Kasilingam v. Tilray, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ganesh Kasilingam, Leslie Rose, Surinder Chandok and Craig Scoggin
Defendant: Brendan Kennedy, Mark Castaneda and Tilray, Inc.
Petitioner: Tariq Rasheed, Joe Dong, Brett Mitchell, Scott Patterson, Douglas S. Chabot, William McCarthy, Siamak Sahand, Christine Thielen, Saul Kassin, Esteban Torbar, Asma Tariq, Frank Mangaru, Crescenzo Di Mambro, Margoret Silveira, Dun Wang, Nancy Nguyen, Kenneth Hayden, Robert Kawula, Thomas Rigsbee, Phillip Bergman and Dave Sherman
Case Number: 1:2020cv03459
Filed: May 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laurence Matthew Rosen on behalf of Surinder Chandok, Saul Kassin, Leslie Rose, Craig Scoggin..(Rosen, Laurence)
October 5, 2020 Filing 78 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Mark Castaneda, Brendan Kennedy, Tilray, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Saul Kassin, Leslie Rose, Craig Scoggin, Surinder Chandok. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Scoggin PSLRA Cert, #2 Chandok PSLRA Cert, #3 Rose PSLRA Cert).(Horne, Jonathan)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING PLEADING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Lead Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before October 5, 2020. Defendants shall move, answer, or otherwise respond to the amended complaint on or before December 4, 2020. If Defendants file a motion to dismiss, Lead Plaintiff shall file his opposition to the motion on or before January 18, 2021. Defendants shall file their reply in further support of any motion to dismiss the amended complaint on or before February 17, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 10/5/2020., Motions due by 12/4/2020., Responses due by 1/18/2021, Replies due by 2/17/2021.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 8/21/2020) (rro)
August 20, 2020 Filing 76 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Saul Kassin..(Horne, Jonathan)
August 20, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Richard Horne on behalf of Saul Kassin..(Horne, Jonathan)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 OPINION & ORDER re: #23 MOTION to Appoint Douglas S. Chabot to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . filed by Douglas S. Chabot, #27 MOTION to Appoint Christine Thielen, Esteban Torbar, Dun Wang, Thomas Rigsbee, and Margoret Silveira to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . filed by Thomas Rigsbee, Margoret Silveira, Esteban Torbar, Christine Thielen, Dun Wang, #19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel. filed by Phillip Bergman, #34 MOTION to Appoint Saul Kassin to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.. filed by Saul Kassin, #18 MOTION to Appoint Robert Kawula to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bleichmar Fonti & Auld LLP. filed by Robert Kawula, #47 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Frank Mangaru to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . filed by Frank Mangaru, #40 MOTION to Appoint Tariq Rasheed, Asma Tariq, Crescenzo Di Mambro to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . filed by Crescenzo Di Mambro, Asma Tariq, Tariq Rasheed, #41 MOTION to Appoint Joe Dong, Siamak Sahand, Dave Sherman and Kenneth Hayden to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel . filed by Joe Dong, Dave Sherman, Siamak Sahand, Kenneth Hayden, #30 MOTION to Appoint William McCarthy to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . filed by William McCarthy, #10 MOTION to Appoint Scott Patterson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . filed by Scott Patterson, #36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Brett Mitchell and Nancy Nguyen to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . filed by Nancy Nguyen, Brett Mitchell. Kassin's motion to be appointed lead plaintiff and for the Rosen Law Firm, P.A. to be approved as lead counsel is GRANTED. The lead plaintiff and lead counsel motions filed by TIG, Mitchell and Nguyen, and Chabot are DENIED. The motions by the other plaintiffs are deemed abandoned or DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at Dkts. 10, 18, 19, 23, 27, 30, 34, 36, 40, 41, and 47. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 8/6/2020) (ks) (Main Document 74 replaced on 8/6/2020) (ks).
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 1.4 granting #71 Motion to Withdraw ; granting #71 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Motion of Scott Patterson for withdrawal of his Motion for appointment as Lead Plaintiff and withdrawal of appearance of Counsel is GRANTED, such that IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that attorney Kim E. Miller shall be removed from the official docket of this consolidated Action as well as the electronic case filing (ECF) service list. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/20/2020) Attorney Kim Elaine Miller terminated (ks)
July 17, 2020 Filing 72 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Scott Patterson. Related Document Number: #71 ..(Miller, Kim)
July 17, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION to Withdraw Motion for Appointment., MOTION for Kim E. Miller to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Scott Patterson..(Miller, Kim)
June 26, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas W. Greene on behalf of Mark Castaneda, Brendan Kennedy, Tilray, Inc...(Greene, Douglas)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Douglas W. Greene to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo)
June 17, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #68 MOTION for Douglas W. Greene to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20301912. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
June 17, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION for Douglas W. Greene to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20301912. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mark Castaneda, Brendan Kennedy, Tilray, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of the State of Washington, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Greene, Douglas)
May 26, 2020 Filing 67 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #27 MOTION to Appoint Christine Thielen, Esteban Torbar, Dun Wang, Thomas Rigsbee, and Margoret Silveira to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . and Response to Competing Motions. Document filed by Thomas Rigsbee, Margoret Silveira, Christine Thielen, Esteban Torbar, Dun Wang..(Hopkins, Shannon)
May 26, 2020 Filing 66 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #34 MOTION to Appoint Saul Kassin to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.. . Document filed by Saul Kassin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Saul Kassin).(Kim, Phillip)
May 26, 2020 Filing 65 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Brett Mitchell and Nancy Nguyen to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Brett Mitchell, Nancy Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mitchell and Nguyen EDNY Opposition).(Linkh, Gregory)
May 20, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Livezey Laughlin, IV on behalf of Thomas Rigsbee, Margoret Silveira, Christine Thielen, Esteban Torbar, Dun Wang..(Laughlin, Thomas)
May 19, 2020 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #23 MOTION to Appoint Douglas S. Chabot to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., #34 MOTION to Appoint Saul Kassin to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.., #41 MOTION to Appoint Joe Dong, Siamak Sahand, Dave Sherman and Kenneth Hayden to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel ., #10 MOTION to Appoint Scott Patterson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., #36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Brett Mitchell and Nancy Nguyen to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Thomas Rigsbee, Margoret Silveira, Christine Thielen, Esteban Torbar, Dun Wang..(Laughlin, Thomas)
May 19, 2020 Filing 62 RESPONSE to Motion re: #27 MOTION to Appoint Christine Thielen, Esteban Torbar, Dun Wang, Thomas Rigsbee, and Margoret Silveira to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., #19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel., #34 MOTION to Appoint Saul Kassin to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.., #18 MOTION to Appoint Robert Kawula to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bleichmar Fonti & Auld LLP., #47 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Frank Mangaru to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., #36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Brett Mitchell and Nancy Nguyen to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., #40 MOTION to Appoint Tariq Rasheed, Asma Tariq, Crescenzo Di Mambro to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., #41 MOTION to Appoint Joe Dong, Siamak Sahand, Dave Sherman and Kenneth Hayden to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel ., #30 MOTION to Appoint William McCarthy to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., #10 MOTION to Appoint Scott Patterson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Douglas S. Chabot..(Rosenfeld, David)
May 19, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Withdrawal re: #19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Phillip Bergman..(Arkin, Alan)
May 19, 2020 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #23 MOTION to Appoint Douglas S. Chabot to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., #27 MOTION to Appoint Christine Thielen, Esteban Torbar, Dun Wang, Thomas Rigsbee, and Margoret Silveira to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., #19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel., #41 MOTION to Appoint Joe Dong, Siamak Sahand, Dave Sherman and Kenneth Hayden to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel ., #10 MOTION to Appoint Scott Patterson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., #36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Brett Mitchell and Nancy Nguyen to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Saul Kassin..(Kim, Phillip)
May 18, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of of Nonopposition to Competing Motions re: #30 MOTION to Appoint William McCarthy to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by William McCarthy..(Amon, Thomas)
May 13, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Statement of Non-Opposition and Reservation of Rights in Response to Motions to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. Document filed by Mark Castaneda, Brendan Kennedy, Tilray, Inc...(York-Erwin, Genevieve)
May 13, 2020 Filing 57 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Tilray, Inc...(York-Erwin, Genevieve)
May 13, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tiffany Anna Miao on behalf of Mark Castaneda, Brendan Kennedy, Tilray, Inc...(Miao, Tiffany)
May 13, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Genevieve Graeme York-Erwin on behalf of Mark Castaneda, Brendan Kennedy, Tilray, Inc...(York-Erwin, Genevieve)
May 13, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions. Document filed by Robert Kawula..(Bleichmar, Javier)
May 12, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions. Document filed by Frank Mangaru..(Gonnello, Richard)
May 11, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to the Competing Motions. Document filed by Crescenzo Di Mambro, Tariq Rasheed, Asma Tariq..(Guarnero, Matthew)
May 6, 2020 Filing 51 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brendan Kennedy..(pne)
May 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #50 Proposed Order, #33 Proposed Order, #17 Proposed Order, #11 Proposed Order, #26 Proposed Order, #20 Proposed Order, #43 Proposed Order, #35 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (ad)
May 5, 2020 Filing 50 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Frank Mangaru. Related Document Number: #47 ..(Gonnello, Richard) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 5, 2020 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Richard W. Gonnello in Support re: #47 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Frank Mangaru to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Frank Mangaru. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Gonnello, Richard)
May 5, 2020 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #47 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Frank Mangaru to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Frank Mangaru..(Gonnello, Richard)
May 5, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., MOTION to Appoint Frank Mangaru to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Frank Mangaru..(Gonnello, Richard)
May 5, 2020 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Jeremy A. Lieberman in Support re: #41 MOTION to Appoint Joe Dong, Siamak Sahand, Dave Sherman and Kenneth Hayden to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel .. Document filed by Joe Dong, Kenneth Hayden, Siamak Sahand, Dave Sherman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Assignment, #2 Exhibit B - Press Release, #3 Exhibit C - Certifications, #4 Exhibit D - Loss Chart, #5 Exhibit E - Joint Declaration, #6 Exhibit F - Firm Resume).(Lieberman, Jeremy)
May 5, 2020 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Matthew E. Guarnero in Support re: #40 MOTION to Appoint Tariq Rasheed, Asma Tariq, Crescenzo Di Mambro to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Crescenzo Di Mambro, Tariq Rasheed, Asma Tariq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Notice), #2 Exhibit B (Certifications), #3 Exhibit C (Joint Declaration), #4 Exhibit D (Loss Charts), #5 Exhibit E (Firm Resume)).(Guarnero, Matthew)
May 5, 2020 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #41 MOTION to Appoint Joe Dong, Siamak Sahand, Dave Sherman and Kenneth Hayden to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel . . Document filed by Joe Dong, Kenneth Hayden, Siamak Sahand, Dave Sherman..(Lieberman, Jeremy)
May 5, 2020 Filing 43 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Joe Dong, Kenneth Hayden, Siamak Sahand, Dave Sherman. Related Document Number: #41 ..(Lieberman, Jeremy) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 5, 2020 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #40 MOTION to Appoint Tariq Rasheed, Asma Tariq, Crescenzo Di Mambro to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Crescenzo Di Mambro, Tariq Rasheed, Asma Tariq..(Guarnero, Matthew)
May 5, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION to Appoint Joe Dong, Siamak Sahand, Dave Sherman and Kenneth Hayden to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Approve Counsel . Document filed by Joe Dong, Siamak Sahand, Dave Sherman, Kenneth Hayden..(Lieberman, Jeremy)
May 5, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION to Appoint Tariq Rasheed, Asma Tariq, Crescenzo Di Mambro to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Tariq Rasheed, Asma Tariq, Crescenzo Di Mambro. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Guarnero, Matthew)
May 5, 2020 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #34 MOTION to Appoint Saul Kassin to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.. . Document filed by Saul Kassin. (Attachments: #1 1 - PSLRA Early Notice, #2 2 - PSLRA Certification, #3 3 - Loss Chart, #4 4 - Firm Resume).(Kim, Phillip)
May 5, 2020 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Gregory B. Linkh in Support re: #36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Brett Mitchell and Nancy Nguyen to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Brett Mitchell, Nancy Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Press Release, #2 Exhibit B - Certifications, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - GPM Firm Resume).(Linkh, Gregory)
May 5, 2020 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Brett Mitchell and Nancy Nguyen to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Brett Mitchell, Nancy Nguyen..(Linkh, Gregory)
May 5, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., MOTION to Appoint Brett Mitchell and Nancy Nguyen to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Brett Mitchell, Nancy Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Linkh, Gregory)
May 5, 2020 Filing 35 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Saul Kassin. Related Document Number: #34 ..(Kim, Phillip) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 5, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Appoint Saul Kassin to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.. Document filed by Saul Kassin..(Kim, Phillip)
May 5, 2020 Filing 33 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by William McCarthy. Related Document Number: #30 ..(Amon, Thomas) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 5, 2020 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Thomas G. Amon in Support re: #30 MOTION to Appoint William McCarthy to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by William McCarthy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Amon, Thomas)
May 5, 2020 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #30 MOTION to Appoint William McCarthy to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by William McCarthy..(Amon, Thomas)
May 5, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Appoint William McCarthy to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by William McCarthy..(Amon, Thomas)
May 5, 2020 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Shannon L. Hopkins in Support re: #27 MOTION to Appoint Christine Thielen, Esteban Torbar, Dun Wang, Thomas Rigsbee, and Margoret Silveira to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Thomas Rigsbee, Margoret Silveira, Christine Thielen, Esteban Torbar, Dun Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F).(Hopkins, Shannon)
May 5, 2020 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #27 MOTION to Appoint Christine Thielen, Esteban Torbar, Dun Wang, Thomas Rigsbee, and Margoret Silveira to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Thomas Rigsbee, Margoret Silveira, Christine Thielen, Esteban Torbar, Dun Wang..(Hopkins, Shannon)
May 5, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Appoint Christine Thielen, Esteban Torbar, Dun Wang, Thomas Rigsbee, and Margoret Silveira to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Christine Thielen, Esteban Torbar, Dun Wang, Thomas Rigsbee, Margoret Silveira. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Hopkins, Shannon)
May 5, 2020 Filing 26 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Douglas S. Chabot. Related Document Number: #23 ..(Rosenfeld, David) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 5, 2020 Filing 25 DECLARATION of David A. Rosenfeld in Support re: #23 MOTION to Appoint Douglas S. Chabot to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Douglas S. Chabot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Estimate of losses, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Douglas S. Chabot in Support).(Rosenfeld, David)
May 5, 2020 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #23 MOTION to Appoint Douglas S. Chabot to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Douglas S. Chabot..(Rosenfeld, David)
May 5, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Appoint Douglas S. Chabot to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Douglas S. Chabot..(Rosenfeld, David)
May 5, 2020 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Javier Bleichmar in Support re: #18 MOTION to Appoint Robert Kawula to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bleichmar Fonti & Auld LLP.. Document filed by Robert Kawula. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA certification of Robert Kawula, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Pendency of Ganovsky v. Tilray, Inc., #3 Exhibit C - Chart reflecting financial interest of Robert Kawula, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume of BFA).(Bleichmar, Javier)
May 5, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #18 MOTION to Appoint Robert Kawula to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bleichmar Fonti & Auld LLP. . Document filed by Robert Kawula..(Bleichmar, Javier)
May 5, 2020 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Robert Kawula. Related Document Number: #18 ..(Bleichmar, Javier) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 5, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel. Document filed by Phillip Bergman..(Arkin, Alan)
May 5, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Appoint Robert Kawula to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bleichmar Fonti & Auld LLP. Document filed by Robert Kawula..(Bleichmar, Javier)
May 5, 2020 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Phillip Bergman. Related Document Number: #14 ..(Arkin, Alan) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 5, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Alan Arkin, Esq. in Support re: #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Phillip Bergman. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A: Bergman Certification, #2 Ex. B: Global Newswire Notice, #3 Ex. C: Bergman chart, #4 Ex. D: Berger Montague Firm Bio, #5 Ex. E: Cohen Tauber Firm Bio).(Arkin, Alan)
May 5, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel. . Document filed by Phillip Bergman..(Arkin, Alan)
May 5, 2020 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #19) - MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel. Document filed by Phillip Bergman..(Arkin, Alan) Modified on 5/6/2020 (ldi).
May 5, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Kim E. Miller in Support re: #10 MOTION to Appoint Scott Patterson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Scott Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Patterson Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Patterson Loss Chart, #3 Exhibit C - Published Notice, #4 Exhibit D - KSF Firm Resume).(Miller, Kim)
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #10 MOTION to Appoint Scott Patterson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Scott Patterson..(Miller, Kim)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Scott Patterson. Related Document Number: #10 ..(Miller, Kim) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 5, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Scott Patterson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Scott Patterson..(Miller, Kim)
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brendan Kennedy, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ganesh Kasilingam..(Amon, Thomas)
May 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas G. Amon to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the PDF 'To' section does not exactly match as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tilray, Inc...(jgo)
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark Castaneda..(jgo)
May 5, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 5, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 5, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas G. Amon. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ganesh Kasilingam. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
May 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas G. Amon. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:78; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark Castaneda, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ganesh Kasilingam..(Amon, Thomas)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brendan Kennedy, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ganesh Kasilingam..(Amon, Thomas) Modified on 5/5/2020 (jgo).
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tilray, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ganesh Kasilingam..(Amon, Thomas)
May 4, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ganesh Kasilingam..(Amon, Thomas)
May 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Amon, Thomas)
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Castaneda, Brendan Kennedy, Tilray, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19696520)Document filed by Ganesh Kasilingam..(Amon, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kasilingam v. Tilray, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan Kennedy
Represented By: Tiffany Anna Miao
Represented By: Douglas W. Greene
Represented By: Genevieve Graeme York-Erwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Castaneda
Represented By: Tiffany Anna Miao
Represented By: Douglas W. Greene
Represented By: Genevieve Graeme York-Erwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tilray, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Anna Miao
Represented By: Douglas W. Greene
Represented By: Genevieve Graeme York-Erwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ganesh Kasilingam
Represented By: Thomas G. Amon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Rose
Represented By: Jonathan Richard Horne
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Surinder Chandok
Represented By: Jonathan Richard Horne
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Scoggin
Represented By: Jonathan Richard Horne
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tariq Rasheed
Represented By: Matthew Enrico Guarnero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joe Dong
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brett Mitchell
Represented By: Gregory Bradley Linkh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scott Patterson
Represented By: Kim Elaine Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Douglas S. Chabot
Represented By: David Avi Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William McCarthy
Represented By: Thomas G. Amon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Siamak Sahand
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christine Thielen
Represented By: Thomas Livezey Laughlin, IV
Represented By: Shannon Lee Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Saul Kassin
Represented By: Phillip C. Kim
Represented By: Jonathan Richard Horne
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Esteban Torbar
Represented By: Thomas Livezey Laughlin, IV
Represented By: Shannon Lee Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Asma Tariq
Represented By: Matthew Enrico Guarnero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frank Mangaru
Represented By: Richard William Gonnello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Crescenzo Di Mambro
Represented By: Matthew Enrico Guarnero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Margoret Silveira
Represented By: Thomas Livezey Laughlin, IV
Represented By: Shannon Lee Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dun Wang
Represented By: Thomas Livezey Laughlin, IV
Represented By: Shannon Lee Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nancy Nguyen
Represented By: Gregory Bradley Linkh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Hayden
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Kawula
Represented By: Javier Bleichmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Rigsbee
Represented By: Thomas Livezey Laughlin, IV
Represented By: Shannon Lee Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Phillip Bergman
Represented By: Alan Ross Arkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dave Sherman
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?