Gary Liebman..(Kreinces, Leonard)
May 18, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Paul Gary Liebman..(Kreinces, Leonard)
April 27, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice served on Paul Gary Liebman on 04/27/2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLC..(Ermilio, Jennifer)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #8 Motion for Jennifer Anne Ermilio to Appear Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/24/2020) (js)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Service served on Paul Gary Liebman on 4/22/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLC..(Mitchell, Bradley)
April 21, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Jennifer Anne Ermilio to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19520509. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Jennifer Anne Ermilio to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19520509. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to PHV Affidavit - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service).(Ermilio, Jennifer)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION; PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD; PROPOSED ORDER; ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION OF BRADLEY L. MITCHELL WITH EXHIBITS A THROUGH Q THERETO; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR COUNSEL FEES ("MEMORANDUM OF LAW"); COPIES OF THE CASES CITED IN THE MEMORANDUM OF LAW THAT ARE UNPUBLISHED OR REPORTED EXCLUSIVELY ON COMPUTERIZED DATABASES BEING PROVIDED TO YOU PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7.2; RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; AND THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK'S ELECTRONIC CASE FILING RULES AND INSTRUCTIONS (APRIL 1, 2020 EDITION) served on Paul Gary Liebman on 4/14/20. Service was accepted by Paul Gary Liebman, Defendant. Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLC..(Mitchell, Bradley)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mitchell, Bradley)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul Gary Liebman..(pne)
March 30, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Bradley Louis Mitchell. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
March 30, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
March 30, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
March 30, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
March 30, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Bradley Louis Mitchell to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): no courthouse selection was made on the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the corrected PDF. (pne)
March 28, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul Gary Liebman, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLC..(Mitchell, Bradley)
March 28, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Wachovia Securities Financial Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Corporate Parent WFC Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Everen Capital Corporation for Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLC. Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLC..(Mitchell, Bradley)
March 28, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR -CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mitchell, Bradley) Modified on 3/30/2020 (pne).
March 28, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19258935).Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit A-Q, #4 Memorandum of Law).(Mitchell, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLC v. Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Gary Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLC
Represented By: Bradley Louis Mitchell
Represented By: Jennifer A. Ermilio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?