Hong v. Lin's Garden Restaurant, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Yingcai Hong
Defendant: Lianrong Huang, Lin's Garden Restaurant, Inc., Huayong Lin, New Dynasty Chinese Restaurant LLC and Ru Hai Lin
Case Number: 1:2020cv02633
Filed: March 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to RU HAI LIN. Document filed by Yingcai Hong. Request for Waiver Mailed on 4/8/2020. Waiver of Service due by 5/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of Service for RU HAI LIN, #2 Exhibit POS with Summons and Complaint).(Troy, John)
April 20, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to LIANRONG HUANG. Document filed by Yingcai Hong. Request for Waiver Mailed on 4/8/2020. Waiver of Service due by 5/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of Service for LIANRONG HUANG, #2 Exhibit POS with Summons and Complaint).(Troy, John)
April 20, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to HUAYONG LIN. Document filed by Yingcai Hong. Request for Waiver Mailed on 4/8/2020. Waiver of Service due by 5/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of Service for HUAYONG LIN, #2 Exhibit POS with Summons and Complaint).(Troy, John)
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to NEW DYNASTY CHINESE RESTAURANT LLC d/b/a Dynasty. Document filed by Yingcai Hong. Request for Waiver Mailed on 4/8/2020. Waiver of Service due by 5/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of Service for NEW DYNASTY CHINESE RESTAURANT LLC d/b/a Dynasty, #2 Exhibit POS with Summons and Complaint).(Schweitzer, Aaron)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to Lin's Garden Restaurant Inc, Huayong Lin, Lianrong Huang, New Dynasty Chinese Restaurant LLC, Rui Hai Lin. Document filed by Yingcai Hong. Request for Waiver Mailed on 4/8/2020. Waiver of Service due by 5/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of Service for Lin's Garden Restaurant Inc., #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint).(Troy, John)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leanghour Lim on behalf of Yingcai Hong..(Lim, Leanghour)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lianrong Huang, Huayong Lin, Ru Hai Lin, Lin's Garden Restaurant, Inc., New Dynasty Chinese Restaurant LLC..(pne)
March 30, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
March 30, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
March 30, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
March 28, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Yingcai Hong..(Troy, John)
March 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron B. Schweitzer on behalf of Yingcai Hong..(Schweitzer, Aaron)
March 28, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LIN'S GARDEN RESTAURANT INC d/b/d Lin's Asian Cuisine; and NEW DYNASTY CHINESE RESTAURANT LLC d/b/a Dynasty; HUAYONG LIN, LIANRONG HUANG, and RU HAI LIN, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Yingcai Hong..(Troy, John)
March 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Troy, John)
March 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lianrong Huang, Huayong Lin, Ru Hai Lin, Lin's Garden Restaurant, Inc., New Dynasty Chinese Restaurant LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19259124)Document filed by Yingcai Hong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Notice to Enforce Shareholder Liability for Services Rendered, #2 Exhibit 02 Notice to Inspect Share Records, #3 Exhibit 03 Document Preservation Demand, #4 Exhibit 04 Notice of Lien and Assignment, #5 Exhibit 05 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under the FLSA and NYLL, #6 Exhibit 06 Notice Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited).(Troy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hong v. Lin's Garden Restaurant, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lianrong Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lin's Garden Restaurant, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huayong Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Dynasty Chinese Restaurant LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ru Hai Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yingcai Hong
Represented By: Aaron B. Schweitzer
Represented By: John Troy
Represented By: Leanghour Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?