Western Waterproofing Company, Inc. v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Western Waterproofing Company, Inc.
Defendant: Allied World Specialty Insurance Company, Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc. and Zurich American Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv03199
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc. waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. Document filed by Western Waterproofing Company, Inc...(McDonald, Melanie)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Allied World Specialty Insurance Company waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. Document filed by Western Waterproofing Company, Inc...(McDonald, Melanie)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Zurich American Insurance Company waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. Document filed by Western Waterproofing Company, Inc...(McDonald, Melanie)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #10 AMENDED MOTION for Melanie A McDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/29/2020) (jca)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 AMENDED MOTION for Melanie A McDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED MOTION for Melanie A McDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Western Waterproofing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(McDonald, Melanie)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #9 AMENDED MOTION for Melanie A. McDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The applicants pro hac vice motion must include a sworn statement, i.e. a notarized affidavit;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (ad)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED MOTION for Melanie A. McDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Western Waterproofing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affiidavit of Melanie McDonald, #2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order).(McDonald, Melanie)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Western Construction Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Western Holding Group, Inc. for Western Waterproofing Company, Inc.. Document filed by Western Waterproofing Company, Inc...(Welch, Jeremiah)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jeremiah M. Welch to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #7 MOTION for Melanie A. McDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19749049. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The certificates of good standing must be issued by the The Certificate of Good Standing must be issued from the California Supreme Court, 350 Mc Allister Street, Room 1295, San Francisco, CA 94102 415-865-7000 and the Clerk of the Supreme Court P.O. Box 12248 Austin, TX 78711 512-463-1312;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (ad)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PRO HAC VICE MOTION - MOTION for Melanie A. McDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19749049. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Western Waterproofing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Melanie A. McDonald, #2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order).(McDonald, Melanie) Modified on 5/8/2020 (ad).
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Welch, Jeremiah)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc., Allied World Specialty Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company..(pne)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeremiah M. Welch. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Western Waterproofing Company, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (pne)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jeremiah M. Welch to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): no courthouse selection was made on the civil cover sheet; the civil cover sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the corrected PDF. (pne)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pne)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zurich American Insurance Company, Allied World Specialty Insurance Company, Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Western Waterproofing Company, Inc...(Welch, Jeremiah)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Western Waterproofing Company, Inc...(Welch, Jeremiah) Modified on 5/13/2020 (ldi).
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR -CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Welch, Jeremiah) Modified on 4/23/2020 (pne).
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc., Allied World Specialty Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19543783)Document filed by Western Waterproofing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H).(Welch, Jeremiah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Waterproofing Company, Inc. v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Waterproofing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremiah M. Welch
Represented By: Melanie Ann McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?