Picon v. Travelex Currency Services Inc.
Plaintiff: ROBERT PICON
Defendant: TRAVELEX CURRENCY SERVICES INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03147
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332fr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Jonathan B. New in Support re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Travelex Currency Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants Response to Demand Letter).(New, Jonathan)
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Travelex Currency Services Inc...(New, Jonathan)
August 14, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Document filed by Travelex Currency Services Inc...(New, Jonathan)
July 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 8/14/2020. Responses due by 9/14/2020. Replies due by 10/5/2020. (jwh)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: The proposed schedule for the filing and briefing of the motion to dismiss is approved. Discovery is stayed. Conference is adjourned from July 20 to December 7, 2020 at 12 PM. (Initial Conference set for 12/7/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 7/2/2020) (jwh)
July 2, 2020 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Set a Briefing Schedule for Travelex's Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jonathan B. New dated July 2, 2020. Document filed by Travelex Currency Services Inc...(New, Jonathan)
June 23, 2020 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Neal J. Deckant dated June 23, 2020 re: Response to Defendant's June 15, 2020 Letter. Document filed by Robert Picon..(Deckant, Neal)
June 23, 2020 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Travelex Currency Services Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Robert Picon. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Deckant, Neal)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #15 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jonathan B. New dated June 15, 2020 re: Proposed Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Travelex Currency Services Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff should respond to the letter of June 15 and state unambiguously and unequivocally whether he wishes to amend his complaint at this time. Response due June 23, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/16/2020) (rjm)
June 15, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jonathan B. New dated June 15, 2020 re: Proposed Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Travelex Currency Services Inc...(New, Jonathan)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Paul G. Karlsgodt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
June 11, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 AMENDED MOTION for Paul G. Karlsgodt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
June 11, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED MOTION for Paul G. Karlsgodt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20215069 Document filed by Travelex Currency Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Corrected Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Colorado Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Washington Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order).(Karlsgodt, Paul) Modified on 6/11/2020 (ad).
June 11, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #12 MOTION for Paul G. Karlsgodt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20215069. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The applicants pro hac vice motion must include a sworn statement, i.e. a notarized affidavit;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (ad)
June 11, 2020 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PRO HAC VICE MOTION - MOTION for Paul G. Karlsgodt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20215069. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Travelex Currency Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Colorado Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Washington Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order).(Karlsgodt, Paul) Modified on 6/11/2020 (ad).
May 11, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 7/20/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (jwh)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ENDORSEMENT: Time to answer is extended to June 15, 2020. Conference adjourned from June 24 to July 20, 2020 at 11:00am. It will be conducted telephonically. No later than seventy-two hours before the conference, plaintiff's counsel shall: (a) docket a letter on ECF to the Court with copy to all opposing counsel containing the call-in information and email the letter to castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov; and (b) for an initial pretrial conference, email a copy of the agreed upon (or disputed) Civil Case Management Plan & Scheduling Order to: castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. (Travelex Currency Services Inc. answer due 6/15/2020.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/11/2020) (jwh)
May 11, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Travelex NY, Inc. for Travelex Currency Services Inc.. Document filed by Travelex Currency Services Inc...(New, Jonathan)
May 11, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint and Adjournment of the Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jonathan B. New dated May 11, 2020. Document filed by Travelex Currency Services Inc...(New, Jonathan)
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robyn Mara Feldstein on behalf of Travelex Currency Services Inc...(Feldstein, Robyn)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Brian New on behalf of Travelex Currency Services Inc...(New, Jonathan)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Travelex Currency Services Inc. served on 4/22/2020, answer due 5/13/2020. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Registered Agent. Document filed by Robert Picon..(Deckant, Neal)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/24/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11D at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/22/2020) (mro)
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Travelex Currency Services Inc...(pne)
April 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Neal Jamison Deckant. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
April 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Neal Jamison Deckant. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ROBERT PICON, TRAVELEX CURRENCY SERVICES INC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (pne)
April 21, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
April 21, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
April 21, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Travelex Currency Services Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by ROBERT PICON..(Deckant, Neal)
April 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Deckant, Neal)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TRAVELEX CURRENCY SERVICES INC.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19508391)Document filed by ROBERT PICON..(Deckant, Neal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Picon v. Travelex Currency Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT PICON
Represented By: Neal Jamison Deckant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVELEX CURRENCY SERVICES INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Brian New
Represented By: Robyn Mara Feldstein
Represented By: Paul G Karlsgodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?