HartFord Fire Insurance Company v. BROAN NUTONE, LLC
Plaintiff: HartFord Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: BROAN NUTONE, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03184
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate these actions for pretrial purposes; and it is further ORDERED that all filings in connection with the consolidated action be docketed against the lowest numbered case, 20 Civ. 1292; and it is finally ORDERED that the Clerk of Court close the above referenced higher numbered case, 20 Civ. 3184, as a separate action and remove it from the Court's docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/16/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01292-VM, 1:20-cv-03184-VM (ks)
June 16, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:20-cv-01292-VM.. (ks)
May 18, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Victor Marrero. Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
May 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so redesignated. (ad)
May 18, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-01292-VM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Broan-Nutone, LLC..(Osterman, David)
April 23, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 23, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
April 23, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
April 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Scott Osterman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: HartFord Fire Insurance Company; Broan-Nutone, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted;. (jgo)
April 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Scott Osterman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); Citizenship Plaintiff code 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); Jury Demand code b (Both); Dollar Demand $80,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Jury Demand code has been modified to d (Defendant); the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nortek, Inc. for BROAN NUTONE, LLC. Document filed by BROAN NUTONE, LLC..(Osterman, David)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Osterman, David)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of NEW YORK. Case Number: 151638/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19536108).Document filed by BROAN NUTONE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint).(Osterman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HartFord Fire Insurance Company v. BROAN NUTONE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROAN NUTONE, LLC
Represented By: David Scott Osterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HartFord Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?