Burke et al v. Clearview AI, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Pomerene and Sean Burke
Defendant: Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That, Clearview AI, Inc. and Does 1 through 10
Intervenor: David Mutnick
Case Number: 1:2020cv03104
Filed: April 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Northern District of Illinois acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:21-cv-00171, filed on 01/12/2021. (sjo)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of Illinois. (Signed by MDL Panel on 1/8/2021) (sjo)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of Illinois. (sjo)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen McMahon: Telephone Conference held on 9/9/2020. Decision: Conference held. Proceedings in these six matters are stayed pending a disposition from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. There will be no conference September 16, 2020.Submitted by: Chloe Lewis (Court Reporter Pamela Utter). (mde)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CALENDAR NOTICE: Please take notice that the above captioned matter has been scheduled for a: Telephone Conference on Wednesday, September 9, 2020 at 10:30 A.M. before the Honorable Colleen McMahon, United States District Judge. Parties should dial in at 1(888)363-4749, access code (9054506) to join the conference Any scheduling difficulties must be brought to the attention of the Court in writing and faxed to Chambers at (212) 805-6326. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 9/9/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/18/2020) (mml)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION to Transfer Case / Motion of the Clearview Defendants for Transfer of Actions to the Southern District of New York Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Richard Schwartz, #4 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Hoan Ton-That, #5 Proof of Service, #6 ILN 1:20-512, #7 ILN 1:20-846, #8 ILN 1:20-2989, #9 ILN 1:20-3843, #10 NYS 1:20-1296, #11 NYS 1:20-2222, #12 NYS 1:20-3053, #13 NYS 1:20-3104, #14 NYS 1:20-3481, #15 NYS 1:20-3705).(Wolosky, Lee)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel Laurence Kurtzberg on behalf of Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Kurtzberg, Joel)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Floyd Abrams on behalf of Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Abrams, Floyd)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING THE MOTION TO INTERVENE AND TO DISMISS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO STAY CASES OR TRANSFER VENUE denying #16 Motion to Intervene. Mutnick's motion for leave to intervene permissively is, therefore, DENIED. This constitutes the decision and order of the Court. It is a written opinion. The Clerk of the Court is directed to remove the motion at Dkt. No. 22 from the Court's list of pending motions. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/29/2020) (mml)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of David Mutnick's Notice of Supplemental Information in Support of Motion to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue re: #16 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue.. Document filed by David Mutnick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1).(Drury, Scott)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #44 Supplemental Letter granting #42 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' time to respond to complaints in these actions is adjourned sine die. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/14/2020) (mml)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Lee Wolosky dated May 12, 2020 re: David Mutnick's May 11, 2020 supplemental filing [Dkt. 46]. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Wolosky, Lee)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority and Information re: #16 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue.. Document filed by David Mutnick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2).(Drury, Scott)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Alreen Haeggquist to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #28 Motion for Ian Pike to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #30 Motion for Amber L. Eckto Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #38 Motion for Scott Robert Drury to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #24 Motion for Aaron M. Olsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/11/2020). (mde)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Lee Wolosky dated May 11, 2020 re: Motion to Extend Time to File Answer. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Wolosky, Lee)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Lee Wolosky dated May 5, 2020 re: Motion to Extend Time to File Answer. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Wolosky, Lee)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #6 Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Lee Wolosky dated May 4, 2020. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Wolosky, Lee)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 DECLARATION of Scott R. Drury in Support re: #16 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue.. Document filed by David Mutnick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5).(Drury, Scott)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue. . Document filed by David Mutnick..(Drury, Scott)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #37 DAVID MUTNICK'S REQUEST TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM EXCEEDING 10 PAGES. ENDORSEMENT: OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/4/2020) (mml)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Scott Robert Drury to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19694681. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by David Mutnick. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Scott R. Drury, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Affidavit).(Drury, Scott)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #38 MOTION for Scott Robert Drury to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19694681. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Karen Newirth dated 05/01/2020. Document filed by David Mutnick..(Newirth, Karen)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DECLARATION of Joseph P. Guglielmo in Opposition re: #16 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue.. Document filed by Sean Burke, James Pomerene. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Burke - Mem ISO Transfer Mot, #2 Exhibit 2 - Roberson - Mem ISO Transfer Mot, #3 Exhibit 3 - Roberson - Mulcaire Decl, #4 Exhibit 4 - Mutnick - Mem ISO Stay Mot, #5 Exhibit 5 - Mutnick - Mem ISO Transfer Mot, #6 Exhibit 6 - Mutnick - Schwartz Decl, #7 Exhibit 7 - Mutnick - Ton-That Decl, #8 Exhibit 8 - ND ILL - 3d Gen Am Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - BuzzFeed Article, #10 Exhibit 10 - Mutnick - Briefing Schedule).(Guglielmo, Joseph)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #16 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue. . Document filed by Sean Burke, James Pomerene..(Guglielmo, Joseph)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DECLARATION of Lee S. Wolosky in Opposition re: #16 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue.. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4).(Wolosky, Lee)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #16 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue. . Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Wolosky, Lee)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Wolosky, Lee)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #31 Proposed Order, #29 Proposed Order, #27 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (ad)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #30 MOTION for Amber L. Eck to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19583003. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #28 MOTION for Ian Pike to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19582400. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #26 MOTION for Alreen Haeggquist to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19582199. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Sean Burke, James Pomerene. Related Document Number: #30 ..(Eck, Amber) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Amber L. Eck to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19583003. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sean Burke, James Pomerene. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing).(Eck, Amber)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Sean Burke, James Pomerene. Related Document Number: #28 ..(Pike, Ian) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Ian Pike to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19582400. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sean Burke, James Pomerene. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing).(Pike, Ian)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Sean Burke, James Pomerene. Related Document Number: #26 ..(Haeggquist, Alreen) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Alreen Haeggquist to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19582199. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sean Burke, James Pomerene. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing).(Haeggquist, Alreen)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Sean Burke, James Pomerene. Related Document Number: #24 ..(Olsen, Aaron) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Aaron M. Olsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19579638. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sean Burke, James Pomerene. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing).(Olsen, Aaron)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-01296-CM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #24 MOTION for Aaron M. Olsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19579638. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Kate T. Spelman, New Attorney: Lee S. Wolosky, Address: Jenner & Block LLP, 919 Third Avenue, 38th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10022, (212) 891-1600. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kate T. Spelman).(Wolosky, Lee)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lee Scott Wolosky on behalf of Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Wolosky, Lee)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Joshua Lichtman on behalf of Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Lichtman, Andrew)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to respond to Mutnick's Motion to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue in their respective dockets by 5 PM on April 29, 2020. (Responses due by 4/29/2020.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/22/2020) (mml)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Anne Newirth on behalf of David Mutnick..(Newirth, Karen)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DECLARATION of Scott R. Drury in Support re: #16 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue.. Document filed by David Mutnick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L).(Newirth, Karen)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue. . Document filed by David Mutnick..(Newirth, Karen)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue. Document filed by David Mutnick..(Newirth, Karen)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carey Alexander on behalf of Sean Burke, James Pomerene..(Alexander, Carey)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-01296. Document filed by Sean Burke, James Pomerene..(Guglielmo, Joseph)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Peter Guglielmo on behalf of Sean Burke, James Pomerene..(Guglielmo, Joseph)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Southern; Case Number: 3:20-cv-00370. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED TO Judge Colleen McMahon as possibly related to 1:20-cv-01296. (sjo)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Case transferred to District of Southern District of New York. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Southern District of New York*.. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/15/20. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (dlg) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/17/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) by Sean Burke, James Pomerene. (Olsen, Aaron) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/17/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sean Burke, James Pomerene, as to Richard Schwartz. (Olsen, Aaron) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/17/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sean Burke, James Pomerene, as to Hoan Ton-That. (Olsen, Aaron) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/17/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sean Burke, James Pomerene, as to Clearview AI, Inc.. (Olsen, Aaron) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/17/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Sean Burke, James Pomerene. (Olsen, Aaron) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/17/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Spelman, Kate) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/17/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Venue and Stay Case Pending Decision on Transfer by Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue and Stay Case Pending Decision on Transfer, #2 Declaration of Thomas Mulcaire, #3 Table of Contents for Exhibits 1 and 2, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2)(Spelman, Kate) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/17/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kate Spelman on behalf of Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That (Spelman, Kate)Attorney Kate Spelman added to party Clearview AI, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kate Spelman added to party Richard Schwartz(pty:dft), Attorney Kate Spelman added to party Hoan Ton-That(pty:dft) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/17/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/17/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Clearview AI, Inc., DOES 1 through 10, James Pomerene, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13535863.), filed by Sean Burke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-370-BAS-MSB. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Olsen, Aaron)(smd)(sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke et al v. Clearview AI, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Pomerene
Represented By: Aaron M. Olsen
Represented By: Aaron Olsen
Represented By: Alreen Haeggquist
Represented By: Amber L. Eck
Represented By: Carey Alexander
Represented By: Ian Pike
Represented By: Joseph Peter Guglielmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Burke
Represented By: Aaron M. Olsen
Represented By: Carey Alexander
Represented By: Joseph Peter Guglielmo
Represented By: Ian Pike
Represented By: Amber L. Eck
Represented By: Alreen Haeggquist
Represented By: Aaron Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Schwartz
Represented By: Kate Spelman
Represented By: Lee Scott Wolosky
Represented By: Andrew Joshua Lichtman
Represented By: Floyd Abrams
Represented By: Joel Laurence Kurtzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoan Ton-That
Represented By: Andrew Joshua Lichtman
Represented By: Kate Spelman
Represented By: Lee Scott Wolosky
Represented By: Floyd Abrams
Represented By: Joel Laurence Kurtzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearview AI, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Joshua Lichtman
Represented By: Kate Spelman
Represented By: Lee Scott Wolosky
Represented By: Floyd Abrams
Represented By: Joel Laurence Kurtzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: David Mutnick
Represented By: Scott Drury
Represented By: Karen Anne Newirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?