Jack London Square Associates, LLC v. Access Equity Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Jack London Square Associates, LLC
Defendant: Access Equity Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03086
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332ni
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DEFAULT JUDGMENT. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That the Plaintiff have judgment against Defendant in the liquidated amount of $250,000, with interest at 9% from the date of dishonor of the Letter of Credit amounting to $8,691.75, plus costs and disbursements of this action in the amount of $775.65, amounting in all to $259,467.40. Plaintiff's motion for default judgment is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 24 and to close the case., Motions terminated: #24 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Access Equity Group, LLC. filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC, #15 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Access Equity Group LLC . filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/5/20) (yv)
August 3, 2020 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Court Order re Telephonic Hearing on Motion for Default Judgment served on Access Equity Group, LLC on August 3, 2020. Service was made by Overnight Courier. Document filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC..(Babst, Lauren)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER, The default judgment hearing scheduled for August 5, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. will be held by remotely by teleconference in accordance with Rule 2(A) of the Court's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-mfurman. The parties should join the hearing by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. (Members of the public and press may also attend using the same dial-in information; they will not be allowed to speak during the conference.) It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff serve Defendant via overnight courier with a copy of this Order within one business day of the date of this Order and, within two business days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff must file proof of such service on the docket. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 8/5/2020 at 03:30 PM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/31/20) (yv)
July 10, 2020 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion for Default Judgment served on Access Equity Group, LLC on 7/9/2020. Service was made by Fedex Overnight. Document filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC..(Babst, Lauren)
July 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. #27 Proposed Default Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
July 8, 2020 Filing 27 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC..(Babst, Lauren) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
July 8, 2020 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Lauren Babst in Support re: #24 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Access Equity Group, LLC.. Document filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC..(Babst, Lauren)
July 8, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #24 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Access Equity Group, LLC. . Document filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC..(Babst, Lauren)
July 8, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Access Equity Group, LLC. Document filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC..(Babst, Lauren)
June 25, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Certificate of Default and Court Order re Default Judgment Briefing served on Access Equity Group, LLC on June 25, 2020. Service was made by OVERNIGHT COURIER. Document filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC..(Babst, Lauren)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SCHEDULING DEFAULT JUDGMENT BRIEFING AND SHOW CAUSE HEARING: In light of the foregoing, it is hereby ORDERED that any motion for default judgment shall be filed, in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases (available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman), no later than July 8, 2020. Defendant shall file any opposition to the motion for default judgment no later than July 15, 2020. If a motion for default judgment is filed, it is further ORDERED that Defendant appear and show cause before this Court, Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York, on August 5, 2020 at 3:30 p.m., why an order should not be issued granting a default judgment against Defendant. Prior to that date, Plaintiff must file the proposed default judgment order electronically, using the ECF Filing Event "Proposed Default Judgment," for the Clerk's approval. (as further set forth herein). The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 14, because the certificate of default requested has been issued, see ECF No. 21. Finally, it is ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference previously scheduled for July 15, 2020 is adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Show Cause Hearing set for 8/5/2020 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.), (Motions due by 7/8/2020., Responses due by 7/15/2020) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/24/2020) (kv)
June 24, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Access Equity Group, LLC.(km)
June 24, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Request for Clerk's Certificate of Default served on Access Equity Group, LLC on 6/24/2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC..(Babst, Lauren)
June 24, 2020 Filing 19 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC..(Babst, Lauren) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
June 24, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Lauren E. Babst in Support re: #15 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Access Equity Group LLC .. Document filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC..(Babst, Lauren)
June 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Lauren Babst. RE-FILE Document No. #16 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the clerk's certificate that was filed is blank. Please fill it out as to who you are looking for default against. An attorney's affidavit in support is also required. (Filed under other answers, affidavit in support of a non-motion). (km)
June 24, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Request for Certificate of Default served on Access Equity Group LLC on June 23, 2020. Service was made by E-Service. Document filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC..(Babst, Lauren)
June 24, 2020 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC..(Babst, Lauren) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 6/24/2020 (km).
June 23, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Access Equity Group LLC . Document filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren E. Babst).(Babst, Lauren)
May 13, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Access Equity Group, LLC served on 5/4/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Doughterty, Authorized to accept service at the New York Secretary of State. Document filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC..(Babst, Lauren)
April 29, 2020 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Access Equity Group, LLC.Document filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Babst, Lauren)
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Access Equity Group, LLC served on 4/23/2020, answer due 5/14/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized to Accept in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC..(Babst, Lauren)
April 22, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Access Equity Group, LLC..(pne)
April 21, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Access Equity Group LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC..(Babst, Lauren)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, It is hereby ORDERED that, on or before April 30, 2020, the Plaintiff shall amend its Complaint to allege the citizenship of each constituent person or entity comprising the Defendant LLCs as well as the citizenship of all individual parties. If, by that date, the Plaintiff is unable to amend the Complaint to truthfully allege complete diversity of citizenship, then the Complaint will be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction without further notice to either party. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2020.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/17/20) (yv)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on July 15, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. All counsel are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF and to familiarize themselves with the SDNY ECF Rules & Instructions, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference.The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 7/15/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/17/20) (yv)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Stephen George Preonas to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
April 17, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Stephen George Preonas to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19484896. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Stephen George Preonas to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19484896. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Preonas, Stephen)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Lauren E. Babst to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
April 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lauren Babst. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
April 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lauren Babst. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jack London Square Associates, LLC, Access Equity Group, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pne)
April 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
April 17, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
April 17, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
April 16, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Lauren E. Babst to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19474931. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Lauren E. Babst to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19474931. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Babst, Lauren)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC..(Babst, Lauren)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Babst, Lauren)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Access Equity Group, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19474423)Document filed by Jack London Square Associates, LLC..(Babst, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jack London Square Associates, LLC v. Access Equity Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Access Equity Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack London Square Associates, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Babst
Represented By: Stephen George Preonas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?