Yang v. The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation et al
Plaintiff: John ("Jack&quo Yang and John "Jack&quot Yang
Defendant: The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation, Alcentra NY, LLC and Alcentra Limited
Case Number: 1:2020cv03179
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1514 A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Alcentra Limited, Alcentra NY, LLC, The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation..(Lee, Wonho)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for W. John Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20125457. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 NJ Certificate of Good Standing, #4 PA Certificate of Good Standing).(Lee, Wonho)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Michael L. Banks to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20125337. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Good Standing).(Banks, Michael)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Michael L. Banks to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20125337. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for W. John Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20125457. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR RESPONDING TO THE COMPLAINT. NOW THEREFORE, the parties hereby stipulate and agree that: 1. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint by June 22, 2020; 2. In the event that Defendants move to dismiss the Complaint, Plaintiff shall oppose any such motion on or before July 22, 2020; 3. In the event that Defendants move to dismiss the Complaint, Defendants shall serve and file any reply papers within fourteen days after Plaintiff's opposition is filed; 4. Defendants agree that, absent extraordinary circumstances arising, they will not seek any further extension of the time to respond to the Complaint; and 5. The parties agree that nothing in this Stipulation alter the requirements of the Court's Individual Practice in Civil Cases No. 3F. So ordered. Alcentra Limited answer due 6/22/2020; Alcentra NY, LLC answer due 6/22/2020; The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation answer due 6/22/2020. (Motions due by 6/22/2020. Responses due by 7/22/2020). Motions terminated: #11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Manisha M. Sheth dated April 24, 2020. Document filed by John "Jack" Yang. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/27/2020) (rjm)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, July 24, 2020 at 3:45 PM in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Initial Conference set for 7/24/2020 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 906, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan). (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/27/2020) (rjm)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Manisha M. Sheth dated April 24, 2020. Document filed by John "Jack" Yang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order - Briefing Schedule).(Sheth, Manisha)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation..(jgo)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alcentra NY, LLC..(jgo)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alcentra Limited..(jgo)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Peter E. Calamari. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: John ("Jack&quo Yang. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kimberly Eden Carson on behalf of John ("Jack&quo Yang..(Carson, Kimberly)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Manisha M. Sheth on behalf of John ("Jack&quo Yang..(Sheth, Manisha)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alcentra Limited, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John ("Jack&quo Yang..(Calamari, Peter)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alcentra NY, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John ("Jack&quo Yang..(Calamari, Peter)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John ("Jack&quo Yang..(Calamari, Peter)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Calamari, Peter)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alcentra Limited, Alcentra NY, LLC, The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19534199)Document filed by John ("Jack&quo Yang..(Calamari, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yang v. The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation
Represented By: Michael L. Banks
Represented By: Wonho John Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcentra NY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcentra Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John ("Jack&quo Yang
Represented By: Kimberly Eden Carson
Represented By: Manisha M. Sheth
Represented By: Peter E. Calamari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John "Jack&quot Yang
Represented By: Kimberly Eden Carson
Represented By: Manisha M. Sheth
Represented By: Peter E. Calamari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?