Toretto et al v. Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Toretto, Daniel C. King and Sheri Braun
Defendant: MEDIANT COMMUNICATIONS, INC. and Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.,
Case Number: 1:2020cv02667
Filed: March 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 75 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #67 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Document filed by Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.,..(Meal, Douglas)
October 14, 2020 Filing 74 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #64 MOTION to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Mediant Communications, Inc...(Collignon, Casie)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #72 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants October 6, 2020 request for a seven-day extension of time for Defendants to file their replies in support of their motions to dismiss, Dkt No. 72, is granted. The deadline for Defendants to file their replies is extended to October 14, 2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv)
October 6, 2020 Filing 72 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Motions to Dismiss addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Casie D. Collignon dated October 6, 2020. Document filed by Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.,, Mediant Communications, Inc...(Collignon, Casie)
September 23, 2020 Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #64 MOTION to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint., #67 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Sheri Braun, Daniel C. King, Phillip Toretto..(Moore, John)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Ryan J. McGee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
September 15, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #69 MOTION for Ryan J. McGee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21667161. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
September 15, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION for Ryan J. McGee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21667161. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Daniel C. King, Phillip Toretto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing).(McGee, Ryan)
August 26, 2020 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #67 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.,..(Meal, Douglas)
August 26, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.,..(Meal, Douglas)
August 26, 2020 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #64 MOTION to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Mediant Communications, Inc...(Collignon, Casie)
August 26, 2020 Filing 65 DECLARATION of Casie D. Collignon in Support re: #64 MOTION to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Mediant Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-March 6, 2020 Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit B-Pre-Motion Hearing Transcript).(Collignon, Casie)
August 26, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Mediant Communications, Inc...(Collignon, Casie)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #62 Motion for John A. Yanchunis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
August 20, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #62 MOTION for John A. Yanchunis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21244201. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 20, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION for John A. Yanchunis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21244201. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Daniel C. King, Phillip Toretto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of J. Yanchunis, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit COGS).(Yanchunis, John)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #59 Letter filed by Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc. and Mediant Communications, Inc. submitted letters requesting leave to file motionsto dismiss the second amended complaint for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Dkt Nos. 59-60. Those requests are granted. The motions and accompanying papers are due no later than August 26, 2020. Plaintiffs' opposition is due no later than four weeks following service of the motions. Defendants' replies are due no later than two weeks following service of Plaintiff's' oppositions. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 8/26/2020.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/13/2020) (ama)
August 13, 2020 Filing 60 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Casie D. Collignon dated August 13, 2020 re: Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Mediant Communications, Inc...(Collignon, Casie)
August 13, 2020 Filing 59 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Douglas H. Meal dated August 13, 2020 re: Response to the Court's Order entered on August 7, 2020. Document filed by Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.,..(Meal, Douglas)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying as moot #46 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #49 Motion to Dismiss. On August 5, 2020, Plaintiffs filed a second amended complaint. See Dkt No. 57. Accordingly, the pending motions to dismiss, Dkt Nos. 46 and 49, are denied as moot. Defendants are directed to inform the Court by letter no later than August 13, 2020 if they intend to file renewed motions to dismiss. This need not be a pre-motion conference letter, as the Court is likely to waive the requirement for a pre-motion conference. Defendants should propose a new filing date in their letter to the Court if they intend to file renewed motions to dismiss. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
August 5, 2020 Filing 57 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #23 Amended Complaint, against Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.,, Mediant Communications, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Phillip Toretto, Sheri Braun, Daniel C. King. Related document: #23 Amended Complaint,..(Siegel, Norman)
July 28, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/19/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 28, 2020 Filing 55 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 6/19/2020 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/28/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2020..(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Elaine A Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
July 23, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #53 MOTION for Elaine A Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
July 21, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION for Elaine A Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sheri Braun, Daniel C. King, Phillip Toretto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificates of good standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Ryan, Elaine)
July 17, 2020 Filing 52 DECLARATION of David T. Cohen in Support re: #49 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pre-motion Conference Transcript Excerpt).(Cohen, David)
July 17, 2020 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Bridget Hughes in Support re: #49 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.,..(Meal, Douglas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #49 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.,..(Meal, Douglas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.,..(Meal, Douglas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Casie D. Collignon in Support re: #46 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III, IV, V, and X of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Mediant Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Hearing Transcript for the Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit B-Pre-Motion Hearing Transcript).(Collignon, Casie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #46 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III, IV, V, and X of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Mediant Communications, Inc...(Collignon, Casie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III, IV, V, and X of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Mediant Communications, Inc...(Collignon, Casie)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Carrie A Laliberte to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Patricia N. Syverson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
July 15, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #43 MOTION for Elaine A Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20684204. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT OF UTAH;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
July 15, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #42 MOTION for Carrie A Laliberte to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20683964. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
July 14, 2020 Filing 43 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Elaine A Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20684204. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sheri Braun, Daniel C. King, Phillip Toretto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Ryan, Elaine) Modified on 7/15/2020 (vba).
July 14, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Carrie A Laliberte to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20683964. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sheri Braun, Daniel C. King, Phillip Toretto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Laliberte, Carrie)
July 14, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #41 MOTION for Patricia N. Syverson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20682155. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
July 14, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Patricia N. Syverson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20682155. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sheri Braun, Daniel C. King, Phillip Toretto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Syverson, Patricia)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Lindsay Todd Perkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
July 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #39 MOTION for Lindsay Todd Perkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20638900. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
July 10, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Lindsay Todd Perkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20638900. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sheri Braun, Daniel C. King, Phillip Toretto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Lindsay Todd Perkins, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Perkins, Lindsay)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #29 Motion for John Austin Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
June 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. As discussed on the record during the telephone conference held on June 19, 2020, Defendants' motion to dismiss and accompanying papers under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) are due no later than July 17, 2020. Plaintiffs' opposition is due no later than four weeks following service of Defendants' motion. Defendants' reply is due no later than 2 weeks following service of Plaintiffs' opposition. In addition, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for July 16, 2020 is adjourned sine die. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory)
June 19, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 6/19/2020. (Daniels, Anthony)
June 19, 2020 Filing 36 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Norman E. Siegel dated 6/19/2020 re: Response to Defendant Mediant's Pre-Motion Letter Regarding Anticipated Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Sheri Braun, Daniel C. King, Phillip Toretto..(Siegel, Norman)
June 19, 2020 Filing 35 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Norman E. Siegel dated 6/19/2020 re: Response to Defendant Donnelley's Pre-Motion Letter Regarding Anticipated Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Sheri Braun, Daniel C. King, Phillip Toretto..(Siegel, Norman)
June 18, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 6/19/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (rjm)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER terminating #33 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' letter motions seeking a conference regarding anticipated motions to dismiss as well as adjournment on conference scheduled for June 22, 2020 addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Norman E. Siegel on behalf of Plaintiffs dated June 17, 2020. LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #32 Order on Motion for Conference, addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Norman E. Siegel on behalf of Plaintiffs dated June 17, 2020. Document filed by Daniel C. King, Phillip Toretto. The conference scheduled for June 22, 2020 is rescheduled for June 19, 2020 at 3 p.m. If Plaintiffs cannot submit a responsive letter before that date, the Court will hear their arguments during the conference. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt No. 33. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/18/2020) (rjm)
June 17, 2020 Filing 33 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' letter motions seeking a conference regarding anticipated motions to dismiss as well as adjournment on conference scheduled for June 22, 2020 addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Norman E. Siegel on behalf of Plaintiffs dated June 17, 2020., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #32 Order on Motion for Conference,,,,, addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Norman E. Siegel on behalf of Plaintiffs dated June 17, 2020. Document filed by Daniel C. King, Phillip Toretto..(Peterson, Amanda)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Letter Motion for Conference; granting #31 Letter Motion for Conference. The Court will hold a pre-motion conference on both Defendants' proposed motions to dismiss June 22, 2020 at 3 p.m. Plaintiffs are directed to file a responsive letter no later than June 18, 2020. The parties are directed to consult the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19 for dial-in information and other instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Emergency Rule 2.C. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions pending at Dkt. Nos. 30 and 31. Telephone Conference set for 6/22/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/16/2020) (mro)
June 16, 2020 Filing 31 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: Donnelley's anticipated motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Doug Meal dated 6/16/2020. Document filed by Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.,..(Meal, Douglas)
June 16, 2020 Filing 30 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: Mediant's Anticipated Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Casie D. Collignon dated June 16, 2020. Document filed by Mediant Communications, Inc...(Collignon, Casie)
June 11, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment: for #29 MOTION for John Austin Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected Motion for J. Austin Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20212908..(Moore, John)
June 5, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #29 MOTION for John Austin Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected Motion for J. Austin Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
June 5, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Fee Due: for #29 MOTION for John Austin Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected Motion for J. Austin Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(laq)
June 5, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice re: Document No. #29 MOTION for John Austin Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected Motion for J. Austin Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the filing fee was not paid;.. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (laq)
June 5, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for John Austin Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected Motion for J. Austin Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sheri Braun, Daniel C. King, Phillip Toretto. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20212908 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit J. Austin Moore, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Moore, John) Modified on 7/9/2020 (ad).
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Michelle Visser to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
May 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc., answer due 6/16/2020; Mediant Communications, Inc. answer due 6/16/2020. (mro)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the amended complaint is extended to June 16, 2020. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/28/2020) (mro)
May 28, 2020 Filing 26 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Mediant Communications Inc.and Co-Defendant Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc. to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Casie D. Collignon dated May 28, 2020. Document filed by Mediant Communications, Inc...(Collignon, Casie)
May 22, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #25 MOTION for John Austin Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Missouri and Supreme Court of Illinois;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (laq)
May 22, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for John Austin Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sheri Braun, Daniel C. King, Phillip Toretto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit J. Austin Moore, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Moore, John)
May 20, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #24 MOTION for John Austin Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The Affidavit pursuant to Local Rule 1.3 is not notarized;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (ad)
May 20, 2020 Filing 24 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PRO HAC VICE MOTION - MOTION for John Austin Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sheri Braun, Daniel C. King, Phillip Toretto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit J. Austin Moore, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Moore, John) Modified on 5/20/2020 (ad).
May 19, 2020 Filing 23 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.,, Mediant Communications, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Phillip Toretto, Daniel C. King, Sheri Braun. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Siegel, Norman)
April 27, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David T Cohen on behalf of Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.,..(Cohen, David)
April 24, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for Michelle Visser to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19579394. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
April 24, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Michelle Visser to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19579394. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - MA, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - CA, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Visser, Michelle)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Norman E. Siegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
April 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. Defendant Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.'s deadline to respond to the complaint is extended to June 1, 2020. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/19/2020) (mro)
April 17, 2020 Filing 18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Doug Meal dated 4/17/2020. Document filed by Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.,..(Meal, Douglas)
April 17, 2020 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc. for Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.,. Document filed by Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.,..(Meal, Douglas)
April 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas H. Meal on behalf of Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.,..(Meal, Douglas)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Casie D. Collignon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
April 16, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Norman E. Siegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19457511. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
April 15, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Norman E. Siegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19457511. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Daniel C. King, Phillip Toretto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Norman E. Siegel, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Siegel, Norman)
April 15, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Mediant Communications, Inc. waiver sent on 4/2/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Document filed by Phillip Toretto; Daniel C. King..(Peterson, Amanda)
April 10, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc., served on 4/2/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Service was accepted by Sean O'Hara Authorized Agent. Document filed by Phillip Toretto; Daniel C. King..(Peterson, Amanda)
April 9, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Casie D. Collignon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19394661. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
April 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Casie D. Collignon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19394661. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mediant Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Collignon, Casie)
April 1, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mediant Communications, Inc...(jgo)
March 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/31/2020) (mro)
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MEDIANT COMMUNICATIONS, INC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Daniel C. King, Phillip Toretto..(Peterson, Amanda)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.,..(pne)
March 31, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Amanda Peterson to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Use the AO 440 Summons form, not the FOIA Summons form. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
March 31, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Amanda Peterson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Mediant Communications, Inc., Phillip Toretto, Daniel C. King. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (pne)
March 31, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Amanda Peterson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State); Dollar Demand $5,000,000,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; no dollar demand entered on civil cover sheet; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
March 31, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
March 31, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
March 31, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Daniel C. King..(Peterson, Amanda)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Phillip Toretto..(Peterson, Amanda)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MEDIANT COMMUNICATIONS, INC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Daniel C. King, Phillip Toretto..(Peterson, Amanda) Modified on 3/31/2020 (pne).
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Daniel C. King, Phillip Toretto..(Peterson, Amanda)
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Peterson, Amanda)
March 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MEDIANT COMMUNICATIONS, INC., Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.,. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19273342)Document filed by Phillip Toretto, Daniel C. King..(Peterson, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toretto et al v. Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Toretto
Represented By: Amanda Peterson
Represented By: Norman E. Siegel
Represented By: John Austin Moore
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Represented By: Patricia N. Syverson
Represented By: Lindsay Todd Perkins
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Ryan McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel C. King
Represented By: Amanda Peterson
Represented By: Norman E. Siegel
Represented By: John Austin Moore
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Represented By: Patricia N. Syverson
Represented By: Lindsay Todd Perkins
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Ryan McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Braun
Represented By: Norman E. Siegel
Represented By: John Austin Moore
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Represented By: Patricia N. Syverson
Represented By: Lindsay Todd Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDIANT COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Represented By: Casie D Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnelley Financial Solutions, Inc.,
Represented By: David T Cohen
Represented By: Douglas H. Meal
Represented By: Michelle L. Visser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?