Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London et al v. Mendoza et al
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London and Prime Insurance Company, Prime Insurance Company and Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London
Defendant: NYC Security Services, Inc., Jose Mendoza and John Doe - Security Guard
Case Number: 1:2020cv02939
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 in
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. NYC Security Services, Inc. served on 5/20/2020, answer due 6/10/2020. Service was accepted by Maria Feliz, Mother of Owner. Document filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London; Prime Insurance Company..(Roberto, Joanna)
May 11, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Jose Mendoza served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Document filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London; Prime Insurance Company..(Roberto, Joanna)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendants shall, by June 10, 2020, email a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/node/754 and attached to this order, to Orders_and_Judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by June 10, 2020, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/7/2020) (jca)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/7/2020) (rjm)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, at 12:00 p.m., on June 17, 2020, to be held telephonically. The parties are directed to dial 888-398-2342 or 215-861-0674, and enter access code 5598827. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 6/17/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/7/2020) (jca)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Roberto, Joanna)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NYC Security Services, Inc...(pne)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jose Mendoza..(pne)
April 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joanna Michelle Roberto re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY and JOHN DOE SECURITYGUARD must be added to the case. Use the event type ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne)
April 13, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Roberto, Joanna)
April 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joanna Michelle Roberto. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 190 (Contract: Other). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 110 (Insurance). (pne)
April 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joanna Michelle Roberto. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pne)
April 13, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
April 13, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
April 13, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
April 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Joanna Michelle Roberto to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): no courthouse selection was made on the civil cover sheet; the civil cover sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the corrected PDF. (pne)
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYC Security Services Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London and Prime Insurance Company..(Roberto, Joanna)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jose Mendoza, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London and Prime Insurance Company..(Roberto, Joanna)
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR -CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Roberto, Joanna) Modified on 4/13/2020 (pne).
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY - COMPLAINT against Jose Mendoza, NYC Security Services, Inc.. Document filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London and Prime Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Jose Mendoza, #3 Summons to NYC Security Services Inc.).(Roberto, Joanna) Modified on 4/10/2020 (jgo).
April 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jose Mendoza, NYC Security Services, Inc.. Document filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London and Prime Insurance Company..(Roberto, Joanna)
April 10, 2020 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19403982..(Roberto, Joanna)
April 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joanna Michelle Roberto to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 4/15/2020. (pne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London et al v. Mendoza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Security Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe - Security Guard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London and Prime Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prime Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London
Represented By: Joanna Michelle Roberto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?