G&G Closed Circuit Events, Inc. v. Richardson et al
Plaintiff: G&G Closed Circuit Events, Inc.
Defendant: Harold A. Richardson and MD Cafe Lounge Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03489
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. MD Cafe Lounge Corp. served on 6/2/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Business Document Specialist 2, NYS Dept. of State. Document filed by G&G Closed Circuit Events, Inc...(Loughlin, Joseph)
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Loughlin, Joseph)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MD Cafe Lounge Corp...(jgo)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Harold A. Richardson..(jgo)
May 6, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 6, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph P. Loughlin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Harold A. Richardson; MD Cafe Lounge Corp.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
May 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Joseph P. Loughlin to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Courthouse Assignment code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MD Cafe Lounge Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by G&G Closed Circuit Events, Inc...(Loughlin, Joseph)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Harold A. Richardson, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by G&G Closed Circuit Events, Inc...(Loughlin, Joseph)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Loughlin, Joseph) Modified on 5/6/2020 (jgo).
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MD Cafe Lounge Corp., Harold A. Richardson. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19712925)Document filed by G&G Closed Circuit Events, Inc...(Loughlin, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G&G Closed Circuit Events, Inc. v. Richardson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G&G Closed Circuit Events, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold A. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Cafe Lounge Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?