Watkins v. Harlem Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Edna Watkins
Defendant: Harlem Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC and The Allure Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02919
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pi
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Harlem Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC waiver sent on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020; The Allure Group, Inc. waiver sent on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. Document filed by Edna Watkins..(Gray, Robin)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jon David Lichtenstein on behalf of Harlem Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC, The Allure Group, Inc...(Lichtenstein, Jon)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/17/2020 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/16/2020) (rro)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Allure Group, Inc...(jgo)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to The Allure Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Edna Watkins..(Gray, Robin)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gray, Robin)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Harlem Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC..(jgo)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robin Jean Gray to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the PDF 'To' section does not exactly match as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robin Jean Gray. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $15000000000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robin Jean Gray. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Edna Watkins; Harlem Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC; The Allure Group, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Robin Jean Gray to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF was not signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Allure Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Edna Watkins..(Gray, Robin) Modified on 4/10/2020 (jgo).
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Harlem Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Edna Watkins..(Gray, Robin)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Edna Watkins..(Gray, Robin)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gray, Robin) Modified on 4/10/2020 (jgo).
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harlem Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC, The Allure Group, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19388109)Document filed by Edna Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Photographs, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Photographs).(Gray, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. Harlem Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Watkins
Represented By: Robin Jean Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harlem Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Jon David Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Allure Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jon David Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?