YS GM Marfin II LLC et al v. Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC et al
Plaintiff: YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM MARFIN II LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC and YS GM MF IX LLC
Defendant: Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Wood Capital Partners, LLC, Steven Baffico and Andrew Simmons
Case Number: 1:2020cv03320
Filed: April 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 294
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Brendan F. Quigley dated January 31, 2022 re: Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Document filed by YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC..(Quigley, Brendan)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Fred T. Isquith Sr. and Brian S. Fraser dated November 2, 2021 re: Request for oral argument on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Steven Baffico, Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Wood Capital Partners, LLC, Andrew Simmons..(Isquith, Fred)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #54 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Steven Baffico, Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Wood Capital Partners, LLC, Andrew Simmons..(Isquith, Fred)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 DECLARATION of Brendan F. Quigley in Opposition re: #54 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint.. Document filed by YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, Part 1 of 9, #13 Exhibit 12, Part 2 of 9, #14 Exhibit 12, Part 3 of 9, #15 Exhibit 12, Part 4 of 9, #16 Exhibit 12, Part 5 of 9, #17 Exhibit 12, Part 6 of 9, #18 Exhibit 12, Part 7 of 9, #19 Exhibit 12, Part 8 of 9, #20 Exhibit 12, Part 9 of 9).(Quigley, Brendan)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #54 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint. . Document filed by YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC..(Quigley, Brendan)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DECLARATION of Fred T. Isquith Sr. in Support re: #54 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Steven Baffico, Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Wood Capital Partners, LLC, Andrew Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5).(Isquith, Frederick)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 DECLARATION of Andrew Simmons in Support re: #54 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Andrew Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4).(Isquith, Frederick)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #54 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Steven Baffico, Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Wood Capital Partners, LLC, Andrew Simmons..(Isquith, Frederick)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint. Document filed by Steven Baffico, Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Wood Capital Partners, LLC, Andrew Simmons..(Isquith, Frederick)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #52 Letter, filed by Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC, Steven Baffico, Four Wood Capital Partners, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 9/17/2021., Responses due by 10/19/2021, Replies due by 11/2/2021.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/13/2021) (jca)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Fred Isquith Sr. dated August 12, 2021 re: Request for a one week extension of current Motion to Dismiss Deadlines. Document filed by Steven Baffico, Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Wood Capital Partners, LLC..(Isquith, Frederick)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #49 LETTER MOTION to Expedite a Schedule for Defendants Anticipated Motions to Dismiss. The following schedule will apply to Defendants' motion to dismiss: 1. Defendants' motion is due on September 10, 2021; 2. Plaintiffs' opposition is due on October 12, 2021; and 3. Defendants' reply, if any, is due on October 26, 2021. The page limit for Defendants motion and Plaintiffs opposition is extended to 50 pages. The page limit for Defendants reply, if any, is extended to 25 pages. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/11/2021) (jca)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 9/10/2021. Responses due by 10/12/2021, Replies due by 10/26/2021. (jca)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Fred Isquith Sr dated June 17, 2021 re: Response to Plaitniffs' June 16 2021 letter regarding MTD schedule. Document filed by Steven Baffico, Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Wood Capital Partners, LLC..(Isquith, Frederick)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 LETTER MOTION to Expedite a Schedule for Defendants Anticipated Motions to Dismiss addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Brendan F. Quigley dated June 16, 2021. Document filed by YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Quigley, Brendan)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Fred Isquith Sr dated April 19, 2021 re: Response to Plaintiffs' April 16, 2020 letter. Document filed by Steven Baffico, Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Wood Capital Partners, LLC..(Isquith, Frederick)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Brendan F. Quigley dated April 16, 2021 re: Follow-up on the Pending Requests for a Pre-Motion Conference and Briefing Schedule. Document filed by YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC..(Quigley, Brendan)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Brian S. Fraser on behalf of Andrew Simmons. New Address: Akerman LLP, 1251 Avenue of the Americas, FL 37, New York, NY, 10020,..(Fraser, Brian)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Brendan F. Quigley dated February 10, 2021 re: Response to the February 5, 2021 Letter from Defendant Andrew Simmons. Document filed by YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Rule 23.6 Statement).(Quigley, Brendan)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #1 Complaint, pre-motion conference for permission to file Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Brian S. Fraser dated February 5, 2021. Document filed by Andrew Simmons..(Fraser, Brian)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Andrew Simmons waiver sent on 11/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. Document filed by YS GM MF X LLC; YS GM MF VII LLC; YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC; YS GM MF VI LLC; YieldStreet Management, LLC ; YS GM MF VIII LLC; YS GM Marfin II LLC; YS GM MF IX LLC..(Quigley, Brendan)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristen Gabriela Niven on behalf of Andrew Simmons..(Niven, Kristen)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian S. Fraser on behalf of Andrew Simmons..(Fraser, Brian)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Simmons..(dnh)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steven Baffico..(dnh)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Fred Taylor Isquith, Sr dated September 29, 2020 re: Response to the Courts September 22, 2020 Order. Document filed by Steven Baffico, Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Wood Capital Partners, LLC..(Isquith, Fred)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Brendan F. Quigley dated September 29, 2020 re: Response to the Courts September 22, 2020 Order. Document filed by YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC..(Quigley, Brendan)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew Simmons, re: #29 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC..(Quigley, Brendan)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steven Baffico, re: #29 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC..(Quigley, Brendan)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Brendan Quigley to RE-FILE Document No. #34 Request for Issuance of Summons, #33 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match the pleading caption. If all of the party names do not fit, use leading party name followed by 'et al';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew Simmons, re: #29 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC..(Quigley, Brendan) Modified on 9/24/2020 (jgo).
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steven Baffico, re: #29 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC..(Quigley, Brendan) Modified on 9/24/2020 (jgo).
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Brendan Quigley to RE-FILE Document No. #30 Request for Issuance of Summons, #31 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Defendant's names must match exactly in the "TO" field as the pleading (without titles). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Brendan F. Quigley dated September 22, 2020 re: Response to Defendants Letter. Document filed by YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC..(Quigley, Brendan)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew Simmons, re: #29 Amended Complaint. Document filed by YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC..(Quigley, Brendan) Modified on 9/23/2020 (sj).
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steven Baffico, re: #29 Amended Complaint. Document filed by YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC..(Quigley, Brendan) Modified on 9/23/2020 (sj).
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Wood Capital Partners, LLC, Steven Baffico, Andrew Simmons.Document filed by YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YS GM MF IX LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Quigley, Brendan)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Fred Isquith Sr. dated September 22, 2020 re: Response to the Plaintiffs letter dated September 21, 2020. Document filed by Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Wood Capital Partners, LLC..(Isquith, Fred)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's request for leave to amend is granted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1). The parties are directed to confer and propose a revised briefing schedule by September 29, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/22/2020) (jca)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Brendan F. Quigley dated September 21, 2020. Document filed by YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Blackline Version of Amended Complaint).(Quigley, Brendan)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #24 Motion for Jonathan A. Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/28/2020) (nb)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Jonathan A. Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21323158. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Shapiro, Jonathan)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule will apply to Defendants' motion to dismiss: 1. Defendants' motion is due on September 22, 2020; 2. Plaintiffs' opposition is due on October 20, 2020; and 3. Defendants' reply, if any, is due on November 4, 2020. The conference scheduled for August 27, 2020 is adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. ***Hearings Terminated*** The following hearing(s) was terminated: Initial Conference. (Motions due by 9/22/2020, Responses due by 10/20/2020, Replies due by 11/4/2020.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/25/2020) (jca)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #24 MOTION for Jonathan A. Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21323158. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The conference currently scheduled for August 13, 2020 is adjourned to August 27, 2020 at 10:45 a.m. by telephone. The parties are directed to dial 888-363-4749 to participate, and to enter the access code 6212642. The press and public may obtain access to the telephone conference by dialing the same number and using the same access code. The Court is holding multiple telephone conferences on this date. The parties should call in at the scheduled time and wait on the line for their case to be called. At that time, the Court will un-mute the parties' lines. No later than August 24, 2020, the parties must email GardepheNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov with the phone numbers that the parties will be using to dial into the conference so that the Court knows which numbers to un-mute. The email should include the case name and case number in the subject line. SO ORDERED., ( Initial Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 10:45 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe., Telephone Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 10:45 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/12/2020) (ama)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The conference currently scheduled for August 13, 2020 will take place at 10:45 a.m. by telephone. The parties are directed to dial 888-363-4749 to participate, and to enter the access code 6212642. The press and public may obtain access to the telephone conference by dialing the same number and using the same access code. The Court is holding multiple telephone conferences on this date. The parties should call in at the scheduled time and wait on the line for their case to be called. At that time, the Court will un-mute the parties' lines. No later than August 12, 2020, the parties must email GardepheNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov with the phone numbers that the parties will be using to dial into the conference so that the Court knows which numbers to un-mute. The email should include the case name and case number in the subject line. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 10:45 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/12/2020) (jca)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Brendan F. Quigley and Fred T. Isquith Sr. dated August 6, 2020 re: Preparation for August 13, 2020 Pretrial Conference. Document filed by YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order).(Quigley, Brendan)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Brendan F. Quigley dated July 23, 2020 re: Response to the July 20, 2020 Letter from the Defendants Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC..(Quigley, Brendan)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Fred T. Isquith dated July 20, 2020 re: Pre-Motion Conference Request. Document filed by Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Wood Capital Partners, LLC..(Isquith, Fred)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Brendan F. Quigley dated July 2, 2020 re: Response to June 30, 2020 Letter. Document filed by YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC..(Quigley, Brendan)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr on behalf of Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Wood Capital Partners, LLC..(Isquith, Frederick)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Fred Taylor Isquith on behalf of Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Wood Capital Partners, LLC..(Isquith, Fred)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Related Matter. Document filed by Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Wood Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B).(Isquith, Frederick)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties that the time within which Defendants may move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including July 31, 2020. Parties also agree that, should Defendants elect to move as a response to the Complaint, Plaintiffs will have up to and including August 31, 2020 to submit their opposition, and the Defendants will then have up to and including September 21, 2020 to reply to any such opposition. Further, having been accepted by counsel for Defendants on June 12, 2020, Defendants stipulate that service of the Complaint is deemed effective as of June 12, 2020. SO ORDERED. Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC answer due 7/31/2020; Four Wood Capital Partners, LLC answer due 7/31/2020. (Motions due by 7/31/2020. Responses due by 8/31/2020. Replies due by 9/21/2020.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/19/2020) (mml)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC..(Quigley, Brendan)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Brendan Quigley to RE-FILE Document #11 Proposed Order. Use the event type Proposed Stipulation and Order found under the event list Proposed Orders. (dt)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC. Related Document Number: [01 - Complaint]..(Quigley, Brendan) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 6/16/2020 (dt).
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC served on 6/5/2020, answer due 6/26/2020; Four Wood Capital Partners, LLC served on 6/5/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. Service was made by Certified, Return Receipt Mail. Document filed by YS GM MF X LLC; YS GM MF VII LLC; YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC; YS GM MF VI LLC; YieldStreet Management, LLC ; YS GM MF VIII LLC; YS GM Marfin II LLC; YS GM MF IX LLC..(Howard, David)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brendan Quigley on behalf of YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM Marfin II LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC..(Quigley, Brendan)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/30/2020) (jca)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC..(pc)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Four Wood Capital Partners, LLC..(pc)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent YieldStreet Inc. for YS GM MARFIN II LLC, YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC. Document filed by YS GM MARFIN II LLC, YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC..(Howard, David)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Howard, David)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FOUR WOOD CAPITAL PARTNERS, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by YS GM MARFIN II LLC, YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC..(Howard, David)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FOUR WOODS CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by YS GM MARFIN II LLC, YS GM MF IX LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF X LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC..(Howard, David)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Wood Capital Partners, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19617335)Document filed by YS GM MF X LLC, YS GM MF VII LLC, YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC, YS GM MF VI LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC, YS GM MARFIN II LLC, YS GM MF VIII LLC, YS GM MF IX LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint).(Howard, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YS GM Marfin II LLC et al v. Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Wood Capital Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr
Represented By: Fred Taylor Isquith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Wood Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr
Represented By: Fred Taylor Isquith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Baffico
Represented By: Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Simmons
Represented By: Brian S. Fraser
Represented By: Kristen Gabriela Niven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YS GM MF X LLC
Represented By: David M. Howard
Represented By: Brendan Quigley
Represented By: Jonathan A. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YS GM MARFIN II LLC
Represented By: David M. Howard
Represented By: Brendan Quigley
Represented By: Jonathan A. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YieldStreet Marine Finance, LLC
Represented By: David M. Howard
Represented By: Brendan Quigley
Represented By: Jonathan A. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YieldStreet Management, LLC
Represented By: David M. Howard
Represented By: Brendan Quigley
Represented By: Jonathan A. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YS GM MF VI LLC
Represented By: David M. Howard
Represented By: Brendan Quigley
Represented By: Jonathan A. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YS GM MF VII LLC
Represented By: David M. Howard
Represented By: Brendan Quigley
Represented By: Jonathan A. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YS GM MF VIII LLC
Represented By: David M. Howard
Represented By: Brendan Quigley
Represented By: Jonathan A. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YS GM MF IX LLC
Represented By: David M. Howard
Represented By: Brendan Quigley
Represented By: Jonathan A. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?