Irving H. Picard v. Zieses Investment Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Irving H. Picard
Defendant: Susan B. Alswanger, Caryn Zieses, Barry Inger, Neil R. Zieses, Zieses Investment Partnership, Marshall Zieses, Debra S. Zieses and Allan Inger
In Re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02872
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Referring Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Helen Davis Chaitman in Support re: #16 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Susan B. Alswanger, Allan Inger, Barry Inger, Caryn Zieses, Debra S. Zieses, Marshall Zieses, Neil R. Zieses, Zieses Investment Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 5.8.5019 Trial Transcript in Nelson, #2 Exhibit B 2.1979 BLM confirmation, #3 Exhibit C 12.2008 JPMC 703 Acct. Statement, #4 Exhibit D 2001 Amendment to SEC Form BD, #5 Exhibit E 1.1.2001 BLMIS ltr to BNY, #6 Exhibit F 1.1.2001 BLMIS ltr to NSCC, #7 Exhibit G 1.1.2001 BLMIS ltr to OCC, #8 Exhibit H 1.1.2001 BLMIS ltr to DTC, #9 Exhibit I 6.12.2018 Email, #10 Exhibit J 4.26.2017 Madoff Transcript, #11 Exhibit K SIPC letters to Scott Garrett, #12 Exhibit L JPMC 12.2001 Bank Statement, #13 Exhibit M 509 Account Statements, #14 Exhibit N 703 Account Compilation, #15 Exhibit O 8-2002 703 Account Statement, #16 Exhibit P 9-2002 703 Account Statement, #17 Exhibit Q Compilation Deposit Checks, #18 Exhibit R 3.2005 703 Account Statement, #19 Exhibit S 2.28.2005 ltr Zieses to DiPascali, #20 Exhibit T 12.1998 509 Account Statement, #21 Exhibit U 5.9.2019 Nelson Trial Transcript, #22 Exhibit V 1998-2008 Compilation Checks, #23 Exhibit W 1991 BLMIS Letterhead, #24 Exhibit X 3.1.1994 Zieses Partnership 1-05, #25 Exhibit Y 3.4.1994 Zieses Partnership AMF docs, #26 Exhibit Z 3.4.1994 Letter from M. Zieses to Madoff, #27 Exhibit AA 4.26.1997Letter from M. Zieses to DiPascali, #28 Exhibit AB 12.20.2016 Madoff Transcript, #29 Exhibit AC Brokerage Statements re Bear Sterns to 703 example, #30 Exhibit AD 5.23.2019 Crupi Transcript, #31 Exhibit AE 12.10.2013 DiPascali Transcript, #32 Exhibit AF Governments Exhibit 105-c171 to DiPascali TR, #33 Exhibit AG Zieses T-Bill Matching Analysis Chart and Supporting Documents by Tab, #34 Exhibit AH 6.2007 Misc. Cust Statements re T-Bill Matching Analysis, #35 Exhibit AI 11.30.2006 Customer Statement, #36 Exhibit AJ 7.16.2008 Letter from M. Zieses to DiPascali, #37 Exhibit AK 5.20.2020 Savin Transcript, #38 Exhibit AL 8.25.2006 Form ADV Uniform Application for IA Reg, #39 Exhibit AM 6.15.2016 Madoff Transcript, #40 Exhibit AN 3.12.2009 Plea Allocution- Madoff, #41 Exhibit AO 12.19.2011 Plea Allocution- Pitz, #42 Exhibit AP 12.13.2017 Lisa Coribello Declaration, #43 Exhibit AQ 2.13.2015 Lisa Coribello Affidavit, #44 Exhibit AR 3.3.2015 Lisa Coribello Affidavit).(Chaitman, Helen)
August 4, 2020 Filing 19 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT., REPLY re: #11 Rule 56.1 Statement . Document filed by Susan B. Alswanger, Allan Inger, Barry Inger, Caryn Zieses, Debra S. Zieses, Marshall Zieses, Neil R. Zieses, Zieses Investment Partnership..(Chaitman, Helen)
August 4, 2020 Filing 18 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #11 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Susan B. Alswanger, Allan Inger, Barry Inger, Caryn Zieses, Debra S. Zieses, Marshall Zieses, Neil R. Zieses, Zieses Investment Partnership..(Chaitman, Helen)
August 4, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . re Defendants Opposition to the Trustees Motion for Summary Judgment and in Support of Defendants Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Document filed by Susan B. Alswanger, Allan Inger, Barry Inger, Caryn Zieses, Debra S. Zieses, Marshall Zieses, Neil R. Zieses, Zieses Investment Partnership..(Chaitman, Helen)
August 4, 2020 Filing 16 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Susan B. Alswanger, Allan Inger, Barry Inger, Caryn Zieses, Debra S. Zieses, Marshall Zieses, Neil R. Zieses, Zieses Investment Partnership..(Chaitman, Helen)
June 30, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Matthew B. Greenblatt in Support re: #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Irving H. Picard. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Principal Balance Calculation Report of Matthew B Greenblatt, #2 Exhibit 1 - Principal Balance Calculation Report of Matthew B Greenblatt, #3 Exhibit 2 - Principal Balance Calculation Report of Matthew B Greenblatt, #4 Exhibit 3 - Principal Balance Calculation Report of Matthew B Greenblatt, #5 Exhibit 4 - Principal Balance Calculation Report of Matthew B Greenblatt, #6 Exhibit 5 - Principal Balance Calculation Report of Matthew B Greenblatt, #7 Exhibit 6 - Principal Balance Calculation Report of Matthew B Greenblatt, #8 Exhibit 7 - Principal Balance Calculation Report of Matthew B Greenblatt, #9 Exhibit 8 - Principal Balance Calculation Report of Matthew B Greenblatt, #10 Attachment B - Final Report of Matthew B Greenblatt-Zieses Defendants, #11 Exhibit 1 - Final Report of Matthew B Greenblatt-Zieses Defendants, #12 Exhibit 2 - Final Report of Matthew B Greenblatt-Zieses Defendants, #13 Exhibit 3 - Final Report of Matthew B Greenblatt-Zieses Defendants, #14 Exhibit 4 - Final Report of Matthew B Greenblatt-Zieses Defendants, #15 Attachment C - Greenblatt_CV_6.1.2020).(Cremona, Nicholas)
June 30, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Lisa M. Collura in Support re: #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Irving H. Picard. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Expert Report of Lisa M. Collura - 1.16.2019, #2 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Lisa M Collura - 1.16.2019, #3 Exhibit 2 - Expert Report of Lisa M Collura - 1.16.2019, #4 Exhibit 3 - Expert Report of Lisa M Collura - 1.16.2019, #5 Exhibit 4 (Excerpt) - Expert Report of Lisa M Collura - 1.16.2019, #6 Exhibit 5 (Excerpt) - Expert Report of Lisa M Collura - 1.16.2019, #7 Exhibit 6 (Excerpt) - Expert Report of Lisa M Collura - 1.16.2019, #8 Exhibit 7 - Expert Report of Lisa M Collura - 1.16.2019, #9 Exhibit 8.1 - Expert Report of Lisa M Collura - 1.16.2019, #10 Exhibit 8.2 - Expert Report of Lisa M Collura - 1.16.2019, #11 Exhibit 9 - Expert Report of Lisa M Collura - 1.16.2019, #12 Exhibit 10 - Expert Report of Lisa M Collura - 1.16.2019, #13 Exhibit 11 - Expert Report of Lisa M Collura - 1.16.2019, #14 Exhibit 12 - Expert Report of Lisa M Collura - 1.16.2019, #15 Exhibit 13 - Expert Report of Lisa M Collura - 1.16.2019, #16 Exhibit 14 - Expert Report of Lisa M Collura - 1.16.2019, #17 Exhibit 15 - Expert Report of Lisa M Collura - 1.16.2019, #18 Exhibit 16 - Expert Report of Lisa M Collura - 1.16.2019, #19 Exhibit 17 - Expert Report of Lisa M Collura - 1.16.2019, #20 Exhibit 18 - Expert Report of Lisa M Collura - 1.16.2019, #21 Attachment B - Expert Report of Lisa M. Collura - Zieses - 5.14.2015, #22 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Lisa M. Collura - Zieses - 5.14.2015, #23 Exhibit 2 - Expert Report of Lisa M. Collura - Zieses - 5.14.2015, #24 Exhibit 3 - Expert Report of Lisa M. Collura - Zieses - 5.14.2015, #25 Exhibit 4 (slipsheet) - Expert Report of Lisa M. Collura - Zieses - 5.14.2015, #26 Exhibit 5 (slipsheet) - Expert Report of Lisa M. Collura - Zieses - 5.14.2015, #27 Exhibit 6 (slipsheet) - Expert Report of Lisa M. Collura - Zieses - 5.14.2015, #28 Exhibit 7 - Expert Report of Lisa M. Collura - Zieses - 5.14.2015, #29 Exhibit 8 - Expert Report of Lisa M. Collura - Zieses - 5.14.2015, #30 Exhibit 9 - Expert Report of Lisa M. Collura - Zieses - 5.14.2015, #31 Exhibit 10 - Expert Report of Lisa M. Collura - Zieses - 5.14.2015, #32 Exhibit 11.1 - Expert Report of Lisa M. Collura - Zieses - 5.14.2015, #33 Exhibit 11.2 - Expert Report of Lisa M. Collura - Zieses - 5.14.2015, #34 Attachment C - Lisa Collura CV June 2020).(Cremona, Nicholas)
June 30, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Nicholas J. Cremona in Support re: #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Irving H. Picard. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Form BD - PUBLIC0003607, #2 Ex. 2 - Amended Form BD (ECF), #3 Ex. 3 - DiPascali Testimony (ECF), #4 Ex. 4 - 703 and 509 Statement Exemplar Exhibit, #5 Ex. 5 - Madoff Plea Allocution, #6 Ex. 6 - DiPascali Plea Allocution, #7 Ex. 7 - Kugel Plea Allocution, #8 Ex. 8 - Irwin Lipkin Plea Allocution (ECF), #9 Ex. 9 - Eric Lipkin Plea Allocution, #10 Ex. 10 - Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz Plea Allocution (ECF), #11 Ex. 11 - Requests for Admission, #12 Ex. 12 - Interrogatories, #13 Ex. 13 - 10.28.2015 Transcript).(Cremona, Nicholas)
June 30, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Bruce G. Dubinsky in Support re: #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Irving H. Picard. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Dubinsky BLMIS Expert Report 1.16.19_Redacted, #2 Appendix A, #3 Appendix A updated June 2019, #4 Appendix B dated 1.16.19, #5 Appendix B Schedule 1 1.16.19, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10_Redacted, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15, #21 Exhibit 16, #22 Exhibit 17, #23 Exhibit 18, #24 Exhibit 19, #25 Exhibit 20, #26 Exhibit 21, #27 Exhibit 22, #28 Exhibit 23, #29 Exhibit 24, #30 Exhibit 25, #31 Exhibit 26, #32 Exhibit 27, #33 Exhibit 28, #34 Exhibit 29, #35 Exhibit 30, #36 Exhibit 31_Redacted, #37 Exhibit 32, #38 Exhibit 33, #39 Exhibit 34, #40 Exhibit 35, #41 Attachment B - Dubinsky_CV updated June 2020).(Cremona, Nicholas)
June 30, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Cremona, Nicholas)
June 30, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Cremona, Nicholas)
June 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Cremona, Nicholas)
June 22, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 8/4/2020. Motions due by 6/30/2020. Responses due by 8/25/2020 Replies due by 9/1/2020. (mro)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting #6 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. I am in receipt of counsel for Plaintiff's letter of June 17, 2020, and counsel for Defendant's letter of June 17, 2020, both requesting an extension of pages in the opening and opposition briefs on the summary judgment motion. Both requests are granted, the parties are to submit opening and opposition briefs no longer than 35 pages. I am also in receipt of the parties' joint request to revise the briefing schedule. The proposed revised briefing schedule is adopted. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/22/2020) (mro)
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re Agreed Upon Revised Briefing Schedule addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Helen Davis Chaitman dated June 19, 2020. Document filed by Susan B. Alswanger, Allan Inger, Barry Inger, Caryn Zieses, Debra S. Zieses, Marshall Zieses, Neil R. Zieses, Zieses Investment Partnership..(Chaitman, Helen)
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and in response to Trustee's Request to File an Enlarged Memorandum of Law addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Helen Davis Chaitman dated June 17, 2020. Document filed by Susan B. Alswanger, Allan Inger, Barry Inger, Caryn Zieses, Debra S. Zieses, Marshall Zieses, Neil R. Zieses, Zieses Investment Partnership..(Chaitman, Helen)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Nicholas J.Cremona dated June 17, 2020. Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Cremona, Nicholas)
June 4, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 6/30/2020. (yv)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #3 Letter Consent to Withdrawal of the Reference and Requesting Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule filed by Irving H. Picard. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' motion to withdraw pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 157(d) and Rule 5011 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure filed by Defendants on April 7, 2020 (Doc. 1) is Granted, on consent of Plaintiff (see Doc. 3). The parties' proposed briefing schedule on the motion for summary judgment is adopted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/4/20) (yv)
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Nicholas J. Cremona dated May 27, 2020 re: Consent to Withdrawal of the Reference and Requesting Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Cremona, Nicholas)
May 19, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Lewis J. Liman is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
April 7, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (bkar)
April 7, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bkar)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(bkar)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4669A, 08-1789A (SMB).Document filed by Zieses Investment Partnership, Barry Inger, Susan B. Alswanger, Caryn Zieses, Marshall Zieses, Neil R. Zieses, Debra S. Zieses, Allan Inger. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Helen Davis Chaitman, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Proposed Order).(bkar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irving H. Picard v. Zieses Investment Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan B. Alswanger
Represented By: Helen Davis Chaitman
Represented By: Philippe Marc Salomon
Represented By: Anthony Alexander Mingione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caryn Zieses
Represented By: Helen Davis Chaitman
Represented By: Philippe Marc Salomon
Represented By: Anthony Alexander Mingione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Inger
Represented By: Helen Davis Chaitman
Represented By: Philippe Marc Salomon
Represented By: Anthony Alexander Mingione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil R. Zieses
Represented By: Helen Davis Chaitman
Represented By: Philippe Marc Salomon
Represented By: Anthony Alexander Mingione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zieses Investment Partnership
Represented By: Helen Davis Chaitman
Represented By: Anthony Alexander Mingione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Zieses
Represented By: Helen Davis Chaitman
Represented By: Philippe Marc Salomon
Represented By: Anthony Alexander Mingione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra S. Zieses
Represented By: Helen Davis Chaitman
Represented By: Philippe Marc Salomon
Represented By: Anthony Alexander Mingione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Inger
Represented By: Helen Davis Chaitman
Represented By: Philippe Marc Salomon
Represented By: Anthony Alexander Mingione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irving H. Picard
Represented By: Nicholas J. Cremona
Represented By: David J. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?