Buterbaugh v. Zimmer Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Buterbaugh
Defendant: Zimmer Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings Incorporated and Zimmer US Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03538
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/5/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 6/5/2020 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Smith, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/20/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2020.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 19, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
May 19, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
May 19, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad)
May 19, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad)
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to MDL 2859. Document filed by David Buterbaugh..(Davis, Alex)
May 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Alex C. Davis, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (ad)
May 14, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Davis, Alex)
May 8, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Crotty as possibly related to 18md2859. (pc)
May 8, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 8, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Inc., Zimmer US Inc.. Document filed by David Buterbaugh..(Davis, Alex)
May 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Alex C. Davis to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; There is no caption title citing the document being filed (Short Form Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 5/12/2020. (pc)
May 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Alex C. Davis, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
May 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Alex C. Davis to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated June 2017;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc)
May 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Alex C. Davis. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Zimmer Biomet Holdings Incorporated. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Davis, Alex) Modified on 5/7/2020 (pc).
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings Incorporated, Zimmer Inc., Zimmer US Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19728497)Document filed by David Buterbaugh..(Davis, Alex) Modified on 5/7/2020 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buterbaugh v. Zimmer Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Buterbaugh
Represented By: Alex C. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?