Litovich v. Bank Of America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Isabel Litovich, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund, Frank Hirsch, Michael V. Cottrell and Holdcraft Marital Trust
Defendant: Natwest Markets Securities Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Bank Of America Corporation, Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley,, Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC, The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities LLC, BofA Securities, Inc., Barclays Capital Inc. and Wells Fargo & Co.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03154
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/29/2020. Motions due by 12/15/2020. Responses due by 1/28/2021. Replies due by 3/15/2021. (va)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting #122 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. The revised schedule is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 9/25/2020) (va)
September 25, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #123 MOTION for Glen E. Summers to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #124 MOTION for Karma M. Giulianelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
September 25, 2020 Filing 124 MOTION for Karma M. Giulianelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Certificates of Good Standing from CO and CA, #3 Exhibit C - Text of [Proposed] Order).(Giulianelli, Karma)
September 25, 2020 Filing 123 MOTION for Glen E. Summers to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Certificates of Good Standing from CO and CA, #3 Exhibit C - Text of [Proposed] Order).(Summers, Glen)
September 22, 2020 Filing 122 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Christopher M. Burke dated 9/22/2020. Document filed by Michael V. Cottrell, Frank Hirsch, Holdcraft Marital Trust, Isabel Litovich, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund..(Burke, Christopher)
September 18, 2020 Filing 121 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Herbert Scott Washer on behalf of Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. New Address: Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP, 32 Old Slip, New York, NY, United States 10005, 2127013000..(Washer, Herbert)
September 15, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #120 MOTION for Karma M. Giulianelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21661464. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT OF CALIFORNIA;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
September 15, 2020 Filing 120 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Karma M. Giulianelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21661464. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - CO & CA Certs of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Text of [Proposed] Order).(Giulianelli, Karma) Modified on 9/15/2020 (vba).
September 15, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #119 MOTION for Glen E. Summers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21660982. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT OF CALIFORNIA;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
September 15, 2020 Filing 119 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Glen E. Summers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21660982. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - CO & CA Certs of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Text of [Proposed] Order).(Summers, Glen) Modified on 9/15/2020 (vba).
September 10, 2020 Filing 118 DECLARATION of Richard C. Pepperman II in Support re: #116 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC, The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18).(Pepperman, Richard)
September 10, 2020 Filing 117 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #116 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Bank Of America Corporation, Barclays Capital Inc., BofA Securities, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Morgan Stanley,, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC..(Pepperman, Richard)
September 10, 2020 Filing 116 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Bank Of America Corporation, Barclays Capital Inc., BofA Securities, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Morgan Stanley,, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC..(Pepperman, Richard)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #114 Motion for Douglas A. Millen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mg)
August 3, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #114 MOTION for Douglas A. Millen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20970126. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 3, 2020 Filing 114 MOTION for Douglas A. Millen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20970126. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Frank Hirsch. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Millen, Douglas)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #111 Motion for Lindsey C. Grossman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mg)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #110 Motion for Michael E. Criden to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mg)
July 16, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #111 MOTION for Lindsey C. Grossman to Appear Pro Hac Vice receipt number ANYSDC-20585460. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #110 MOTION for Michael E. Criden to Appear Pro Hac Vice receipt number ANYSDC-20583912. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
July 16, 2020 Filing 111 MOTION for Lindsey C. Grossman to Appear Pro Hac Vice receipt number ANYSDC-20585460. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Isabel Litovich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order).(Grossman, Lindsey)
July 16, 2020 Filing 110 MOTION for Michael E. Criden to Appear Pro Hac Vice receipt number ANYSDC-20583912. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Isabel Litovich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order).(Criden, Michael)
July 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christopher M. Burke. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund; Holdcraft Marital Trust; Michael V. Cottrell; Frank Hirsch. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Plaintiff's position is that this case is to be tried to a jury. Defendants reserve all rights with respect to whether this case is to be tried to a jury. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is one month. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 7/14/2020) (va)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO ADD NAMED PLAINTIFFS AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL granting #94 Motion for Leave to File Document; granting #94 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Having considered the Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Add Named Plaintiffs and for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel (the "Motion") and the submissions made by Plaintiff's counsel, the Court Orders as follows: (As further set forth herein this Order.) Pursuant to Rule 21 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Interim Class Counsel,as designated in this Order, should file a Consolidated Complaint no later than July 14, 2020 adding Frank Hirsch, Michael V. Cottrell, Holdcraft Marital Trust, and United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund as Named Plaintiffs. IT IS SO ORDERED this 14 day of July, 2020. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 7/14/2020) (va)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #105 Motion for Andrew W. Chang to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mg)
July 14, 2020 Filing 106 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,, against Bank Of America Corporation, Barclays Capital Inc., BofA Securities, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Morgan Stanley,, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Isabel Litovich, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund, Holdcraft Marital Trust, Michael V. Cottrell, Frank Hirsch. Related document: #1 Complaint,,..(Burke, Christopher) Modified on 7/15/2020 (jgo).
July 14, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #105 MOTION for Andrew W. Chang to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20674587. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
July 14, 2020 Filing 105 MOTION for Andrew W. Chang to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20674587. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DC Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration in Support of Motion).(Chang, Andrew)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #103 Motion for Joshua H. Grabar to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mg)
July 9, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #103 MOTION for Joshua H. Grabar to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
July 9, 2020 Filing 103 MOTION for Joshua H. Grabar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Isabel Litovich. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Notarized Affidavit of Joshua H. Grabar, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Issued July 7 2020, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Grabar, Joshua)
July 9, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #102 MOTION for Joshua H. Grabar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20616083. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason: Affidavit is not notarized. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea) Modified on 7/9/2020 (aea).
July 9, 2020 Filing 102 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Joshua H. Grabar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20616083. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Isabel Litovich. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Grabar, Joshua) Modified on 7/9/2020 (aea).
July 7, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #101 MOTION for Lindsey C. Grossman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20585460. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida - 500 S. Duval Street Tallahassee, FL 32399; 850-488-0125; Affidavit is not notarized. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
July 7, 2020 Filing 101 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Lindsey C. Grossman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20585460. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Isabel Litovich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order).(Grossman, Lindsey) Modified on 7/7/2020 (aea).
July 7, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #100 MOTION for Michael E. Criden to Appear Pro Hac Vice receipt number ANYSDC-20583912. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida - 500 S. Duval Street Tallahassee, FL 32399; 850-488-0125; Affidavit is not notarized;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
July 7, 2020 Filing 100 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Michael E. Criden to Appear Pro Hac Vice receipt number ANYSDC-20583912. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Isabel Litovich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order).(Criden, Michael) Modified on 7/7/2020 (aea).
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Initial Pretrial Conference previously scheduled for July 7, 2020 has been RESCHEDULED to July 10, 2020 at 9:30AM. Parties are directed to dial-in to the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. (Initial Conference set for 7/10/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (mf)
June 30, 2020 Filing 99 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
June 16, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Edelson on behalf of Isabel Litovich. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service).(Edelson, Marc)
June 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #97 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
June 15, 2020 Filing 97 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Isabel Litovich. Related Document Number: #94 ..(Burke, Christopher) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
June 15, 2020 Filing 96 DECLARATION of Christopher M. Burke and George A. Zelcs in Support re: #94 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated complaint to Add Named Plaintiffs. MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by Isabel Litovich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - S+S firm profile, #2 Exhibit B - KT firm profile).(Burke, Christopher)
June 15, 2020 Filing 95 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #94 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated complaint to Add Named Plaintiffs. MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Class Counsel. . Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
June 15, 2020 Filing 94 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated complaint to Add Named Plaintiffs., MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Class Counsel. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #92 Motion for Yifan "Kate" Lv to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mg)
June 2, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #92 MOTION for Yifan "Kate" Lv to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
June 1, 2020 Filing 92 MOTION for Yifan "Kate" Lv to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Isabel Litovich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - COGS, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed order).(Lv, Kate)
June 1, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #91 MOTION for Yifan "Kate" Lv to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20039259. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): affidavit not notarized;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (laq)
May 29, 2020 Filing 91 MOTION for Yifan "Kate" Lv to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20039259. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Isabel Litovich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - COGS, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed order).(Lv, Kate)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #89 Motion for John Terzaken to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mg)
May 22, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #89 MOTION for John Terzaken to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
May 22, 2020 Filing 89 MOTION for John Terzaken to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Terzaken in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 VA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Terzaken, John)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #80 Motion for Kevin B. Love to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mg)
May 20, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #86 MOTION for John Terzaken to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The affidavit is not notarized;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (ad)
May 20, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lani Lear on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc...(Lear, Lani)
May 20, 2020 Filing 86 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PRO HAC VICE MOTION - MOTION for John Terzaken to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John Terzaken in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 VA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Terzaken, John) Modified on 5/20/2020 (ad).
May 14, 2020 Filing 85 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. 7-1 Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8330 for Morgan Stanley,; Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., whose parent corporation is Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, whose parent corporation is Morgan Stanley for Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Document filed by Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Morgan Stanley,..(Karp, Brad)
May 14, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jane Baek O'Brien on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Morgan Stanley,..(O'Brien, Jane)
May 14, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susanna Michele Buergel on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Morgan Stanley,..(Buergel, Susanna)
May 14, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #80 MOTION for Kevin B. Love to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19830098. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
May 14, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard A. Rosen on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Morgan Stanley,..(Rosen, Richard)
May 14, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brad Scott Karp on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Morgan Stanley,..(Karp, Brad)
May 14, 2020 Filing 80 MOTION for Kevin B. Love to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19830098. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Isabel Litovich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order).(Love, Kevin)
May 14, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #76 MOTION for John S. Playforth to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19829797. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #76 Motion for John S. Playforth to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mg)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #73 Motion for Robert D. Wick to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mg)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Adrienne Baxley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mg)
May 14, 2020 Filing 76 MOTION for John S. Playforth to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19829797. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of John S. Playforth).(Playforth, John)
May 14, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #73 MOTION for Robert D. Wick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19829446. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
May 14, 2020 Filing 75 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate JPMorgan Chase & Co. for J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co...(Wick, Robert)
May 14, 2020 Filing 74 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation for BofA Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.; Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Bank Of America Corporation. Document filed by Bank Of America Corporation, BofA Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc...(Hakki, Adam)
May 14, 2020 Filing 73 MOTION for Robert D. Wick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19829446. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DC Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration in Support of Motion).(Wick, Robert)
May 14, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Franklin Schwed on behalf of Bank Of America Corporation, BofA Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc...(Schwed, Richard)
May 14, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Selim Hakki on behalf of Bank Of America Corporation, BofA Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc...(Hakki, Adam)
May 14, 2020 Filing 70 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Richard C. Pepperman III dated May 14, 2020 re: Intent o File Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC, The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc...(Pepperman, Richard)
May 13, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #68 MOTION for Adrienne Baxley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19824021. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
May 13, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #68 MOTION for Adrienne Baxley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19824021. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The certificate of good standing must be issued by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Virginia 100 North 9th Street 5th Floor Richmond, VA 23219 804-786-2251;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (ad)
May 13, 2020 Filing 69 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG, Corporate Parent DB USA Corporation, Corporate Parent DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation for Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc...(Terzaken, John)
May 13, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION for Adrienne Baxley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19824021. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Adrienne Baxley in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 MD Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Baxley, Adrienne)
May 13, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susannah Sidney Geltman on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc...(Geltman, Susannah)
May 13, 2020 Filing 66 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PRO HAC VICE MOTION - MOTION for John Terzaken to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19823400. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John Terzaken in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 VA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Terzaken, John) Modified on 5/13/2020 (ad).
May 13, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Barry G. Sher on behalf of Barclays Capital Inc...(Sher, Barry)
May 13, 2020 Filing 64 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Barclays Group US Inc., Corporate Parent Barclays US LLC, Corporate Parent Barclays PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC for Barclays Capital Inc.. Document filed by Barclays Capital Inc...(Antonelli, Anthony)
May 13, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Antonelli on behalf of Barclays Capital Inc...(Antonelli, Anthony)
May 13, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tara Halsch Curtin on behalf of Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC..(Curtin, Tara)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Ryan Z. Cortazar to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mg)
May 13, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sheila Chithran Ramesh on behalf of Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC..(Ramesh, Sheila)
May 13, 2020 Filing 59 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG for Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC..(Washer, Herbert)
May 13, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Herbert Scott Washer on behalf of Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC..(Washer, Herbert)
May 13, 2020 Filing 57 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc for Natwest Markets Securities Inc.. Document filed by Natwest Markets Securities Inc...(Mishkin, Paul)
May 13, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Michael Briggs on behalf of Natwest Markets Securities Inc...(Briggs, John)
May 13, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Gabor Mehes on behalf of Natwest Markets Securities Inc...(Mehes, Adam)
May 13, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Steel Mishkin on behalf of Natwest Markets Securities Inc...(Mishkin, Paul)
May 13, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #53 MOTION for Ryan Z. Cortazar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19819104. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
May 13, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION for Ryan Z. Cortazar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19819104. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Isabel Litovich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Ryan Z. Cortazar, #2 Exhibit B - IL Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Text of [Proposed] Order).(Cortazar, Ryan)
May 13, 2020 Filing 52 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC..(Tambe, Jayant)
May 13, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shan Jiang on behalf of Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC..(Jiang, Shan)
May 13, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Leigh Dollinger on behalf of Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC..(Dollinger, Amanda)
May 13, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Jay Obie on behalf of Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC..(Obie, Stephen)
May 13, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura W. Sawyer on behalf of Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC..(Sawyer, Laura)
May 13, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jayant W. Tambe on behalf of Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC..(Tambe, Jayant)
May 13, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Hoffman Lent on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc...(Lent, Karen)
May 13, 2020 Filing 45 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc., Other Affiliate Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Citigroup Financial Products Inc. for Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc...(Kasner, Jay)
May 13, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay B. Kasner on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc...(Kasner, Jay)
May 12, 2020 Filing 43 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC. Document filed by Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC..(Pepperman, Richard)
May 12, 2020 Filing 42 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc...(Pepperman, Richard)
May 12, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Sloan Carter on behalf of Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC, The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc...(Carter, Jonathan)
May 12, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Joseph Porpora on behalf of Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC, The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc...(Porpora, Matthew)
May 12, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard C. Pepperman, II on behalf of Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC, The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc...(Pepperman, Richard)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on July 7, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Initial Conference set for 7/7/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 5/7/2020) (va) Modified on 5/8/2020 (va).
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Randall P. Ewing to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mg) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #14 Motion for George Andrew Zelcs to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mg) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting #12 Motion for Chad Emerson Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Dkt. No. 11. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mg) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
May 4, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #33 MOTION for Randall P. Ewing, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19651471. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
April 30, 2020 Filing 34 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Wells Fargo & Co. served on 4/27/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. Service was accepted by Kaitlyn Mannix, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
April 30, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Randall P. Ewing, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19651471. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Isabel Litovich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Randall P. Ewing, Jr., #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - FL and IL Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Text of [Proposed] Order).(Ewing, Randall)
April 29, 2020 Filing 32 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Natwest Markets Securities Inc. served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
April 29, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
April 29, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Barclays Capital Inc. served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Service was accepted by Gary Scappini, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
April 29, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
April 29, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Wells Fargo Securities LLC served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
April 29, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Service was accepted by Sean O'Hara, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
April 29, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Service was accepted by Sean O'Hara, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
April 29, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Morgan Stanley, served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Service was accepted by Sean O'Hara, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
April 29, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. J.P. Morgan Securities LLC served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Service was accepted by Sean O'Hara, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
April 29, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. JPMorgan Chase & Co. served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Service was accepted by Sean O'Hara, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
April 29, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Service was accepted by Sean O'Hara, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
April 29, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Service was accepted by Sean O'Hara, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
April 29, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Service was accepted by Sean O'Hara, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
April 29, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Citigroup Global Markets Inc. served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Service was accepted by Sean O'Hara, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
April 29, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Citigroup Inc. served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Service was accepted by Sean O'Hara, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
April 29, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. BofA Securities, Inc. served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Service was accepted by Sean O'Hara, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
April 29, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Service was accepted by Sean O'Hara, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
April 29, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Bank Of America Corporation served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Service was accepted by Sean O'Hara, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
April 29, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for George Andrew Zelcs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19633224. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
April 29, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for George Andrew Zelcs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19633224. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Isabel Litovich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - IL and DC Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Text of [Proposed] Order).(Zelcs, George)
April 24, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Walter W. Noss on behalf of Isabel Litovich..(Noss, Walter)
April 24, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION to Amend/Correct #11 MOTION for Chad Emerson Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19558579. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.>/AMENDED MOTION for Chad Emerson Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
April 24, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct #11 MOTION for Chad Emerson Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19558579. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. ., AMENDED MOTION for Chad Emerson Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Isabel Litovich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Chad E. Bell, #2 Exhibit B - IL Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Text of [Proposed] Order).(Bell, Chad)
April 23, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Chad Emerson Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19558579. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
April 23, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Chad Emerson Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19558579. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Isabel Litovich. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Chad E. Bell, #2 Exhibit IL Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Bell, Chad)
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bank Of America Corporation, Barclays Capital Inc., BofA Securities, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Morgan Stanley,, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC..(pne)
April 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carol Lee O'Keefe on behalf of Isabel Litovich..(O'Keefe, Carol)
April 23, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael E. Klenov on behalf of Isabel Litovich..(Klenov, Michael)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Michael Berezney on behalf of Isabel Litovich..(Berezney, Steven)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert L. King on behalf of Isabel Litovich..(King, Robert)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen M. Tillery on behalf of Isabel Litovich..(Tillery, Stephen)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION; MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH, INC.; BofA SECURITIES, INC.; BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC.; CITIGROUP INC.; CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC.; CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC; DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES INC.; THE GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC.; GOLDMAN, SACHS & CO., LLC; JPMORGAN CHASE & CO.; J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC; MORGAN STANLEY; MORGAN STANLEY & CO., LLC; MORGAN STANLEY SMITH BARNEY LLC; NATWEST MARKETS SECURITIES INC.; WELLS FARGO & CO.; WELLS FARGO SECURITIES LLC; and WELLS FARGO CLEARING SERVICES, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)
April 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Christopher M. Burke to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant name on the PDF case caption does not exactly match as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
April 22, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 22, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
April 22, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
April 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christopher M. Burke. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Isabel Litovich. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
April 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Christopher M. Burke. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION; MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH, INC.; BofA SECURITIES, INC.; BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC.; CITIGROUP INC.; CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC.; CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC; DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES INC.; THE GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC.; GOLDMAN, SACHS & CO., LLC; JPMORGAN CHASE & CO.; J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC; MORGAN STANLEY; MORGAN STANLEY & CO., LLC; MORGAN STANLEY SMITH BARNEY LLC; NATWEST MARKETS SECURITIES INC.; WELLS FARGO & CO.; WELLS FARGO SECURITIES LLC; and WELLS FARGO CLEARING SERVICES, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher) Modified on 4/22/2020 (jgo).
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Burke, Christopher)
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank Of America Corporation, Barclays Capital Inc., BofA Securities, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Morgan Stanley,, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19519197)Document filed by Isabel Litovich..(Burke, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Litovich v. Bank Of America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natwest Markets Securities Inc.
Represented By: Adam Gabor Mehes
Represented By: John Michael Briggs
Represented By: Paul Steel Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Inc.
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: John S. Playforth
Represented By: Robert D. Wick
Represented By: Andrew W. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America Corporation
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Richard Franklin Schwed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Porpora
Represented By: Jonathan Sloan Carter
Represented By: Richard C. Pepperman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: John S. Playforth
Represented By: Robert D. Wick
Represented By: Andrew W. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Represented By: Richard A. Rosen
Represented By: Susanna Michele Buergel
Represented By: Jane Baek O'Brien
Represented By: Brad Scott Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC
Represented By: Richard A. Rosen
Represented By: Susanna Michele Buergel
Represented By: Jane Baek O'Brien
Represented By: Brad Scott Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Adrienne Vollmer Baxley
Represented By: Brian John Roe
Represented By: Susannah Sidney Geltman
Represented By: John Terzaken
Represented By: Lani Lear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Richard Franklin Schwed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Tara Halsch Curtin
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer
Represented By: Sheila Chithran Ramesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley,
Represented By: Richard A. Rosen
Represented By: Susanna Michele Buergel
Represented By: Jane Baek O'Brien
Represented By: Brad Scott Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC
Represented By: Jayant W. Tambe
Represented By: Laura W. Sawyer
Represented By: Shan Jiang
Represented By: Stephen Jay Obie
Represented By: Amanda Leigh Dollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Porpora
Represented By: Jonathan Sloan Carter
Represented By: Richard C. Pepperman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities LLC
Represented By: Jayant W. Tambe
Represented By: Laura W. Sawyer
Represented By: Shan Jiang
Represented By: Stephen Jay Obie
Represented By: Amanda Leigh Dollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BofA Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Richard Franklin Schwed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: Barry G. Sher
Represented By: Anthony Antonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Co.
Represented By: Jayant W. Tambe
Represented By: Laura W. Sawyer
Represented By: Shan Jiang
Represented By: Stephen Jay Obie
Represented By: Amanda Leigh Dollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Litovich
Represented By: Christopher M. Burke
Represented By: Stephen M. Tillery
Represented By: Michael E. Klenov
Represented By: Carol Lee O'Keefe
Represented By: Steven Michael Berezney
Represented By: Robert L. King
Represented By: Chad Emerson Bell
Represented By: Walter W. Noss
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Represented By: Randall P. Ewing, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Zachary Cortazar
Represented By: Kevin Bruce Love
Represented By: Kate Lv
Represented By: Marc Edelson
Represented By: Lindsey Caryn Grossman
Represented By: Michael Criden
Represented By: Joshua H. Grabar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund
Represented By: Christopher M. Burke
Represented By: Karma M. Giulianelli
Represented By: Glen E Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Hirsch
Represented By: Christopher M. Burke
Represented By: Douglas A. Millen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael V. Cottrell
Represented By: Christopher M. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holdcraft Marital Trust
Represented By: Christopher M. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?