Perkins et al v. Revlon, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sarah Perkins and Philip Perkins
Defendant: Revlon Consumer Products Corporation and Revlon, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03382
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446as
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Plaintiffs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Revlon, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(McCann, Timothy)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiffs Sarah Perkins and Phillip Perkins and their counsel, hereby gives notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against all Defendants. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this case is hereby dismissed. SO ORDERED., Revlon, Inc., Philip Perkins and Sarah Perkins terminated. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/02/2020) (ama)
May 26, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. The document was incorrectly filed in this case, as per Chambers. (rjm)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCann, Timothy)
May 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Woodard, Daniel. RE-FILE Document No. #2 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the voluntary dismissal. The pdf is a notice of voluntary dismissal; Since answer has been filed, Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and upload the correct signed (scanned wet signature image) PDF. (tp)
May 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Timothy M. McCann. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne)
May 1, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 1, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
May 1, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
May 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Timothy M. McCann. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Revlon, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pne)
May 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Timothy M. McCann to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): incorrect basis of jurisdiction selected; no courthouse selection was made. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the corrected PDF. (pne)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against Philip Perkins, Sarah Perkins. Document filed by Revlon Consumer Products Corporation..(McCann, Timothy)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Revlon Consumer Products Corporation..(McCann, Timothy)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR -CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCann, Timothy) Modified on 5/1/2020 (pne).
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Revlon Consumer Products Corporation and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Sarah Perkins, Philip Perkins. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Woodard, Daniel) Modified on 5/1/2020 (tp).
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: NOT INDICATED. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19655721).Document filed by Revlon Consumer Products Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint).(McCann, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins et al v. Revlon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revlon Consumer Products Corporation
Represented By: Timothy M. McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revlon, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy M. McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?