Weisner v. Google LLC
Plaintiff: Sholem Weisner
Defendant: Google LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02862
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338pt
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Kevin X. McGann on behalf of Google LLC. New Address: Fenwick & West, 902 Broadway, Suite 14, New York, NY, United States 10010, 2124302600..(McGann, Kevin)
May 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Scott David Baker on behalf of Google LLC. New Address: Fenwick & West LLP, 902 Broadway, 14 FL, New York, New York, United States of America 10010, (212) 430-2600..(Baker, Scott)
May 5, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Google LLC answer due 6/26/2020. (yv)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/5/20) (yv)
May 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott David Baker on behalf of Google LLC..(Baker, Scott)
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc.,, Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc., for Google LLC. Document filed by Google LLC..(McGann, Kevin)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Kevin X. McGann dated 05-04-2020. Document filed by Google LLC..(McGann, Kevin)
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin X. McGann on behalf of Google LLC..(McGann, Kevin)
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Google LLC served on 4/23/2020, answer due 5/14/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Corp. Div. NYDOS authorized. Document filed by Sholem Weisner..(Ginsburg, Jacob)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Google LLC..(pne)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pne)
April 7, 2020 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (pne)
April 7, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
April 7, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
April 7, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Google LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sholem Weisner..(Ginsburg, Jacob)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for additional pleading submitted to court for review..(Ginsburg, Jacob)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ginsburg, Jacob)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Google LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19348481)Document filed by Sholem Weisner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex.A USPN 10,380,202 n Claims, #2 Exhibit Ex.B 7.9.19 Agreement).(Ginsburg, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weisner v. Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sholem Weisner
Represented By: Jacob Ginsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Kevin X. McGann
Represented By: Scott David Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?