Tradiverse Corporation v. Luzar Trading S.A.
Petitioner: Tradiverse Corporation
Respondent: Luzar Trading S.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03387
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gabriel W Gorenstein
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: denying #13 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. The application for discovery (Docket # 13) is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 6/23/2020) (ama)
June 10, 2020 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Michael J. Dehart in Opposition re: #2 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration in Support of Petition.. Document filed by Luzar Trading S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L1, #2 Exhibit L2, #3 Exhibit L3, #4 Exhibit L4, #5 Exhibit L5, #6 Exhibit L6, #7 Exhibit L7).(Dehart, Michael)
June 10, 2020 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #2 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration in Support of Petition. and in Support of Cross-Motion to Confirm. Document filed by Luzar Trading S.A...(Dehart, Michael)
June 10, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Final Award. Document filed by Luzar Trading S.A...(Dehart, Michael)
June 5, 2020 Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Jason A. Stewart dated June 5, 2020 re: Response to Luzar's Objection to Request for Issuance of Subpoenas. Document filed by Tradiverse Corporation..(Stewart, Jason)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (19 in 1:20-cv-03387-LTS-GWG) Letter filed by Luzar Trading S.A. ENDORSEMENT: Any reply to this letter may be filed by June 5, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 6/03/2020) (ama)
June 3, 2020 Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Michael Dehart dated 6/3/20 re: Response to Tradiverse's Request for Issuance of Subpoenas. Document filed by Luzar Trading S.A...(Dehart, Michael)
June 3, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Dehart on behalf of Luzar Trading S.A...(Dehart, Michael)
June 3, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Don Philip Murnane, Jr on behalf of Luzar Trading S.A...(Murnane, Don)
June 1, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Luzar Trading S.A. waiver sent on 5/15/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. Document filed by Tradiverse Corporation..(Stewart, Jason)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #13 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jason A. Stewart dated 05/23/2020. filed by Tradiverse Corporation. ENDORSEMENT: Any opposition to this application shall be filed by June 3, 2020. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 6/3/2020) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 6/01/2020) (ama)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. Motions referred to Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/27/2020) (rjm)
May 23, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jason A. Stewart dated 05/23/2020. Document filed by Tradiverse Corporation..(Stewart, Jason)
May 23, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Luzar Trading, S.A.,. Document filed by Tradiverse Corporation..(Stewart, Jason)
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Luzar Trading S.A...(pne)
May 21, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LUZAR TRADING, S.A., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Tradiverse Corporation..(Stewart, Jason)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (8 in 1:20-cv-03387-LTS) Letter filed by Luzar Trading S.A., (32 in 1:20-cv-00623-LTS) Letter filed by Luzar Trading S.A. ENDORSEMENT: The proposed briefing schedule for 20 CV 3387 is approved, and the May 22, 2020, conference in 20 CV 623 is adjourned sine die. The matters in both cases will be taken on submission unless the Court decides to hear oral argument, in which case an order scheduling argument will be entered. The Clerk of Court is requested to docket this endorsed order in each of the above-captioned cases. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 6/10/2020, Replies due by 7/22/2020.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/15/2020) (ama)
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Michael Dehart dated 5/15/20 re: Related Actions. Document filed by Luzar Trading S.A...(Dehart, Michael)
May 6, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
May 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad)
May 6, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-00623-LTS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Judge Swain has accepted civil action 20-CV-3387 as related to civil action 20-CV-623 upon the assertion by Tradiverse Corporation that the matters involve interrelated arbitration proceedings. (20-CV-3387, Docket Entry No. 6.) The initial conference currently scheduled in civil action 20-CV-623 for May 22, 2020, will take place telephonically in light of the current public health crisis and will also address the status and management of civil action 20-CV-3387. The parties are directed to meet and confer in advance of the telephonic conference and submit a joint status report to the Court by 5 p.m. on May 15, 2020, setting forth the parties' positions as to whether these two actions should be consolidated for briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule covering both actions. The joint status report must be filed in ECF in each of the above cases. Instructions for accessing the telephonic conference will be published in a separate order. The Clerk of Court is directed to file this Order in each of the above-captioned cases. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 5/22/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/6/2020) (rro)
May 1, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Laura Taylor Swain as possibly related to 20CV623. (pne)
May 1, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 1, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pne)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-00623. Document filed by Tradiverse Corporation..(Stewart, Jason)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stewart, Jason)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Jason A. Stewart in Support re: #2 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration in Support of Petition.. Document filed by Tradiverse Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit March 2020 Award, #2 Exhibit December 2019 Award, #3 Exhibit Gary Martin Testimony, #4 Exhibit NAEGA Clause 20 Process, #5 Exhibit NAEGA Privilege Log, #6 Exhibit Arbitrators to Japan, #7 Exhibit NAEGA Guidelines, #8 Exhibit Testimony of Gustavo Volmer, #9 Exhibit Witness Stmnt of Jay O'Neill, #10 Exhibit Tradiverse Contract, #11 Exhibit Pasternak Baum Contract).(Stewart, Jason)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #2 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration in Support of Petition. . Document filed by Tradiverse Corporation..(Stewart, Jason)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration in Support of Petition. Document filed by Tradiverse Corporation..(Stewart, Jason)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19658916).Document filed by Tradiverse Corporation..(Stewart, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tradiverse Corporation v. Luzar Trading S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tradiverse Corporation
Represented By: Jason A Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Luzar Trading S.A.
Represented By: Don Philip Murnane, Jr
Represented By: Michael James Dehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?