Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund et al v. Tri State Construction & Masonry Inc.
Petitioner: Robert Bonanza, Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund and Anna Gutsin
Respondent: Tri State Construction & Masonry Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02642
Filed: March 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Filing 13 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund..(Savci, Haluk)
May 6, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund..(Savci, Haluk)
May 6, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Haluk Savci, Esq. in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 and 2, #2 Exhibit 3 to end).(Savci, Haluk)
May 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund. Responses due by 6/5/2020.(Savci, Haluk)
April 28, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award and Court's April 23, 2020 Order served on Tri-State Construction &Masonry, Inc. on April 28,2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund..(Savci, Haluk)
April 24, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 5/6/2020. Responses due by 6/5/2020 Replies due by 6/19/2020. Service due by 5/1/2020. (rro)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. Petitioners must serve the Petition on Respondent on or before May 1, 2020, and file proof of such service by that date. As explained in the Court's March 30, 2020 Order (Dkt. #6), Petitioners must move for confirmation of the arbitral award in the form of a motion for summary judgment. Such motion shall be due May 6, 2020. Respondent's opposition, if any, is due on June 5, 2020. Petitioners' reply, if any, is due June 19, 2020. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/24/2020) (rro)
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Haluk Savci, Esq. dated April 23, 2020. Document filed by Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund..(Savci, Haluk)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Petitioners shall move for confirmation of the arbitral award in the form of a motion for summary judgment in accordance with Rule 56 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 56.1 of the Southern District of New York by April 20, 2020. Respondent's opposition, if any, is due on May 11, 2020. Petitioners' reply, if any, is due May 25, 2020. Petitioners shall serve the petition upon Respondents electronically and by overnight mail no later than April 6, 2020, and shall file an affidavit of such service with the court no later than April 12, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/30/2020) ( Motions due by 4/20/2020., Responses due by 5/11/2020, Replies due by 5/25/2020.) (ks)
March 30, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Haluk Savci to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the civil cover sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the PDF. (pne)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tri State Construction & Masonry Inc...(pne)
March 30, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
March 30, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
March 30, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
March 29, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Robert Bonanza, Anna Gutsin, Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund..(Savci, Haluk)
March 29, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tri State Construction & Masonry Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Robert Bonanza, Anna Gutsin, Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund..(Savci, Haluk)
March 29, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Savci, Haluk) Modified on 3/30/2020 (pne).
March 29, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19260454).Document filed by Robert Bonanza, Anna Gutsin, Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund..(Savci, Haluk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund et al v. Tri State Construction & Masonry Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tri State Construction & Masonry Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Bonanza
Represented By: Haluk Savci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund
Represented By: Haluk Savci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anna Gutsin
Represented By: Haluk Savci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?