Schuyler Line Navigation Company, LLC v. KPI Bridge Oil, Inc.
Petitioner: Schuyler Line Navigation Company, LLC
Respondent: KPI Bridge Oil, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02772
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE re: #13 Response to Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration / Petitioner's Answer to Respondent's Cross-Petition to Confirm Award. Document filed by Schuyler Line Navigation Company, LLC..(Kontakis, George)
May 1, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration . Document filed by Schuyler Line Navigation Company, LLC..(Kontakis, George)
April 24, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #14 CROSS MOTION to Confirm Arbitration . and Opposition to Petitioner's Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award. Document filed by KPI Bridge Oil, Inc...(Chalos, George)
April 24, 2020 Filing 14 CROSS MOTION to Confirm Arbitration . Document filed by KPI Bridge Oil, Inc...(Chalos, George)
April 24, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by KPI Bridge Oil, Inc...(Chalos, George)
April 24, 2020 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by KPI Bridge Oil, Inc...(Chalos, George)
April 9, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. KPI Bridge Oil, Inc. served on 4/3/2020, answer due 4/24/2020. Service was accepted by Ian G. Sharpe, Registered Agent. Document filed by Schuyler Line Navigation Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6).(Kontakis, George)
April 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Briton Paul Sparkman on behalf of KPI Bridge Oil, Inc...(Sparkman, Briton)
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Danielle Patzelt-Russo on behalf of KPI Bridge Oil, Inc...(Patzelt-Russo, Melissa)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George Michael Chalos on behalf of KPI Bridge Oil, Inc...(Chalos, George)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to KPI Bridge Oil, Inc...(pne)
April 3, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
April 3, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
April 3, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Schuyler Line Navigation Company, LLC..(Kontakis, George)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KPI Bridge Oil, Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Schuyler Line Navigation Company, LLC..(Kontakis, George)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kontakis, George)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration /Vacate Arbitration Award Dated January 6, 2020. Document filed by Schuyler Line Navigation Company, LLC..(Kontakis, George)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of George K. Kontakis in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Schuyler Line Navigation Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Time Charter Form, #2 Exhibit 2- Letter to President Shaw, #3 Exhibit 3- Partial Final Award (Shaw) - April 16, 2019, #4 Exhibit 4- Receipt of Partial Final Award, #5 Exhibit 5- A. Colletti Disclosure Statement, #6 Exhibit 6- L. Sheinbaum Disclosure Statement, #7 Exhibit 7- Letter to Arbitrators, #8 Exhibit 8- Message from counsel for KPI, #9 Exhibit 9- Initial Disclosure Statement, #10 Exhibit 10- Stroup Email, #11 Exhibit 11- Objection to Simms, #12 Exhibit 12- Supplemental Disclosure Statement, #13 Exhibit 13- Motion to disburse funds, #14 Exhibit 14- Response to Simms' Supplemental Disclosure Statement, #15 Exhibit 15- Simms Email, #16 Exhibit 16- KPI Bridge Oil Inc. Motion to Dismiss Arbitration Claim, #17 Exhibit 17- Memorandum in Opposition, #18 Exhibit 18- KPI Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Arbitration Claim, #19 Exhibit 19- Request for Security for Arbitrator Fees, #20 Exhibit 20- Confirmation of Funds, #21 Exhibit 21- Response re Funds from Dorick, #22 Exhibit 22- Tradewinds - Simms Showers advocates for cuts to reporting time of bad fuel, #23 Exhibit 23- Partial Final Award - January 6, 2020, #24 Exhibit 24- Norfolk Matter Complaint, #25 Exhibit 25- Pennsylvania Matter Verified Complaint).(Kontakis, George)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19318866).Document filed by Schuyler Line Navigation Company, LLC..(Kontakis, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schuyler Line Navigation Company, LLC v. KPI Bridge Oil, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Schuyler Line Navigation Company, LLC
Represented By: George Konstantinos Kontakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KPI Bridge Oil, Inc.
Represented By: George Michael Chalos
Represented By: Melissa Danielle Patzelt-Russo
Represented By: Briton Paul Sparkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?